Ursula Staten v. Harrison County, Mississippi, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JASON E. DARE, Esquire, Attorney for City of D'Iberville, et al., in his Individual and Official Capacity, LISA MISHUNE ROSS, in her Individual and Official Capacity, HALEY NECAISE BROOM, Esquire, Attorney for Harrison County Sheriff Melvin Brisolara in her individual and official capacity, WALTER T. JOHNSON, of Watkins & Eager, P.L.L.C., in their Individual and Official Capacities and as attorneys for Health Assurance, LLC and Kenissa Clark, Registered Nurse, ROBERT H. PEDERSEN, of Watkins & Eager, P.L.L.C., in their Individual and Official Capacities and as attorneys for Health Assurance, LLC and Kenissa Clark, Registered Nurse, LISA M. ROSS LAW FIRM, PATRICK T. GUILD, Attorney for Harrison County, Mississippi, in his Individual and Official Capacity, HARRISON COUNTY, MISSISSIPPI, HARRISON COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, In their Official and Individual Capacities and MELVIN BRISOLARA, Harrison County Sheriff, in his Individual and Official Capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: URSULA C. STATEN and URSULA CHRISTINA STATEN
Case Number: 20-60329
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 CLERK ORDER granting in part Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief to and including 7/22/2020 filed by Appellant Ms. Ursula Christina Staten [ # 9323758-2 ]. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 07/22/2020 for Appellant Ursula Christina Staten [20-60329] (MCS) [Entered: 06/01/2020 10:45 AM]
June 1, 2020 MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Ursula Christina Staten to extend time to file brief as appellant until 08/01/2020 [9323758-2]. Date of service: 05/31/2020 [20-60329] (MCS) [Entered: 06/01/2020 08:08 AM]
May 18, 2020 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising the appellant that district court received her letter requesting a copy of the record and received her check for $505.00 to pay the fee. The district court advised they received appellant's letter and have sent a copy of the record to the appellant. [20-60329] (MCS) [Entered: 05/18/2020 09:49 AM]
May 13, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Michelle Tolle High for Appellee Jason E. Dare in 20-60329 [20-60329] (MCS) [Entered: 05/13/2020 08:47 AM]
May 12, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Michelle Tolle High, Esq. for Mr. Jason E. Dare for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-60329] (Michelle Tolle High ) [Entered: 05/12/2020 09:04 AM]
May 11, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/22/2020 for Appellant Ursula C. Staten. [20-60329] (CMB) [Entered: 05/11/2020 03:15 PM]
May 11, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-60329] (CMB) [Entered: 05/11/2020 03:14 PM]
May 8, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:19-CV-560. Electronic ROA due on 05/26/2020. [20-60329] (MCS) [Entered: 05/08/2020 03:27 PM]
May 8, 2020 FEE PAID by Appellant Ms. Ursula C. Staten. Fee deadline satisfied [20-60329] (MCS) [Entered: 05/08/2020 03:26 PM]
May 7, 2020 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Timothy Charles Holleman is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:did not represent Lisa Mishune Ross. [20-60329] (MCS) [Entered: 05/07/2020 05:02 PM]
May 7, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Timothy Charles Holleman for Appellee Patrick T. Guild in 20-60329, Attorney Timothy Charles Holleman for Appellee Harrison County Board of Supervisors in 20-60329, Attorney Timothy Charles Holleman for Appellee Harrison County, Mississippi in 20-60329 [20-60329] (MCS) [Entered: 05/07/2020 05:00 PM]
May 7, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-60329] (Timothy Charles Holleman ) [Entered: 05/07/2020 10:52 AM]
May 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Mara Joffe for party(s) Appellee Haley Necaise Broom Appellee Melvin Brisolara, in case 20-60329 [20-60329] (MCS) [Entered: 05/06/2020 02:15 PM]
May 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Hugh Dennis Keating I for Appellee Melvin Brisolara in 20-60329, Attorney Hugh Dennis Keating I for Appellee Haley Necaise Broom in 20-60329 [20-60329] (MCS) [Entered: 05/06/2020 02:12 PM]
