Marc Veasey, et al v. Greg Abbott, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: KEN GANDY, MAXIMINA MARTINEZ LARA, EVELYN BRICKNER, JOHN MELLOR-CRUMLEY, MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS, TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, ANNA BURNS, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, DALLAS COUNTY, TEXAS, LENARD TAYLOR, SERGIO DELEON, LIONEL ESTRADA, ESTELA GARCIA ESPINOSA, MICHAEL MONTEZ, JANE HAMILTON, OSCAR ORTIZ, EULALIO MENDEZ, JR., PENNY POPE, LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, INCORPORATED, MARC VEASEY, KOBY OZIAS, FLOYD CARRIER and GORDON BENJAMIN
Defendant / Appellant: GREG ABBOTT, in his Official Capacity as Governor of Texas, STATE OF TEXAS and RUTH HUGHS
Intervenor Plaintiff: TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND and Imani Clark
Case Number: 20-40428
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jonathan Edward Paikin for party(s) Appellee Imani Clark, in case 20-40428 [20-40428] (DMS) [Entered: 08/03/2020 04:16 PM]
August 3, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kelly Patrick Dunbar for party(s) Appellee Imani Clark, in case 20-40428 [20-40428] (DMS) [Entered: 08/03/2020 04:13 PM]
August 3, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40428] (Jonathan Edward Paikin ) [Entered: 08/03/2020 08:43 AM]
August 3, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40428] (Kelly Patrick Dunbar ) [Entered: 08/03/2020 08:40 AM]
July 30, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/08/2020 for Appellants Greg Abbott, Ruth Hughs and State of Texas. [20-40428] (DDL) [Entered: 07/30/2020 08:09 AM]
July 30, 2020 8th SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. [20-40428] (DDL) [Entered: 07/30/2020 07:53 AM]
July 29, 2020 7th SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. [20-40428] (DDL) [Entered: 07/29/2020 01:53 PM]
July 27, 2020 6th SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. [20-40428] (DDL) [Entered: 07/27/2020 03:43 PM]
July 27, 2020 5th SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. [20-40428] (DDL) [Entered: 07/27/2020 01:12 PM]
July 27, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Ezra D. Rosenberg for Appellee Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives in 20-40428, Attorney Ezra D. Rosenberg for Appellee Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches in 20-40428, by Attorney(s) Myrna Perez for party(s) Appellee Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches Appellee Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, in case 20-40428 [20-40428] (ABT) [Entered: 07/27/2020 08:34 AM]
July 27, 2020 4th SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. [20-40428] (DDL) [Entered: 07/27/2020 07:53 AM]
July 24, 2020 3rd SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-40428] (DDL) [Entered: 07/24/2020 01:54 PM]
July 23, 2020 2nd SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. [20-40428] (DDL) [Entered: 07/23/2020 10:54 AM]
July 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Tania Faransso for party(s) Appellee Imani Clark, in case 20-40428. [20-40428] (RLL) [Entered: 07/23/2020 09:15 AM]
July 23, 2020 SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. [20-40428] (DDL) [Entered: 07/23/2020 08:24 AM]
July 23, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No [20-40428] (DDL) [Entered: 07/23/2020 08:08 AM]
July 22, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40428] (Myrna Perez ) [Entered: 07/22/2020 03:07 PM]
July 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40428] (Tania Faransso ) [Entered: 07/21/2020 05:11 PM]
July 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Deuel Ross for party(s) Appellee Imani Clark, in case 20-40428 [20-40428] (DMS) [Entered: 07/21/2020 03:20 PM]
July 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Samuel Spital for party(s) Appellee Imani Clark, in case 20-40428 [20-40428] (DMS) [Entered: 07/21/2020 03:18 PM]
July 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Alexander Stamm for party(s) Appellee La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Incorporated Appellee Lenard Taylor Appellee Lionel Estrada Appellee Eulalio Mendez Jr. Appellee Maximina Martinez Lara Appellee Estela Garcia Espinosa, in case 20-40428 [20-40428] (DMS) [Entered: 07/21/2020 03:16 PM]
July 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Lindsey Beth Cohan for party(s) Appellee Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches Appellee Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, in case 20-40428 [20-40428] (SDH) [Entered: 07/21/2020 08:21 AM]
July 21, 2020 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Christina Swarns is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:no longer with the firm. [20-40428] (ABT) [Entered: 07/21/2020 08:02 AM]
July 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Susan F. Zinn, Thomas Evans Chandler, Susan F. Zinn, Janai S. Nelson, Leah Camille Aden, Susan F. Zinn for party(s) Appellee La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Incorporated Appellee USA Appellee Lenard Taylor Appellee Lionel Estrada Appellee Eulalio Mendez Jr. Appellee Maximina Martinez Lara Appellee Imani Clark Appellee Estela Garcia Espinosa, in case 20-40428 [20-40428] (ABT) [Entered: 07/21/2020 07:35 AM]
July 20, 2020 CASE CAPTION updated. Appellee Imani Clark added to case. [20-40428] (JMW) [Entered: 07/20/2020 03:08 PM]
July 20, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40428] (Deuel Ross ) [Entered: 07/20/2020 02:14 PM]
