R. Ceasar v. Vet Admin Med Ctr of N.O., et al
Defendant / Appellee: VETERANS ADMINISTRATION MEDICAL CENTER OF NEW ORLEANS, Director of Veterans Administration Medical Center - New Orleans, DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, Director of Department of Treasury and SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, Director of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff / Appellant: R. CEASAR
Case Number: 20-30324
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Objection and Motion to Quash received from Appellant Mr. R. Ceasar because the document is not in the proper format. The motion must comply with the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure as well as the Fifth Circuit Rules governing motions. Additionally, documents cannot be handwritten. [20-30324] (SEP) [Entered: 07/14/2020 01:17 PM]
June 30, 2020 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. R. Ceasar. Brief NOT Sufficient: Cover is missing lower court information; cover is missing the title of the brief identifying the party for whom the brief is filed (Appellant's Brief); cover is missing appellant's name, address and phone number; caption on the brief does not match the Court's official caption; cover is missing the nature of the proceeding below; brief needs a certificate of interested persons; missing statement regarding oral argument; missing table of contents; missing table of authorities; missing a statement of jurisdiction; missing a statement of the issues; missing a statement of the case; missing a summary of the argument; missing a standard of review; missing a conclusion; the font size must be 14 point or larger. Instructions to Pro-Se. Record Excerpts due on 07/15/2020 for Appellant R. Ceasar. PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 07/15/2020 for Appellant R. Ceasar. [20-30324] (SEP) [Entered: 07/01/2020 08:15 AM]
May 28, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/07/2020 for Appellant R. Ceasar. [20-30324] (DDL) [Entered: 05/28/2020 01:35 PM]
May 28, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-30324] (DDL) [Entered: 05/28/2020 01:34 PM]
May 27, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kevin G. Boitmann for party(s) Appellee SSA, Appellee Department of Treasury, Appellee Veterans Administration Medical Center of New Orleans, in case 20-30324. [20-30324] (SEP) [Entered: 05/28/2020 09:46 AM]
May 27, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Peter M. Mansfield for Appellee Department of Treasury in 20-30324, Attorney Peter M. Mansfield for Appellee SSA in 20-30324, Attorney Peter M. Mansfield for Appellee Veterans Administration Medical Center of New Orleans in 20-30324. [20-30324] (SEP) [Entered: 05/28/2020 09:39 AM]
May 27, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-30324] (Kevin G. Boitmann ) [Entered: 05/27/2020 12:11 PM]
May 27, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Peter M. Mansfield for Department of Treasury, SSA and Veterans Administration Medical Center of New Orleans for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-30324] (Peter M. Mansfield ) [Entered: 05/27/2020 12:09 PM]
May 26, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:19-CV-12812. Electronic ROA due on 06/10/2020. [20-30324] (SEP) [Entered: 05/26/2020 02:25 PM]
May 26, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9320218-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-30324] (SEP) [Entered: 05/26/2020 02:21 PM]
May 19, 2020 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. R. Ceasar. [20-30324] (SEP) [Entered: 05/19/2020 03:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: R. Ceasar v. Vet Admin Med Ctr of N.O., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VETERANS ADMINISTRATION MEDICAL CENTER OF NEW ORLEANS, Director of Veterans Administration Medical Center - New Orleans
Represented By: Peter M. Mansfield
Represented By: Kevin G. Boitmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, Director of Department of Treasury
Represented By: Peter M. Mansfield
Represented By: Kevin G. Boitmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, Director of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Peter M. Mansfield
Represented By: Kevin G. Boitmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: R. CEASAR
Represented By: R. Ceasar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?