May 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) James E. Welch Jr. for party(s) Appellee Lisa Mishune Ross Appellee Lisa M. Ross Law Firm, in case 20-60329 [20-60329] (MCS) [Entered: 05/06/2020 02:05 PM]
May 6, 2020 CASE CAPTION updated. Appellees Harrison County, Mississippi, Harrison County Board of Supervisors, Patrick T. Guild and Melvin Brisolara added to case. [20-60329] (SEP) [Entered: 05/06/2020 01:00 PM]
May 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-60329] (Mara Joffe ) [Entered: 05/06/2020 10:07 AM]
May 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-60329] (Hugh Dennis Keating I) [Entered: 05/06/2020 10:02 AM]
May 5, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-60329] (James E. Welch Jr.) [Entered: 05/05/2020 10:56 AM]
May 4, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William E. Whitfield III for Appellee Lisa M. Ross Law Firm in 20-60329, by Attorney(s) William E. Whitfield III for party(s) Appellee Lisa Mishune Ross, in case 20-60329 [20-60329] (MCS) [Entered: 05/04/2020 11:58 AM]
May 4, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-60329] (William E. Whitfield III) [Entered: 05/04/2020 09:50 AM]
May 1, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joe Sam Owen for Appellee Walter T. Johnson in 20-60329, Attorney Joe Sam Owen for Appellee Robert H. Pedersen in 20-60329 [20-60329] (MCS) [Entered: 05/01/2020 03:13 PM]
April 30, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Joe Sam Owen for Mr. Walter T. Johnson and Robert H. Pedersen for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-60329] (Joe Sam Owen ) [Entered: 04/30/2020 04:30 PM]
April 30, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9304512-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Fee due on 05/15/2020 for Appellant Ursula C. Staten [20-60329] (MCS) [Entered: 04/30/2020 02:16 PM]
April 23, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Ursula C. Staten. [20-60329] (SEP) [Entered: 04/23/2020 01:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ursula Staten v. Harrison County, Mississippi, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON E. DARE, Esquire, Attorney for City of D'Iberville, et al., in his Individual and Official Capacity
Represented By: Michelle Tolle High Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA MISHUNE ROSS, in her Individual and Official Capacity
Represented By: Timothy Charles Holleman Esq.
Represented By: William E. Whitfield Esq. III
Represented By: James E. Welch Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HALEY NECAISE BROOM, Esquire, Attorney for Harrison County Sheriff Melvin Brisolara in her individual and official capacity
Represented By: Hugh Dennis Keating Esq. I
Represented By: Mara Joffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALTER T. JOHNSON, of Watkins & Eager, P.L.L.C., in their Individual and Official Capacities and as attorneys for Health Assurance, LLC and Kenissa Clark, Registered Nurse
Represented By: Joe Sam Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT H. PEDERSEN, of Watkins & Eager, P.L.L.C., in their Individual and Official Capacities and as attorneys for Health Assurance, LLC and Kenissa Clark, Registered Nurse
Represented By: Joe Sam Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA M. ROSS LAW FIRM
Represented By: William E. Whitfield Esq. III
Represented By: James E. Welch Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICK T. GUILD, Attorney for Harrison County, Mississippi, in his Individual and Official Capacity
Represented By: Timothy Charles Holleman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARRISON COUNTY, MISSISSIPPI
Represented By: Timothy Charles Holleman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARRISON COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, In their Official and Individual Capacities
Represented By: Timothy Charles Holleman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELVIN BRISOLARA, Harrison County Sheriff, in his Individual and Official Capacity
Represented By: Hugh Dennis Keating Esq. I
Represented By: Mara Joffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: URSULA C. STATEN
Represented By: Ursula C. Staten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: URSULA CHRISTINA STATEN
Represented By: Ursula Christina Staten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?