July 20, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40428] (Samuel Spital ) [Entered: 07/20/2020 02:01 PM]
July 20, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40428] (Janai S. Nelson ) [Entered: 07/20/2020 01:48 PM]
July 20, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40428] (Leah Camille Aden ) [Entered: 07/20/2020 01:42 PM]
July 20, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40428] (Alexander Stamm ) [Entered: 07/20/2020 10:44 AM]
July 17, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40428] (Thomas Evans Chandler ) [Entered: 07/17/2020 02:42 PM]
July 17, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40428] (Susan F. Zinn ) [Entered: 07/17/2020 12:04 PM]
July 16, 2020 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: adjusting caption [20-40428] (JMW) [Entered: 07/16/2020 01:58 PM]
July 16, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Neil G. Baron for party(s) Appellee League of United Latin American Citizens Appellee Marc Veasey, in case 20-40428 [20-40428] (MRW) [Entered: 07/16/2020 07:39 AM]
July 16, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Ezra D. Rosenberg for party(s) Appellee Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches Appellee Mexican American Legislative Caucus, Texas House of Representatives, in case 20-40428 [20-40428] (MRW) [Entered: 07/16/2020 07:33 AM]
July 14, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40428] (Lindsey Beth Cohan ) [Entered: 07/14/2020 06:01 PM]
July 14, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Danielle Marie Lang for party(s) Appellee Jane Hamilton Appellee Floyd Carrier Appellee League of United Latin American Citizens Appellee Sergio DeLeon Appellee Koby Ozias Appellee Anna Burns Appellee Oscar Ortiz Appellee Penny Pope Appellee Michael Montez Appellee Gordon Benjamin Appellee Ken Gandy Appellee Evelyn Brickner Appellee John Mellor-Crumley Appellee Marc Veasey, in case 20-40428 [20-40428] (NFD) [Entered: 07/14/2020 04:49 PM]
July 14, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Joseph G. Hebert for party(s) Appellee Jane Hamilton Appellee Floyd Carrier Appellee League of United Latin American Citizens Appellee Sergio DeLeon Appellee Koby Ozias Appellee Anna Burns Appellee Oscar Ortiz Appellee Penny Pope Appellee Michael Montez Appellee Gordon Benjamin Appellee Ken Gandy Appellee Evelyn Brickner Appellee John Mellor-Crumley Appellee Marc Veasey, in case 20-40428 [20-40428] (NFD) [Entered: 07/14/2020 04:48 PM]
July 14, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Chad Wilson Dunn for party(s) Appellee Jane Hamilton Appellee Floyd Carrier Appellee League of United Latin American Citizens Appellee Sergio DeLeon Appellee Koby Ozias Appellee Anna Burns Appellee Oscar Ortiz Appellee Penny Pope Appellee Michael Montez Appellee Gordon Benjamin Appellee Ken Gandy Appellee Evelyn Brickner Appellee John Mellor-Crumley Appellee Marc Veasey, in case 20-40428 [20-40428] (NFD) [Entered: 07/14/2020 04:44 PM]
July 14, 2020 Attorney Lindsey Cohan is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: Counsel failed to complete the lower portion of the form (specifically question B-2) . [20-40428] (LBM) [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:28 PM]
July 14, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40428] (Ezra D. Rosenberg ) [Entered: 07/14/2020 11:31 AM]
July 14, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Matthew Hamilton Frederick for party(s) Appellant Greg Abbott Appellant Ruth Hughs Appellant State of Texas, in case 20-40428 [20-40428] (NFD) [Entered: 07/14/2020 11:19 AM]
July 14, 2020 Attorney Ezra Rosenberg is advised to resubmit appearance form containing complete case number. [20-40428] (LBM) [Entered: 07/14/2020 11:13 AM]
July 10, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40428] (Lindsey Beth Cohan ) [Entered: 07/10/2020 05:30 PM]
July 10, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40428] (Ezra D. Rosenberg ) [Entered: 07/10/2020 04:13 PM]
July 10, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40428] (Neil G. Baron ) [Entered: 07/10/2020 02:52 PM]
July 9, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40428] (Danielle Marie Lang ) [Entered: 07/09/2020 12:54 PM]
July 9, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40428] (J. Gerald Hebert ) [Entered: 07/09/2020 08:52 AM]
July 8, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40428] (Matthew Hamilton Frederick ) [Entered: 07/08/2020 05:04 PM]
July 8, 2020 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: correcting caption [20-40428] (JMW) [Entered: 07/08/2020 03:03 PM]
July 8, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40428] (Chad Wilson Dunn ) [Entered: 07/08/2020 01:54 PM]
July 7, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:13-CV-193 with consolidated district court numbers 2:13-CV-263, 2:13-CV-291 and 2:13-CV-348. Electronic ROA due on 07/22/2020. [20-40428] (DMS) [Entered: 07/07/2020 09:13 AM]
July 7, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9349357-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-40428] (DMS) [Entered: 07/07/2020 09:07 AM]
June 26, 2020 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Greg Abbott, Ms. Ruth Hughs and State of Texas [20-40428] (JMW) [Entered: 06/26/2020 12:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marc Veasey, et al v. Greg Abbott, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KEN GANDY
