Marshall Mitchell, et al v. Brent Stroman, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: RONALD WARREN, TOMMY JENNINGS, RICHARD LOCKHART, RENE CAVAZOS, PHILLIP SAMPSON, LINDELL COPELAND, CORY MCALISTER, CHRISTOPHER ROGERS, in his Individual Capacity, JASON CAVAZOS, GLENN WALKER, RICHARD SMITH, RUDY MERCADO, JUVENTINO MONTELLANO, MARSHALL MITCHELL, ANTHONY SHANE PALMER, LARRY PINA, LAWRENCE GARCIA, JAMES GRAY, CLAYTON REED, RICHARD BENAVIDES, BLAKE TAYLOR, JOHN GUERRERO and BRIAN BRINCKS
Defendant / Appellee: MANUEL CHAVEZ, Waco Police Department Detective, in his individual capacity, MCLENNAN COUNTY, TEXAS, JEFFREY ROGERS, Police Officer with the Waco Police Department, in his Individual Capacity, CITY OF WACO, TEXAS, STEVEN SCHWARTZ, Special Agent with the Texas Department of Public Safety, in his Individual Capacity, ABELINO "ABEL" REYNA, Elected District Attorney for McLennan County, Texas, in his individual capacity, BRENT STROMAN, Chief of Police of the Waco Police Department, in his individual capacity, CHRISTOPHER FROST, Special Agent with the Texas Department of Public Safety, in his Individual Capacity, PATRICK SWANTON, Police Officer with the Waco Police Department, in his Individual Capacity and ROBERT LANNING, Assistant Chief of Police, in his Individual Capacity
Case Number: 20-50380
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. John Arnold, Mr. Roy Covey, Mr. James Brent Ensey, Mr. Edger Kelleher and Mr. John Wilson in 20-50367, Appellants Mr. Richard Benavides, Mr. Brian Brincks, Mr. Jason Cavazos, Mr. Rene Cavazos, Mr. Lindell Copeland, Mr. Lawrence Garcia, Mr. James Gray, Mr. John Guerrero, Mr. Tommy Jennings, Mr. Richard Lockhart, Mr. Cory McAlister, Mr. Rudy Mercado, Mr. Marshall Mitchell, Mr. Juventino Montellano, Mr. Anthony Shane Palmer, Mr. Larry Pina, Mr. Clayton Reed, Mr. Christopher Rogers, Mr. Phillip Sampson, Mr. Richard Smith, Mr. Blake Taylor, Mr. Glenn Walker and Mr. Ronald Warren in 20-50380, Appellants Mr. James Caffey, Mr. Nathan Farish, Mr. Paul Miller, Mr. Robert Nichols and Mr. George Rogers in 20-50408. Extension Granted to and including 08/19/2020. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 08/19/2020 for Appellants John Arnold, Roy Covey, James Brent Ensey, Edger Kelleher, John Wilson, James Michael DeVoll, Martin D.C. Lewis, Dusty Oehlert, Gregory Wingo, Ricky Wycough, Richard Benavides, Brian Brincks, Jason Cavazos, Rene Cavazos, Lindell Copeland, Lawrence Garcia, James Gray, John Guerrero, Tommy Jennings, Richard Lockhart, Cory McAlister, Rudy Mercado, Marshall Mitchell, Juventino Montellano, Anthony Shane Palmer, Larry Pina, Clayton Reed, Christopher Rogers, Phillip Sampson, Richard Smith, Blake Taylor, Glenn Walker, Ronald Warren, James Caffey, Nathan Farish, Paul Miller, Robert Nichols and George Rogers [20-50367, 20-50372, 20-50380, 20-50408] (MBC) [Entered: 06/23/2020 09:56 AM]
June 23, 2020 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Mr. John Arnold, Mr. Roy Covey, Mr. James Brent Ensey, Mr. Edger Kelleher and Mr. John Wilson in 20-50367, Appellants Mr. James Michael DeVoll, Mr. Martin D.C. Lewis, Mr. Dusty Oehlert, Mr. Gregory Wingo and Mr. Ricky Wycough in 20-50372, Appellants Mr. Richard Benavides, Mr. Brian Brincks, Mr. Jason Cavazos, Mr. Rene Cavazos, Mr. Lindell Copeland, Mr. Lawrence Garcia, Mr. James Gray, Mr. John Guerrero, Mr. Tommy Jennings, Mr. Richard Lockhart, Mr. Cory McAlister, Mr. Rudy Mercado, Mr. Marshall Mitchell, Mr. Juventino Montellano, Mr. Anthony Shane Palmer, Mr. Larry Pina, Mr. Clayton Reed, Mr. Christopher Rogers, Mr. Phillip Sampson, Mr. Richard Smith, Mr. Blake Taylor, Mr. Glenn Walker and Mr. Ronald Warren in 20-50380, Appellants Mr. James Caffey, Mr. Nathan Farish, Mr. Paul Miller, Mr. Robert Nichols and Mr. George Rogers in 20-50408 for filing Appellant's Brief until 08/19/2020 [20-50367, 20-50372, 20-50380, 20-50408] (Don A. Tittle ) [Entered: 06/23/2020 09:36 AM]
June 10, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/20/2020 for Appellants John Arnold, Roy Covey, James Brent Ensey, Edger Kelleher, John Wilson, James Michael DeVoll, Martin D.C. Lewis, Dusty Oehlert, Gregory Wingo, Ricky Wycough, Richard Benavides, Brian Brincks, Jason Cavazos, Rene Cavazos, Lindell Copeland, Lawrence Garcia, James Gray, John Guerrero, Tommy Jennings, Richard Lockhart, Cory McAlister, Rudy Mercado, Marshall Mitchell, Juventino Montellano, Anthony Shane Palmer, Larry Pina, Clayton Reed, Christopher Rogers, Phillip Sampson, Richard Smith, Blake Taylor, Glenn Walker, Ronald Warren, James Caffey, Nathan Farish, Paul Miller, Robert Nichols and George Rogers. [20-50367, 20-50372, 20-50380, 20-50408] (DDL) [Entered: 06/10/2020 10:08 AM]
