Susan Sissom v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, formerly known as Bank of New York, MALCOLM CISNEROS, A LAW CORPORATION, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INCORPORATED, doing business as America's Wholesale Lender, Incorporated and MTC FINANCIAL, INCORPORATED, doing business as Trustee Corporations
Plaintiff / Appellant: SUSAN SISSOM
Case Number: 20-50392
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/13/2020 for Appellant Susan Sissom. [20-50392] (MRW) [Entered: 06/03/2020 02:54 PM]
June 3, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-50392] (MRW) [Entered: 06/03/2020 02:53 PM]
June 2, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:19-CV-949. Electronic ROA due on 06/17/2020. [20-50392] (MFY) [Entered: 06/02/2020 10:42 AM]
June 2, 2020 FEE PAID by Appellant Ms. Susan Sissom. Fee deadline satisfied [20-50392] (MFY) [Entered: 06/02/2020 10:36 AM]
May 20, 2020 Attorney Tatiana Alexander added as counsel of record for Appellees Countrywide Home Loans, Incorporated and Bank of New York Mellon in 20-50392 [20-50392] (AS) [Entered: 05/20/2020 09:28 AM]
May 20, 2020 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Rebekka Bodoff is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:she is no longer with the firm. [20-50392] (AS) [Entered: 05/20/2020 09:16 AM]
May 19, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9316015-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 06/03/2020 for Appellant Susan Sissom [20-50392] (MFY) [Entered: 05/19/2020 10:14 AM]
May 12, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Susan Sissom [20-50392] (LEF) [Entered: 05/12/2020 10:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Susan Sissom v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, formerly known as Bank of New York
Represented By: Rebekkah Bodoff
Represented By: Tatiana Alexander Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MALCOLM CISNEROS, A LAW CORPORATION
Represented By: J. Garth Fennegan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INCORPORATED, doing business as America's Wholesale Lender, Incorporated
Represented By: Rebekkah Bodoff
Represented By: Tatiana Alexander Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MTC FINANCIAL, INCORPORATED, doing business as Trustee Corporations
Represented By: J. Garth Fennegan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUSAN SISSOM
Represented By: Susan Sissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?