Represented By: Armand G. Derfner Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Hebert
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Chad Wilson Dunn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MAXIMINA MARTINEZ LARA
Represented By: Jose Garza
Represented By: Susan F. Zinn
Represented By: Alexander Stamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EVELYN BRICKNER
Represented By: Armand G. Derfner Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Hebert
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Chad Wilson Dunn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN MELLOR-CRUMLEY
Represented By: Armand G. Derfner Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Hebert
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Chad Wilson Dunn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS, TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Represented By: Jennifer Clark
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg Esq.
Represented By: Lindsey Beth Cohan
Represented By: Myrna Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANNA BURNS
Represented By: Armand G. Derfner Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Hebert
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Chad Wilson Dunn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES
Represented By: Jennifer Clark
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg Esq.
Represented By: Lindsey Beth Cohan
Represented By: Myrna Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DALLAS COUNTY, TEXAS
Represented By: Armand G. Derfner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LENARD TAYLOR
Represented By: Jose Garza
Represented By: Susan F. Zinn
Represented By: Alexander Stamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SERGIO DELEON
Represented By: Armand G. Derfner Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Hebert
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Chad Wilson Dunn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LIONEL ESTRADA
Represented By: Jose Garza
Represented By: Susan F. Zinn
Represented By: Alexander Stamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ESTELA GARCIA ESPINOSA
Represented By: Jose Garza
Represented By: Susan F. Zinn
Represented By: Alexander Stamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL MONTEZ
Represented By: Armand G. Derfner Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Hebert
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Chad Wilson Dunn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JANE HAMILTON
Represented By: Armand G. Derfner Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Hebert
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Chad Wilson Dunn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: OSCAR ORTIZ
Represented By: Armand G. Derfner Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Hebert
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Chad Wilson Dunn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EULALIO MENDEZ, JR.
Represented By: Jose Garza
Represented By: Susan F. Zinn
Represented By: Alexander Stamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PENNY POPE
Represented By: Armand G. Derfner Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Hebert
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Chad Wilson Dunn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS
Represented By: Armand G. Derfner Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Hebert
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Neil G. Baron
Represented By: Chad Wilson Dunn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Anna Marks Baldwin
Represented By: Thomas Evans Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Jose Garza
Represented By: Susan F. Zinn
Represented By: Alexander Stamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARC VEASEY
Represented By: Armand G. Derfner Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Hebert
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Neil G. Baron
Represented By: Chad Wilson Dunn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KOBY OZIAS
Represented By: Armand G. Derfner Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Hebert
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Chad Wilson Dunn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FLOYD CARRIER
Represented By: Armand G. Derfner Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Hebert
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Chad Wilson Dunn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GORDON BENJAMIN
Represented By: Armand G. Derfner Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Hebert
Represented By: Danielle Marie Lang
Represented By: Chad Wilson Dunn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GREG ABBOTT, in his Official Capacity as Governor of Texas
Represented By: Dominique G. Stafford
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Dominique G. Stafford
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RUTH HUGHS
Represented By: Dominique G. Stafford
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: Christina Swarns I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Imani Clark
Represented By: Kelly Patrick Dunbar
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Tania Faransso
Represented By: Janai S. Nelson Esq.
Represented By: Samuel Spital
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Paikin Esq.
Represented By: Leah Camille Aden Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?