Tzul Lacan v. Rosen
Petitioner: Juan Gabriel Tzul Lacan
Respondent: William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General and Jeffrey A. Rosen, Acting U.S. Attorney General
Case Number: 20-61229
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9474327-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-61229] (SEP) [Entered: 01/04/2021 04:27 PM]
December 29, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Anuj Arun Shah for Petitioner Juan Gabriel Tzul Lacan in 20-61229 [20-61229] (MCS) [Entered: 12/29/2020 06:14 PM]
December 28, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-61229] (Anuj Arun Shah ) [Entered: 12/28/2020 05:30 PM]
December 28, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Christin Marie Whitacre for party(s) Respondent William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General, in case 20-61229 [20-61229] (MCS) [Entered: 12/28/2020 04:50 PM]
December 28, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-61229] (Christin Marie Whitacre ) [Entered: 12/28/2020 11:40 AM]
December 28, 2020 IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Mr. Juan Gabriel Tzul Lacan. Date received in 5th Circuit: 12/28/2020. Immigration File Number: A072 425 517. Administrative Record due on 02/08/2021. [20-61229] (SEP) [Entered: 12/28/2020 10:44 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tzul Lacan v. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey A. Rosen, Acting U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Christin Marie Whitacre Esq.
Represented By: Office of Immigration Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Gabriel Tzul Lacan
Represented By: Anuj Arun Shah Ph. D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?