Christopher Marlowe v. James LeBlanc, Secretary, et al
Defendant / Appellant: JONATHAN TRAVIS, CHERMAINE BROWN, Sergeant, POLLY SMITH, JAMES M. LEBLANC, SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONS, MORGAN LEBLANC, Assistant Warden, STATE OF LOUISIANA THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONS, PREETY SINGH, Doctor, PAM HEARD, Doctor, FALLON STEWART, DARRYL CAMPBELL, Assistant Warden, STEPHANIE MICHEL, Deputy Warden, ROLANDA PALMER, Master Sergeant, GAIL LEVY, TIMOTHY HOOPER, Warden, JOHN MORRISON, ANGEL HORN, Master Sergeant, RAMAN SINGH, Doctor and ELIZABETH GAUTHREAUX
Plaintiff / Appellee: CHRISTOPHER MARLOWE
Case Number: 20-30276
Filed: April 25, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Record Excerpts deadline satisfied [20-30276] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Ms. Chermaine Brown, Mr. Darryl Campbell, Ms. Elizabeth Gauthreaux, Ms. Pam Heard, Mr. Timothy Hooper, Ms. Angel Horn, Mr. Morgan Leblanc, Mr. James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Ms. Gail Levy, Ms. Stephanie Michel, Mr. John Morrison, Ms. Rolanda Palmer, Ms. Preety Singh, Mr. Raman Singh, Ms. Polly Smith, State of Louisiana Through the Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Mr. Fallon Stewart and Mr. Jonathan Travis. Date of service: 06/19/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bollag, Posner; Attorney for Appellants: Evans, Glazer, Mooney, Murrill [20-30276] (Elizabeth Baker Murrill ) [Entered: 06/19/2020 10:34 AM]
June 8, 2020 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Record Excerpts due on 06/23/2020 for Appellants Chermaine Brown, Darryl Campbell, Elizabeth Gauthreaux, Pam Heard, Timothy Hooper, Angel Horn, James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Morgan Leblanc, Gail Levy, Stephanie Michel, John Morrison, Rolanda Palmer, Preety Singh, Raman Singh, Polly Smith, State of Louisiana Through the Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Fallon Stewart and Jonathan Travis. Appellee's Brief due on 07/08/2020 for Appellee Christopher Marlowe [20-30276] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Chermaine Brown, Mr. Darryl Campbell, Ms. Elizabeth Gauthreaux, Ms. Pam Heard, Mr. Timothy Hooper, Ms. Angel Horn, Mr. Morgan Leblanc, Mr. James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Ms. Gail Levy, Ms. Stephanie Michel, Mr. John Morrison, Ms. Rolanda Palmer, Ms. Preety Singh, Mr. Raman Singh, Ms. Polly Smith, State of Louisiana Through the Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Mr. Fallon Stewart and Mr. Jonathan Travis. Date of service: 06/08/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bollag, Posner; Attorney for Appellants: Evans, Glazer, Mooney, Murrill [20-30276] (Elizabeth Baker Murrill ) [Entered: 06/08/2020 11:47 PM]
June 8, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Elizabeth Baker Murrill for party(s) Appellant Morgan Leblanc Appellant State of Louisiana Through the Department of Public Safety and Corrections Appellant Darryl Campbell Appellant Timothy Hooper Appellant Preety Singh Appellant Rolanda Palmer Appellant Raman Singh Appellant Gail Levy Appellant Pam Heard Appellant Elizabeth Gauthreaux Appellant Polly Smith Appellant Jonathan Travis Appellant Angel Horn Appellant John Morrison Appellant Stephanie Michel Appellant Fallon Stewart Appellant Chermaine Brown Appellant James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, in case 20-30276, by Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Chermaine Brown in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Rolanda Palmer in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Angel Horn in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant John Morrison in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Darryl Campbell in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Pam Heard in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant State of Louisiana Through the Department of Public Safety and Corrections in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Jonathan Travis in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Elizabeth Gauthreaux in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Fallon Stewart in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Polly Smith in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Gail Levy in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Preety Singh in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Morgan Leblanc in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Stephanie Michel in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Timothy Hooper in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Raman Singh in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections in 20-30276 [20-30276] (MAS) [Entered: 06/08/2020 11:08 AM]
June 5, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-30276] (Elizabeth Baker Murrill ) [Entered: 06/05/2020 11:57 AM]
May 28, 2020 COURT ORDER denying Motion to expedite appeal filed by Appellee Mr. Christopher Marlowe [ # 9320522-2 ] [20-30276] (MAS) [Entered: 05/28/2020 10:47 AM]