June 9, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Stephen Douglas Henninger for Appellee McLennan County, Texas in 20-50367, Attorney Stephen Douglas Henninger for Appellee Abelino Abel Reyna in 20-50367 [20-50408, 20-50367, 20-50372, 20-50380] (RSM) [Entered: 06/09/2020 01:13 PM]
June 9, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Thomas Phillip Brandt for Appellee McLennan County in 20-50408, Attorney Thomas Phillip Brandt for Appellee Abelino Reyna in 20-50408 [20-50408, 20-50367, 20-50372, 20-50380] (RSM) [Entered: 06/09/2020 01:01 PM]
June 8, 2020 BRIEFING SUSPENDED - Consolidation granted. A/Pet's Brief deadline canceled [20-50372, 20-50380] (MBC) [Entered: 06/08/2020 01:20 PM]
June 8, 2020 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: Providing caption reflecting consolidated cases [20-50367, 20-50372, 20-50380, 20-50408] (MBC) [Entered: 06/08/2020 10:33 AM]
June 4, 2020 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to consolidate cases 20-50367, 20-50372, 20-50380, 20-50408 filed by Appellants Mr. John Wilson, Mr. John Arnold, Mr. Roy Covey, Mr. James Brent Ensey and Mr. Edger Kelleher [ # 9326320-2 ] in 20-50367 [20-50367, 20-50372, 20-50380, 20-50408] (MBC) [Entered: 06/04/2020 02:50 PM]
May 27, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Natalie Deyo Thompson for party(s) Appellee Christopher Frost Appellee Steven Schwartz, in case 20-50380. [20-50380] (RLL) [Entered: 05/27/2020 02:44 PM]
May 26, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50380] (Natalie Deyo Thompson ) [Entered: 05/26/2020 02:47 PM]
May 22, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/01/2020 for Appellants Richard Benavides, Brian Brincks, Jason Cavazos, Rene Cavazos, Lindell Copeland, Lawrence Garcia, James Gray, John Guerrero, Tommy Jennings, Richard Lockhart, Cory McAlister, Rudy Mercado, Marshall Mitchell, Juventino Montellano, Anthony Shane Palmer, Larry Pina, Clayton Reed, Christopher Rogers, Phillip Sampson, Richard Smith, Blake Taylor, Glenn Walker and Ronald Warren. [20-50380] (MRW) [Entered: 05/22/2020 08:45 AM]
May 22, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-50380] (MRW) [Entered: 05/22/2020 08:43 AM]
May 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Charles Alfred Mackenzie for party(s) Appellee Brent Stroman Appellee Manuel Chavez Appellee City of Waco, Texas Appellee Robert Lanning Appellee Patrick Swanton Appellee Jeffrey Rogers, in case 20-50380 [20-50380] (CNF) [Entered: 05/21/2020 09:29 AM]
May 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael W. Dixon for party(s) Appellee Brent Stroman Appellee Manuel Chavez Appellee City of Waco, Texas Appellee Robert Lanning Appellee Patrick Swanton Appellee Jeffrey Rogers, in case 20-50380 [20-50380] (CNF) [Entered: 05/21/2020 09:22 AM]
May 20, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Charles D. Olson for Appellee Patrick Swanton in 20-50380, Attorney Charles D. Olson for Appellee Jeffrey Rogers in 20-50380, Attorney Charles D. Olson for Appellee Robert Lanning in 20-50380, Attorney Charles D. Olson for Appellee City of Waco, Texas in 20-50380, Attorney Charles D. Olson for Appellee Manuel Chavez in 20-50380, Attorney Charles D. Olson for Appellee Brent Stroman in 20-50380 [20-50380] (RSM) [Entered: 05/20/2020 01:33 PM]
May 20, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Ronald Warren in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Glenn Walker in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Richard Lockhart in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Larry Pina in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Tommy Jennings in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Cory McAlister in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant James Gray in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Clayton Reed in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Phillip Sampson in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Anthony Shane Palmer in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Lawrence Garcia in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Richard Smith in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Rudy