Zurich Amer Ins v. Arch Ins
Plaintiff / Appellant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant / Appellee: Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company and Admiral Insurance Company
Case Number: 20-50966
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Blair Dancy is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:no longer counsel of record for the appellant. [20-50966] (LLL) [Entered: 01/22/2021 03:44 PM]
January 22, 2021 LETTER filed to advise that Blair Dancy is no longer counsel of record for the appellant. [20-50966] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER filed by Appellant Zurich American Insurance Company Letter withdrawing as counsel. Appellant Zurich is represented by lead counsel Ramiro Morales and Elizabeth Celniker.. Date of Service: 01/22/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bradley, Dove, Hofmann, Schaar; Attorney for Appellants: Celniker, Dancy, Morales; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Wilkins [20-50966] (Blair Dancy ) [Entered: 01/22/2021 03:23 PM]
January 19, 2021 COURT ORDER granting Motion to view and obtain sealed document filed by Appellant Zurich American Insurance Company [ # 9483773-2 ] [20-50966] (LLL) [Entered: 01/19/2021 04:42 PM]
January 15, 2021 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Zurich American Insurance Company to view and obtain sealed document. Date of service: 01/15/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bradley, Dove, Hofmann, Schaar; Attorney for Appellants: Celniker, Dancy, Morales; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Wilkins [20-50966] (Elizabeth B. Celniker ) [Entered: 01/15/2021 05:26 PM]
January 13, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Ramiro Morales for party(s) Appellant Zurich American Insurance Company, in case 20-50966 [20-50966] (LEF) [Entered: 01/13/2021 11:40 AM]
January 13, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Elizabeth B. Celniker for Appellant Zurich American Insurance Company in 20-50966 [20-50966] (LEF) [Entered: 01/13/2021 11:37 AM]
January 12, 2021 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the request to view sealed documents in the record received from Appellant Zurich American Insurance Company because a motion is required [20-50966] (LLL) [Entered: 01/13/2021 08:16 AM]
January 12, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Elizabeth B. Celniker for Zurich American Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50966] (Elizabeth B. Celniker ) [Entered: 01/12/2021 04:08 PM]
January 12, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50966] (Ramiro Morales ) [Entered: 01/12/2021 04:05 PM]
December 29, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 02/08/2021 for Appellant Zurich American Insurance Company. [20-50966] (CMB) [Entered: 12/29/2020 12:22 PM]
December 29, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-50966] (CMB) [Entered: 12/29/2020 12:22 PM]
December 28, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 1:19-CV-24. Electronic ROA due on 01/12/2021. [20-50966] (LLL) [Entered: 12/28/2020 03:30 PM]
December 28, 2020 TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Arlinda Lou Rodriguez, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 12/28/2020 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [20-50966] (LLL) [Entered: 12/28/2020 03:30 PM]
December 28, 2020 NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellant Zurich American Insurance Company is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [20-50966] (Arlinda Lou Rodriguez ) [Entered: 12/28/2020 10:30 AM]
December 9, 2020 ACKNOWLEDGMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Arlinda Lou Rodriguez, Est. Completion Dt: 01/05/2021, Est. No.of Pgs: 75, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 12/09/2020, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 01/08/2021, Proceeding Type and Date: Telephone Conference 05/05/2020. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 01/08/2021 for Arlinda Lou Rodriguez, Court Reporter [20-50966] (LLL) [Entered: 12/09/2020 03:33 PM]
December 9, 2020 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Court Reporter Mrs. Arlinda Lou Rodriguez. [20-50966] (Arlinda Lou Rodriguez ) [Entered: 12/09/2020 02:55 PM]
December 7, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Zurich American Insurance Company. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Arlinda Lou Rodriguez, Proceeding Type and Date: Telephone Conference 05/05/2020. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 12/17/2020 for Arlinda Rodriguez, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9456602-2 ] [20-50966] (LLL) [Entered: 12/07/2020 10:48 AM]
December 7, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED. [20-50966] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED by Appellant Zurich American Insurance Company. Date of Service: 12/07/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bradley, Dove, Hofmann, Schaar, Wilkins; Attorney for Appellants: Celniker, Dancy [20-50966] (Blair Dancy ) [Entered: 12/07/2020 06:20 AM]
December 7, 2020 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Zurich American Insurance Companyfor the Court to process. Date of service: 12/07/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bradley, Dove, Hofmann, Schaar, Wilkins; Attorney for Appellants: Celniker, Dancy. [20-50966] (Blair Dancy ) [Entered: 12/07/2020 06:18 AM]
December 4, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Blair Dancy for party(s) Appellant Zurich American Insurance Company, in case 20-50966 [20-50966] (LLL) [Entered: 12/04/2020 03:54 PM]
December 4, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50966] (Blair Dancy ) [Entered: 12/04/2020 02:16 PM]
December 4, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Christopher Dove for party(s) Appellee Arch Insurance Company, in case 20-50966 [20-50966] (LLL) [Entered: 12/04/2020 10:49 AM]
December 3, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kent Hofmann for Appellee Arch Insurance Company in 20-50966 [20-50966] (LLL) [Entered: 12/03/2020 04:10 PM]
December 3, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jill Annette Schaar for Appellee Arch Insurance Company in 20-50966 [20-50966] (LLL) [Entered: 12/03/2020 04:08 PM]
December 3, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50966] (Christopher Dove ) [Entered: 12/03/2020 03:18 PM]
December 2, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Kent Hofmann for Arch Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50966] (Kent Hofmann ) [Entered: 12/02/2020 03:47 PM]
December 2, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Jill Annette Schaar for Arch Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50966] (Jill Annette Schaar ) [Entered: 12/02/2020 01:46 PM]
December 1, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9453255-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 12/16/2020 for Appellant Zurich American Insurance Company [20-50966] (CNF) [Entered: 12/01/2020 03:56 PM]
November 24, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Zurich American Insurance Company [20-50966] (MBC) [Entered: 11/24/2020 04:05 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Zurich Amer Ins v. Arch Ins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Celniker
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: Beth Dunn Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Kent Hofmann
Represented By: Jill Annette Schaar
Represented By: Christopher Dove Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Admiral Insurance Company
Represented By: Greg C. Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?