Neil Gilmour, III, et al v. Aetna Health, Incorporated, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, L.P., Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, L.P., Victory Medical Center Southcross, L.P., Neil Gilmour, III, Trustee for the Grantor Trusts of Victory Parent Company, LLC, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, L.P., Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, L.P., Victory Medical Center Landmark, L.P. and Victory Medical Center Plano, L.P.
Defendant / Appellee: Aetna Health, Incorporated, Aetna Life Insurance Company and Aetna Health Insurance Company
Case Number: 20-50837
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, L.P., Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, L.P., Victory Medical Center Landmark, L.P., Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, L.P., Victory Medical Center Plano, L.P., Victory Medical Center Southcross, L.P. and Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, L.P.. Extension Granted to and including 01/22/2021. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 01/22/2021 for Appellants Neil Gilmour III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, L.P., Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, L.P., Victory Medical Center Landmark, L.P., Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, L.P., Victory Medical Center Plano, L.P., Victory Medical Center Southcross, L.P. and Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, L.P. [20-50837] (MBC) [Entered: 11/19/2020 02:43 PM]
November 19, 2020 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Mr. Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, L.P., Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, L.P., Victory Medical Center Landmark, L.P., Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, L.P., Victory Medical Center Plano, L.P., Victory Medical Center Southcross, L.P. and Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, L.P. for filing Appellants' Opening Brief until 01/22/2021 [20-50837] (Richard Barrett Phillips Jr.) [Entered: 11/19/2020 01:56 PM]
November 13, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/23/2020 for Appellants Neil Gilmour III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, L.P., Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, L.P., Victory Medical Center Landmark, L.P., Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, L.P., Victory Medical Center Plano, L.P., Victory Medical Center Southcross, L.P. and Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, L.P.. [20-50837] (CMB) [Entered: 11/13/2020 12:59 PM]
November 13, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-50837] (CMB) [Entered: 11/13/2020 12:57 PM]
October 22, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney John Bruce Shely for Appellees Aetna Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Insurance Company and Aetna Health, Incorporated, in case 20-50837. [20-50837] (DLJ) [Entered: 10/22/2020 09:29 AM]
October 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Mary Katherine Strahan for party(s) Appellee Aetna Life Insurance Company Appellee Aetna Health Insurance Company Appellee Aetna Health, Incorporated, in case 20-50837 [20-50837] (MBC) [Entered: 10/21/2020 04:03 PM]
October 21, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 5:17-CV-510. Electronic ROA due on 11/05/2020. [20-50837] (MBC) [Entered: 10/21/2020 03:56 PM]
October 21, 2020 FEE PAID by Appellants Mr. Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, L.P., Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, L.P., Victory Medical Center Landmark, L.P., Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, L.P., Victory Medical Center Plano, L.P., Victory Medical Center Southcross, L.P. and Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, L.P.. Fee deadline satisfied [20-50837] $ 505 receipt number 0542-14096225 (MBC) [Entered: 10/21/2020 03:48 PM]
October 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Reed Cullen Randel for party(s) Appellant Victory Medical Center Landmark, L.P. Appellant Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, L.P. Appellant Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, L.P. Appellant Victory Medical Center Southcross, L.P. Appellant Neil Gilmour III Appellant Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, L.P. Appellant Victory Medical Center Beaumont, L.P. Appellant Victory Medical Center Plano, L.P., in case 20-50837 [20-50837] (MBC) [Entered: 10/21/2020 01:01 PM]
October 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Andrew Christian Cookingham for Appellant Victory Medical Center Beaumont, L.P. in 20-50837, Attorney Andrew Christian Cookingham for Appellant Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, L.P. in 20-50837, Attorney Andrew Christian Cookingham for Appellant Victory Medical Center Southcross, L.P. in 20-50837, Attorney Andrew Christian Cookingham for Appellant Victory Medical Center Plano, L.P. in 20-50837, Attorney Andrew Christian Cookingham for Appellant Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, L.P. in 20-50837, Attorney Andrew Christian Cookingham for Appellant Victory Medical Center Landmark, L.P. in 20-50837, Attorney Andrew Christian Cookingham for Appellant Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, L.P. in 20-50837, Attorney Andrew Christian Cookingham for Appellant Neil Gilmour III in 20-50837 [20-50837] (MBC) [Entered: 10/21/2020 11:27 AM]
October 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Richard Barrett Phillips Jr. for party(s) Appellant Victory Medical Center Landmark, L.P. Appellant Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, L.P. Appellant Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, L.P. Appellant Victory Medical Center Southcross, L.P. Appellant Neil Gilmour III Appellant Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, L.P. Appellant Victory Medical Center Beaumont, L.P. Appellant Victory Medical Center Plano, L.P., in case 20-50837 [20-50837] (MBC) [Entered: 10/21/2020 10:21 AM]
