E. Drake v. Travelers Indemnity Company, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Texas Department of Transportation, Harrison County, City of Hallsville, East Texas Bridge, Incorporated, Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Plaintiff / Appellant: E. V. Drake
Case Number: 20-40492
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Darren Keith Coleman for Appellee City of Hallsville in 20-40492 [20-40492] (ABT) [Entered: 09/11/2020 02:41 PM]
September 9, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Darren Keith Coleman, Esq. for City of Hallsville for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40492] (Darren Keith Coleman ) [Entered: 09/09/2020 04:18 PM]
September 9, 2020 Attorney Mr. Darren Keith Coleman, Esq. for Appellee City of Hallsville is advised to resubmit an appearance form to include email address. [20-40492] (LBM) [Entered: 09/09/2020 03:50 PM]
September 9, 2020 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 09/02/2020 denying IFP for Appellant Mr. E. V. Drake. Fee due on 10/09/2020 for Appellant E. V. Drake [20-40492] (ABT) [Entered: 09/09/2020 11:47 AM]
September 8, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Darren Keith Coleman, Esq. for City of Hallsville for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40492] (Darren Keith Coleman ) [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:49 PM]
August 27, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9387236-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-40492] (ABT) [Entered: 08/27/2020 11:28 AM]
August 27, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Paul M. Boyd for Appellee East Texas Bridge, Incorporated in 20-40492 [20-40492] (ABT) [Entered: 08/27/2020 09:03 AM]
August 27, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Paul M. Boyd for East Texas Bridge, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40492] (Paul M. Boyd ) [Entered: 08/27/2020 08:26 AM]
August 21, 2020 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. E. V. Drake. [20-40492] (JMW) [Entered: 08/21/2020 08:53 AM]
August 19, 2020 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9381112-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. E. V. Drake. [9381112-1] [20-40492] (ABT) [Entered: 08/19/2020 10:48 AM]
August 17, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Karen Denise Smith for Appellee Travelers Indemnity Company of America in 20-40492, Attorney Karen Denise Smith for Appellee Travelers Indemnity Company in 20-40492 [20-40492] (ABT) [Entered: 08/17/2020 03:21 PM]
August 14, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Karen Denise Smith for Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Indemnity Company of America for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40492] (Karen Denise Smith ) [Entered: 08/14/2020 04:08 PM]
August 5, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9371563-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.(IFPPDC) [20-40492] (ABT) [Entered: 08/05/2020 03:54 PM]
July 30, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. E. V. Drake [20-40492] (ABT) [Entered: 07/30/2020 06:52 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: E. Drake v. Travelers Indemnity Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Texas Department of Transportation
Represented By: Esteban San Miguel Soto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Harrison County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of Hallsville
Represented By: Darren Keith Coleman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: East Texas Bridge, Incorporated
Represented By: Paul M. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Karen Denise Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Represented By: Karen Denise Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: E. V. Drake
Represented By: E. V. Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?