Willie Hampton v. Tunica Cty MS, Muni Corp, et al
Defendant / Appellee: TUNICA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, LIEUTENANT JEROME HUDSON, JERRY L. ELLINGTON, Sheriff of Tunica, AGENT JAMES JONES, Mississippi Bureau of Narcotics, TUNICA COUNTY PROSECUTOR, THOMAS J. BOHLKE, Special Agent, TUNICA BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, CHARLES B. GRAVES, JR. and TUNICA COUNTY MISSISSIPPI, MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, COLLECTIVELY, DEFENDANTS INDIVIDUALLY, In their official capacities
Plaintiff / Appellant: WILLIE HAMPTON
Case Number: 20-60232
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Willie Hampton. Fee deadline satisfied. [20-60232] (MRW) [Entered: 05/11/2020 03:04 PM]
April 1, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9285017-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 05/26/2020 for Appellant Willie Hampton. [20-60232] (RLL) [Entered: 04/01/2020 02:04 PM]
March 25, 2020 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Willie Hampton. [20-60232] (RLL) [Entered: 03/25/2020 10:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Willie Hampton v. Tunica Cty MS, Muni Corp, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TUNICA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIEUTENANT JEROME HUDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERRY L. ELLINGTON, Sheriff of Tunica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AGENT JAMES JONES, Mississippi Bureau of Narcotics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TUNICA COUNTY PROSECUTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS J. BOHLKE, Special Agent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TUNICA BOARD OF SUPERVISORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES B. GRAVES, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TUNICA COUNTY MISSISSIPPI, MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, COLLECTIVELY, DEFENDANTS INDIVIDUALLY, In their official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIE HAMPTON
Represented By: Willie Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?