Frank Brown v. Bobby Lumpkin, Director
Respondent / Appellee: Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division and Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Petitioner / Appellant: Frank Henderson Brown
Case Number: 20-50651
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the motion to exceed page limitation received from Appellant Mr. Frank Henderson Brown because the request should be filed along with the motion for COA, if it exceeds page limitation not prior to [20-50651] (CNF) [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:26 PM]
September 21, 2020 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the motion to suspend copy rule received from Appellant Mr. Frank Henderson Brown because it is unnecessary, the clerk's office will make the copies as needed [20-50651] (CNF) [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:20 PM]
September 21, 2020 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to comply with COA requirements filed by Appellant Mr. Frank Henderson Brown [ # 9404453-2 ] Motion due deadline updated to 11/18/2020 for Appellant Frank Henderson Brown. Brief in Support deadline updated to 11/18/2020 for Appellant Frank Henderson Brown [20-50651] (CNF) [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:10 PM]
September 21, 2020 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Frank Henderson Brown to extend time to comply with COA requirements until [9404453-2]. [20-50651] (CNF) [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:09 PM]
September 14, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No State Court Papers included? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-50651] (CMB) [Entered: 09/14/2020 09:56 AM]
September 9, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 1:18-CV-1054. Electronic ROA due on 09/24/2020. [20-50651] (RAJ) [Entered: 09/09/2020 04:35 PM]
September 9, 2020 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 09/01/2020 granting IFP for Appellant Mr. Frank Henderson Brown. Fee deadline satisfied. Motion due on 10/19/2020 for Appellant Frank Henderson Brown. Brief in Support due on 10/19/2020 for Appellant Frank Henderson Brown [20-50651] (RAJ) [Entered: 09/09/2020 04:31 PM]
August 18, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9379749-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 09/02/2020 for Appellant Frank Henderson Brown [20-50651] (RAJ) [Entered: 08/18/2020 08:36 AM]
August 10, 2020 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Frank Henderson Brown [20-50651] (RAJ) [Entered: 08/10/2020 11:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Frank Brown v. Bobby Lumpkin, Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Frank Henderson Brown
Represented By: Frank Henderson Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?