Mercado in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Lindell Copeland in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant John Guerrero in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Jason Cavazos in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Juventino Montellano in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Rene Cavazos in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Brian Brincks in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Richard Benavides in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Christopher Rogers in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Blake Taylor in 20-50380, Attorney Don A. Tittle for Appellant Marshall Mitchell in 20-50380 [20-50380] (MRW) [Entered: 05/20/2020 11:44 AM]
May 20, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50380] (Charles Alfred Mackenzie ) [Entered: 05/20/2020 09:33 AM]
May 19, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50380] (Michael W. Dixon ) [Entered: 05/19/2020 10:15 AM]
May 19, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Charles D. Olson for Mr. Manuel Chavez, City of Waco, Texas, Mr. Robert Lanning, Mr. Jeffrey Rogers, Mr. Brent Stroman and Mr. Patrick Swanton for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50380] (Charles D. Olson ) [Entered: 05/19/2020 09:54 AM]
May 19, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:17-CV-457 ; 1:17-CV-480. Electronic ROA due on 06/03/2020. [20-50380] (MFY) [Entered: 05/19/2020 09:30 AM]
May 19, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Thomas Phillip Brandt for party(s) Appellee McLennan County, Texas Appellee Abelino Abel Reyna, in case 20-50380 [20-50380] (RSM) [Entered: 05/19/2020 07:56 AM]
May 19, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Stephen Douglas Henninger for Appellee McLennan County, Texas in 20-50380, Attorney Stephen Douglas Henninger for Appellee Abelino Abel Reyna in 20-50380 [20-50380] (RSM) [Entered: 05/19/2020 07:39 AM]
May 18, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Richard Benavides, Mr. Brian Brincks, Mr. Jason Cavazos, Mr. Rene Cavazos, Mr. Lindell Copeland, Mr. Lawrence Garcia, Mr. James Gray, Mr. John Guerrero, Mr. Tommy Jennings, Mr. Richard Lockhart, Mr. Cory McAlister, Mr. Rudy Mercado, Mr. Marshall Mitchell, Mr. Juventino Montellano, Mr. Anthony Shane Palmer, Mr. Larry Pina, Mr. Clayton Reed, Mr. Christopher Rogers, Mr. Phillip Sampson, Mr. Richard Smith, Mr. Blake Taylor, Mr. Glenn Walker and Mr. Ronald Warren advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 05/18/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Henninger, Lindsey, Olson; Attorney for Appellant: Tittle [20-50380] (Don A. Tittle ) [Entered: 05/18/2020 01:55 PM]
May 18, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Don A. Tittle, Esq. for Mr. Richard Benavides, Mr. Brian Brincks, Mr. Jason Cavazos, Mr. Rene Cavazos, Mr. Lindell Copeland, Mr. Lawrence Garcia, Mr. James Gray, Mr. John Guerrero, Mr. Tommy Jennings, Mr. Richard Lockhart, Mr. Cory McAlister, Mr. Rudy Mercado, Mr. Marshall Mitchell, Mr. Juventino Montellano, Mr. Anthony Shane Palmer, Mr. Larry Pina, Mr. Clayton Reed, Mr. Christopher Rogers, Mr. Phillip Sampson, Mr. Richard Smith, Mr. Blake Taylor, Mr. Glenn Walker and Mr. Ronald Warren for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50380] (Don A. Tittle ) [Entered: 05/18/2020 01:53 PM]
May 15, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Stephen Douglas Henninger for McLennan County, Texas and Mr. Abelino Abel Reyna for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50380] (Stephen Douglas Henninger ) [Entered: 05/15/2020 03:08 PM]
May 15, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50380] (Thomas Phillip Brandt ) [Entered: 05/15/2020 03:05 PM]
May 14, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9313809-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 05/29/2020 for Appellants Richard Benavides, Brian Brincks, Jason Cavazos, Rene Cavazos, Lindell Copeland, Lawrence Garcia, James Gray, John Guerrero, Tommy Jennings, Richard Lockhart, Cory McAlister, Rudy Mercado, Marshall Mitchell, Juventino Montellano, Anthony Shane Palmer, Larry Pina, Clayton Reed, Christopher Rogers, Phillip Sampson, Richard Smith, Blake Taylor, Glenn Walker and Ronald Warren [20-50380] (CNF) [Entered: 05/14/2020 03:45 PM]
