Mohammad Ayobi v. Ray Castro, et al
Petitioner: MOHAMMAD ALI AYOBI
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR, U.S. Attorney General, in their official capacity, CHAD F. WOLF, ACTING SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, RAY CASTRO, Warden, South Texas Detention Complex, MATTHEW ALBENCE, Acting Director; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and DANIEL BIBLE, Field Office Director, San Antonio Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 20-50338
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/28/2020 for Appellants Matthew Albence, William Barr, Daniel Bible, Ray Castro and Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. [20-50338] (MRW) [Entered: 06/18/2020 01:03 PM]
June 18, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. State Court Papers included? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-50338] (MRW) [Entered: 06/18/2020 01:00 PM]
June 2, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:19-CV-1311. Electronic ROA due on 06/17/2020. [20-50338] (MRW) [Entered: 06/02/2020 01:51 PM]
June 2, 2020 TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Leticia Lucia Ornelas, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 06/01/2020 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [20-50338] (MRW) [Entered: 06/02/2020 01:50 PM]
June 2, 2020 NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellants Mr. Matthew Albence, Mr. William Barr, Mr. Daniel Bible, Mr. Ray Castro, Mr. Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Appellee Mr. Mohammad Ali Ayobi is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [20-50338] (Leticia L. Ornelas Rangel ) [Entered: 06/02/2020 11:02 AM]
May 29, 2020 NO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT RECEIVED for Ms. Leticia Lucia Ornelas. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Leticia Lucia Ornelas. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 06/29/2020 for Leticia Lucia Ornelas, Court Reporter [20-50338] (MRW) [Entered: 05/29/2020 10:14 AM]
May 7, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Matthew Albence, Mr. William Barr, Mr. Daniel Bible, Mr. Ray Castro and Mr. Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Leticia Lucia Ornelas, Proceeding Type and Date: Hearing 01/29/2020. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 05/18/2020 for Leticia Ornelas, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9308544-2 ] [20-50338] (MBC) [Entered: 05/07/2020 11:22 AM]
May 7, 2020 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. William Barrfor the Court to process. Date of service: 05/07/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Johnson; Attorney for Appellees: Schommer, Zwick. [20-50338] (Faith Johnson ) [Entered: 05/07/2020 10:27 AM]
May 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Keren Zwick for party(s) Appellee Mohammad Ali Ayobi, in case 20-50338 [20-50338] (MBC) [Entered: 05/06/2020 02:31 PM]
May 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50338] (Keren Zwick ) [Entered: 05/06/2020 09:08 AM]
May 5, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9306819-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 05/20/2020 for Appellants Matthew Albence, William Barr, Daniel Bible, Ray Castro and Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security [20-50338] (RSM) [Entered: 05/05/2020 11:38 AM]
April 27, 2020 PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Matthew Albence, Mr. William Barr, Mr. Daniel Bible, Mr. Ray Castro and Mr. Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security [20-50338] (RSM) [Entered: 04/27/2020 01:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mohammad Ayobi v. Ray Castro, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR, U.S. Attorney General, in their official capacity
Represented By: Faith Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD F. WOLF, ACTING SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Faith Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RAY CASTRO, Warden, South Texas Detention Complex
Represented By: Faith Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW ALBENCE, Acting Director; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Faith Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DANIEL BIBLE, Field Office Director, San Antonio Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Faith Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MOHAMMAD ALI AYOBI
Represented By: Erica Britt Schommer
Represented By: Keren Zwick Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?