October 20, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50837] (Mary Katherine Strahan ) [Entered: 10/20/2020 06:17 PM]
October 20, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. John Bruce Shely, Esq. for Aetna Life Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50837] (John Bruce Shely ) [Entered: 10/20/2020 04:26 PM]
October 16, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50837] (Reed Cullen Randel ) [Entered: 10/16/2020 04:13 PM]
October 16, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Andrew Christian Cookingham for Mr. Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, L.P., Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, L.P., Victory Medical Center Landmark, L.P., Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, L.P., Victory Medical Center Plano, L.P., Victory Medical Center Southcross, L.P. and Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, L.P. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50837] (Andrew Christian Cookingham ) [Entered: 10/16/2020 04:06 PM]
October 16, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50837] (Richard Barrett Phillips Jr.) [Entered: 10/16/2020 03:35 PM]
October 8, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [20-50837] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, L.P., Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, L.P., Victory Medical Center Landmark, L.P., Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, L.P., Victory Medical Center Plano, L.P., Victory Medical Center Southcross, L.P. and Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, L.P. advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 10/08/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Cookingham; Attorney for Appellees: Shely, Sjoberg [20-50837] (Andrew Christian Cookingham ) [Entered: 10/08/2020 02:50 PM]
October 7, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9416448-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Fee due on 10/22/2020 for Appellants Neil Gilmour III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, L.P., Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, L.P., Victory Medical Center Landmark, L.P., Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, L.P., Victory Medical Center Plano, L.P., Victory Medical Center Southcross, L.P. and Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, L.P. [20-50837] (WMJ) [Entered: 10/07/2020 03:37 PM]
September 30, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Neil Gilmour, III, Victory Medical Center Beaumont, L.P., Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, L.P., Victory Medical Center Landmark, L.P., Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, L.P., Victory Medical Center Plano, L.P., Victory Medical Center Southcross, L.P. and Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, L.P. [20-50837] (RAJ) [Entered: 09/30/2020 04:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Neil Gilmour, III, et al v. Aetna Health, Incorporated, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Victory Surgical Hospital East Houston, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew Christian Cookingham
Represented By: Richard Barrett Phillips Jr.
Represented By: Reed Cullen Randel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Victory Medical Center Mid-Cities, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew Christian Cookingham
Represented By: Richard Barrett Phillips Jr.
Represented By: Reed Cullen Randel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Victory Medical Center Southcross, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew Christian Cookingham
Represented By: Richard Barrett Phillips Jr.
Represented By: Reed Cullen Randel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Neil Gilmour, III, Trustee for the Grantor Trusts of Victory Parent Company, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Christian Cookingham
Represented By: Richard Barrett Phillips Jr.
Represented By: Reed Cullen Randel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Victory Medical Center Beaumont, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew Christian Cookingham
Represented By: Richard Barrett Phillips Jr.
Represented By: Reed Cullen Randel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Victory Medical Center Craig Ranch, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew Christian Cookingham
Represented By: Richard Barrett Phillips Jr.
Represented By: Reed Cullen Randel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Victory Medical Center Landmark, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew Christian Cookingham
Represented By: Richard Barrett Phillips Jr.
Represented By: Reed Cullen Randel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Victory Medical Center Plano, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew Christian Cookingham
Represented By: Richard Barrett Phillips Jr.
Represented By: Reed Cullen Randel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Aetna Health, Incorporated
Represented By: Allison Appleby Sjoberg
Represented By: John Bruce Shely Esq.
Represented By: Mary Katherine Strahan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: John Bruce Shely Esq.
Represented By: Mary Katherine Strahan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Aetna Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Allison Appleby Sjoberg
Represented By: John Bruce Shely Esq.
Represented By: Mary Katherine Strahan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?