May 8, 2020 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Richard Benavides, Mr. Brian Brincks, Mr. Jason Cavazos, Mr. Rene Cavazos, Mr. Lindell Copeland, Mr. Lawrence Garcia, Mr. James Gray, Mr. John Guerrero, Mr. Tommy Jennings, Mr. Richard Lockhart, Mr. Cory McAlister, Mr. Rudy Mercado, Mr. Marshall Mitchell, Mr. Juventino Montellano, Mr. Anthony Shane Palmer, Mr. Larry Pina, Mr. Clayton Reed, Mr. Christopher Rogers, Mr. Phillip Sampson, Mr. Richard Smith, Mr. Blake Taylor, Mr. Glenn Walker and Mr. Ronald Warren [20-50380] (RAJ) [Entered: 05/08/2020 05:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marshall Mitchell, et al v. Brent Stroman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RONALD WARREN
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TOMMY JENNINGS
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD LOCKHART
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RENE CAVAZOS
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PHILLIP SAMPSON
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LINDELL COPELAND
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CORY MCALISTER
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER ROGERS, in his Individual Capacity
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JASON CAVAZOS
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLENN WALKER
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD SMITH
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RUDY MERCADO
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUVENTINO MONTELLANO
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARSHALL MITCHELL
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY SHANE PALMER
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LARRY PINA
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAWRENCE GARCIA
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES GRAY
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLAYTON REED
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD BENAVIDES
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BLAKE TAYLOR
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN GUERRERO
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRIAN BRINCKS
Represented By: Don A. Tittle Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MANUEL CHAVEZ, Waco Police Department Detective, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Charles D. Olson
Represented By: Michael W. Dixon Esq.
Represented By: Charles Alfred Mackenzie Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCLENNAN COUNTY, TEXAS
Represented By: Stephen Douglas Henninger
Represented By: Thomas Phillip Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY ROGERS, Police Officer with the Waco Police Department, in his Individual Capacity
Represented By: Charles D. Olson
Represented By: Michael W. Dixon Esq.
Represented By: Charles Alfred Mackenzie Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF WACO, TEXAS
Represented By: Charles D. Olson
Represented By: Michael W. Dixon Esq.
Represented By: Charles Alfred Mackenzie Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN SCHWARTZ, Special Agent with the Texas Department of Public Safety, in his Individual Capacity
Represented By: Christopher Lee Lindsey
Represented By: Natalie Deyo Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABELINO "ABEL" REYNA, Elected District Attorney for McLennan County, Texas, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Stephen Douglas Henninger
Represented By: Thomas Phillip Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRENT STROMAN, Chief of Police of the Waco Police Department, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Charles D. Olson
Represented By: Michael W. Dixon Esq.
Represented By: Charles Alfred Mackenzie Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER FROST, Special Agent with the Texas Department of Public Safety, in his Individual Capacity
Represented By: Christopher Lee Lindsey
Represented By: Natalie Deyo Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICK SWANTON, Police Officer with the Waco Police Department, in his Individual Capacity
Represented By: Charles D. Olson
Represented By: Michael W. Dixon Esq.
Represented By: Charles Alfred Mackenzie Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT LANNING, Assistant Chief of Police, in his Individual Capacity
Represented By: Charles D. Olson
Represented By: Michael W. Dixon Esq.
Represented By: Charles Alfred Mackenzie Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?