May 26, 2020 OPPOSED MOTION to expedite the appeal [9320522-2]. Date of service: 05/26/2020 [20-30276] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Mr. Christopher Marlowe to expedite the appeal [9320522-2]. Date of service: 05/26/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bollag, Posner; Attorney for Appellants: Evans, Glazer, Mooney [20-30276] (Alexander Bollag ) [Entered: 05/26/2020 05:46 PM]
May 22, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Alexander Bollag for party(s) Appellee Christopher Marlowe, in case 20-30276 [20-30276] (MAS) [Entered: 05/22/2020 01:39 PM]
May 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-30276] (Alexander Bollag ) [Entered: 05/21/2020 01:53 PM]
April 29, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) James Garrison Evans for party(s) Appellant Morgan Leblanc Appellant State of Louisiana Through the Department of Public Safety and Corrections Appellant Darryl Campbell Appellant Timothy Hooper Appellant Preety Singh Appellant Rolanda Palmer Appellant Raman Singh Appellant Gail Levy Appellant Pam Heard Appellant Elizabeth Gauthreaux Appellant Polly Smith Appellant Jonathan Travis Appellant Angel Horn Appellant John Morrison Appellant Stephanie Michel Appellant Fallon Stewart Appellant Chermaine Brown Appellant James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, in case 20-30276 [20-30276] (MAS) [Entered: 04/29/2020 08:38 AM]
April 28, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/08/2020 for Appellants Chermaine Brown, Darryl Campbell, Elizabeth Gauthreaux, Pam Heard, Timothy Hooper, Angel Horn, James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Morgan Leblanc, Gail Levy, Stephanie Michel, John Morrison, Rolanda Palmer, Preety Singh, Raman Singh, Polly Smith, State of Louisiana Through the Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Fallon Stewart and Jonathan Travis. [20-30276] (RLL) [Entered: 04/28/2020 04:25 PM]
April 28, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-30276] (RLL) [Entered: 04/28/2020 04:22 PM]
April 28, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-30276] (James Garrison Evans ) [Entered: 04/28/2020 03:01 PM]
April 27, 2020 COURT ORDER granting Motion to stay the preliminary injunction pending appeal filed by Appellants State of Louisiana Through the Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Mr. Raman Singh, Mr. James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Ms. Stephanie Michel, Mr. Timothy Hooper, Ms. Polly Smith, Ms. Preety Singh, Mr. Morgan Leblanc, Ms. Gail Levy, Mr. Fallon Stewart, Ms. Elizabeth Gauthreaux, Mr. Jonathan Travis, Ms. Pam Heard, Mr. Darryl Campbell, Mr. John Morrison, Ms. Angel Horn, Ms. Rolanda Palmer and Ms. Chermaine Brown [ # 9300831-2 ] [20-30276] (IN DETAIL) (MVM) [Entered: 04/27/2020 06:57 PM]
April 27, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:18-CV-63. Electronic ROA due on 05/12/2020. [20-30276] (CB) [Entered: 04/27/2020 11:12 AM]
April 27, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9301289-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-30276] (CB) [Entered: 04/27/2020 11:09 AM]
April 27, 2020 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Christopher Marlowe [9301241-1] to the Motion filed by Appellants Ms. Chermaine Brown, Mr. Darryl Campbell, Ms. Elizabeth Gauthreaux, Ms. Pam Heard, Mr. Timothy Hooper, Ms. Angel Horn, Mr. Morgan Leblanc, Mr. James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Ms. Gail Levy, Ms. Stephanie Michel, Mr. John Morrison, Ms. Rolanda Palmer, Ms. Preety Singh, Mr. Raman Singh, Ms. Polly Smith, State of Louisiana Through the Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Mr. Fallon Stewart and Mr. Jonathan Travis [ # 9300831-2 ] Date of Service: 04/27/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Glazer, Mooney; Attorney for Appellee: Posner. [20-30276] (Emily Henrion Posner ) [Entered: 04/27/2020 10:46 AM]
April 27, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Emily Henrion Posner for Appellee Christopher Marlowe in 20-30276 [20-30276] (MAS) [Entered: 04/27/2020 10:31 AM]
April 27, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Chermaine Brown in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Rolanda Palmer in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Angel Horn in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant John Morrison in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Darryl Campbell in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Pam Heard in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant State of Louisiana Through the Department of Public Safety and Corrections in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Jonathan Travis in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Elizabeth Gauthreaux in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Fallon Stewart in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Polly Smith in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Gail Levy in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Preety Singh in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Morgan Leblanc in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Stephanie Michel in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Timothy Hooper in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant Raman Singh in 20-30276, Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer for Appellant James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections in 20-30276 [20-30276] (MAS) [Entered: 04/27/2020 10:30 AM]
