Wade v. Wichita County, Texas
Petitioner / Appellant: Micky Dawn Wade
Respondent / Appellee: Wichita County, Texas
Case Number: 21-10283
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Micky Dawn Wade to proceed in forma pauperis [9576483-2] Fee deadline canceled. [21-10283] (CNF) [Entered: 05/18/2021 09:20 AM]
May 18, 2021 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Micky Dawn Wade. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied [21-10283] (MVM) [Entered: 05/18/2021 11:09 AM]
May 18, 2021 BRIEFING COMPLETE. [21-10283] (MVM) [Entered: 05/18/2021 11:09 AM]
May 4, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-10283] (CMB) [Entered: 05/04/2021 01:02 PM]
April 23, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 7:21-CV-1. Electronic ROA due on 05/10/2021. [21-10283] (MVM) [Entered: 04/23/2021 12:39 PM]
April 23, 2021 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 04/01/2021 denying IFP for Appellant Mr. Micky Dawn Wade. [21-10283] (MVM) [Entered: 04/23/2021 12:17 PM]
April 23, 2021 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief due on 06/02/2021 for Appellant Micky Dawn Wade.. Fee deadline updated to 06/17/2021 for Appellant Micky Dawn Wade [21-10283] (MVM) [Entered: 04/23/2021 12:19 PM]
March 31, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9540104-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 04/15/2021 for Appellant Micky Dawn Wade [21-10283] (MFY) [Entered: 03/31/2021 03:50 PM]
March 24, 2021 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Micky Dawn Wade [21-10283] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/24/2021 01:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Wade v. Wichita County, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Micky Dawn Wade
Represented By: Micky Dawn Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Wichita County, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?