Coomer v. Roth
Defendant / Appellee: Mickenzie M. Gill, Julie A. Marguez, Anthony R.. Marguez, Sgt., Shane Hembree, Lori Davis, Mark Roth, Charles Hufford, NFN Ivey, Major, Captain A. Chisum, Shane Hembre, Dawn A. Andersen, Warden Arnold, Daisha B. Simmons, Sergeant Anthony R.. Marquez and Major NFN Ivey
Plaintiff / Appellant: Tracey Harris Coomer
Case Number: 21-10182
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-10182] (MRW) [Entered: 04/27/2021 03:37 PM]
April 21, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process (as to the notice of appeal filed in district court on 04/06/2021). [9556042-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-10182] (SEP) [Entered: 04/21/2021 02:29 PM]
April 13, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:18-CV-121. Electronic ROA due on 04/28/2021. [21-10182] (CNF) [Entered: 04/13/2021 02:24 PM]
April 13, 2021 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9549073-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Tracey Harris Coomer. [9549073-1] [21-10182] (MFY) [Entered: 04/13/2021 09:45 AM]
April 7, 2021 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion to proceed IFP in accordance with PLRA [ # 9544524-2 ] filed by Appellant Mr. Tracey Harris Coomer [21-10182] (CNF) [Entered: 04/07/2021 10:04 AM]
April 7, 2021 BRIEF IN SUPPORT (INCORPORATED IN MOTION) filed by Appellant Mr. Tracey Harris Coomer in support of Motion to proceed IFP in accordance with PLRA [ # 9544524-2 ]. [9544532-1] [21-10182] (CNF) [Entered: 04/07/2021 10:02 AM]
April 7, 2021 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Tracey Harris Coomer to proceed in forma pauperis in accordance with the Prison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA) [9544524-2] Fee deadline canceled. [21-10182] (CNF) [Entered: 04/07/2021 10:00 AM]
March 9, 2021 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 03/03/2021 denying IFP for Appellant Mr. Tracey Harris Coomer because appeal is not taken in good faith - fee assessed - BAUGH case.Fee or motion for IFP in 5CCA due on 04/08/2021 for Appellant Tracey Harris Coomer [21-10182] (MFY) [Entered: 03/09/2021 02:47 PM]
March 9, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9520823-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-10182] (MFY) [Entered: 03/09/2021 02:32 PM]
March 1, 2021 CASE CAPTION updated. Appellee Shane Hembre in 21-10182 substituted by Appellee Shane Hembree in 21-10182 [21-10182] (MBC) [Entered: 03/01/2021 01:59 PM]
March 1, 2021 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Tracey Harris Coomer [21-10182] (MBC) [Entered: 03/01/2021 01:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Coomer v. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mickenzie M. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Julie A. Marguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anthony R.. Marguez, Sgt.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shane Hembree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lori Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Charles Hufford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NFN Ivey, Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Captain A. Chisum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shane Hembre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dawn A. Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Warden Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Daisha B. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sergeant Anthony R.. Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Major NFN Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tracey Harris Coomer
Represented By: Tracey Harris Coomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?