April 27, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Emily Henrion Posner for Mr. Christopher Marlowe for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-30276] (Emily Henrion Posner ) [Entered: 04/27/2020 09:15 AM]
April 26, 2020 COURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED requesting a response to the opposed motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellants State of Louisiana Through the Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Mr. Raman Singh, Mr. James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Ms. Stephanie Michel, Mr. Timothy Hooper, Ms. Polly Smith, Ms. Preety Singh, Mr. Morgan Leblanc, Ms. Gail Levy, Fallon Stewart, Ms. Elizabeth Gauthreaux, Mr. Jonathan Travis, Ms. Pam Heard, Mr. Darryl Campbell, Mr. John Morrison, Ms. Angel Horn, Ms. Rolanda Palmer and Ms. Chermaine Brown in 20-30276 [ # 9300831-2 ] Response/Opposition due on 04/27/2020. [20-30276] (CB) [Entered: 04/26/2020 12:13 PM]
April 25, 2020 OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Ms. Chermaine Brown, Mr. Darryl Campbell, Ms. Elizabeth Gauthreaux, Ms. Pam Heard, Mr. Timothy Hooper, Ms. Angel Horn, Mr. Morgan Leblanc, Mr. James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Ms. Gail Levy, Ms. Stephanie Michel, Mr. John Morrison, Ms. Rolanda Palmer, Ms. Preety Singh, Mr. Raman Singh, Ms. Polly Smith, State of Louisiana Through the Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Fallon Stewart and Mr. Jonathan Travis for stay pending appeal [9300831-2] Ruling is requested by: 04/28/2020. Date of service: 04/25/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Glazer, Mooney; Attorney for Appellee: Posner [20-30276] (Phyllis Esther Glazer ) [Entered: 04/25/2020 04:58 PM]
April 25, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Phyllis Esther Glazer for Ms. Chermaine Brown, Mr. Darryl Campbell, Ms. Elizabeth Gauthreaux, Ms. Pam Heard, Mr. Timothy Hooper, Ms. Angel Horn, Mr. Morgan Leblanc, Mr. James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Ms. Gail Levy, Ms. Stephanie Michel, Mr. John Morrison, Ms. Rolanda Palmer, Ms. Preety Singh, Mr. Raman Singh, Ms. Polly Smith, State of Louisiana Through the Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Fallon Stewart and Mr. Jonathan Travis for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-30276] (Phyllis Esther Glazer ) [Entered: 04/25/2020 04:14 PM]
April 25, 2020 PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Chermaine Brown, Mr. Darryl Campbell, Ms. Elizabeth Gauthreaux, Ms. Pam Heard, Mr. Timothy Hooper, Ms. Angel Horn, Mr. James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Mr. Morgan Leblanc, Ms. Gail Levy, Ms. Stephanie Michel, Mr. John Morrison, Ms. Rolanda Palmer, Ms. Preety Singh, Mr. Raman Singh, Ms. Polly Smith, State of Louisiana Through the Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Fallon Stewart and Mr. Jonathan Travis [20-30276] (CB) [Entered: 04/25/2020 12:51 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Christopher Marlowe v. James LeBlanc, Secretary, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JONATHAN TRAVIS
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHERMAINE BROWN, Sergeant
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: POLLY SMITH
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JAMES M. LEBLANC, SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MORGAN LEBLANC, Assistant Warden
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STATE OF LOUISIANA THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PREETY SINGH, Doctor
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PAM HEARD, Doctor
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FALLON STEWART
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DARRYL CAMPBELL, Assistant Warden
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STEPHANIE MICHEL, Deputy Warden
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ROLANDA PALMER, Master Sergeant
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GAIL LEVY
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TIMOTHY HOOPER, Warden
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOHN MORRISON
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANGEL HORN, Master Sergeant
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RAMAN SINGH, Doctor
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ELIZABETH GAUTHREAUX
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Represented By: Suzanne Quinlan Mooney
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esq.
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRISTOPHER MARLOWE
Represented By: Emily Henrion Posner
Represented By: Alexander Bollag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?