Bridgett Memorial Healthcare v. Becerra
Defendant / Appellee: Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Xavier Becerra, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff / Appellant: Bridgett Memorial Healthcare, doing business as Bridge Solutions
Case Number: 21-20063
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising parties of revised caption [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 03/23/2021 04:25 PM]
March 23, 2021 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare [ # 9532802-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/23/2021 for Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 03/23/2021 03:40 PM]
March 23, 2021 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare to extend time to file brief as appellant until 04/23/2021 [9532802-2]. Date of service: 03/23/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Himmelfarb, Vela, Wright; Attorney for Appellants: Kennedy, Scott [21-20063] (Mark S. Kennedy ) [Entered: 03/23/2021 01:04 PM]
February 24, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Abby Christine Wright for party(s) Appellee Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, in case 21-20063 [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 02/24/2021 10:30 AM]
February 24, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Mark S. Kennedy for party(s) Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare, in case 21-20063, by Attorney Calvin Trey Scott for Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare in 21-20063 [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 02/24/2021 10:29 AM]
February 23, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20063] (Abby Christine Wright ) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:44 PM]
February 23, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Calvin Trey Scott for Bridgett Memorial Healthcare for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20063] (Calvin Trey Scott ) [Entered: 02/23/2021 12:53 PM]
February 23, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20063] (Mark S. Kennedy ) [Entered: 02/23/2021 12:51 PM]
February 23, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Edward Himmelfarb for party(s) Appellee Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, in case 21-20063 [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 02/23/2021 09:37 AM]
February 22, 2021 CASE CAPTION updated. Appellee Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services in 21-20063 substituted by Appellee Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services in 21-20063 [21-20063] (RLL) [Entered: 02/22/2021 02:24 PM]
February 22, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20063] (Edward Himmelfarb ) [Entered: 02/22/2021 01:14 PM]
February 19, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 02/19/2021 01:26 PM]
February 17, 2021 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcarefor the Court to process. Date of service: 02/17/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Scott; Attorney for Appellee: Vela. [21-20063] (Calvin Trey Scott ) [Entered: 02/17/2021 12:53 PM]
February 12, 2021 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/24/2021 for Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare. [21-20063] (DDL) [Entered: 02/12/2021 09:54 AM]
February 12, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-20063] (DDL) [Entered: 02/12/2021 09:53 AM]
February 10, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:20-CV-1770. Electronic ROA due on 02/25/2021. [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 02/10/2021 11:37 AM]
February 10, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9501498-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-20063] (SDH) [Entered: 02/10/2021 11:32 AM]
February 3, 2021 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Bridgett Memorial Healthcare [21-20063] (RLL) [Entered: 02/03/2021 10:43 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bridgett Memorial Healthcare v. Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Jose Vela Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Xavier Becerra, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Jose Vela Jr.
Represented By: Edward Himmelfarb
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bridgett Memorial Healthcare, doing business as Bridge Solutions
Represented By: Calvin Trey Scott
Represented By: Mark S. Kennedy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?