Adams EMS v. Becerra
Defendant / Appellee: Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Xavier Becerra, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff / Appellant: Adams EMS, Incorporated
Case Number: 21-20064
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising parties of revised caption [21-20064] (SDH) [Entered: 03/23/2021 04:21 PM]
March 9, 2021 NO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT RECEIVED for Mr. Johnny Sanchez and Mr. Fred E. Warner. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Johnny Sanchez, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 02/18/2021 ; Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Fred E. Warner, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 02/18/2021. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 03/22/2021 for Johnny Sanchez, Court Reporter and Fred E. Warner, Court Reporter [21-20064] (SDH) [Entered: 03/09/2021 03:34 PM]
March 9, 2021 TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Mayra Malone, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 03/05/2021 Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled [21-20064] (SDH) [Entered: 03/09/2021 03:31 PM]
February 24, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Mark S. Kennedy for Appellant Adams EMS, Incorporated in 21-20064 [21-20064] (SDH) [Entered: 02/24/2021 10:03 AM]
February 24, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Calvin Trey Scott for party(s) Appellant Adams EMS, Incorporated, in case 21-20064 [21-20064] (SDH) [Entered: 02/24/2021 10:02 AM]
February 23, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Mark S. Kennedy, Esq. for Adams EMS, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20064] (Mark S. Kennedy ) [Entered: 02/23/2021 12:49 PM]
February 23, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20064] (Calvin Trey Scott ) [Entered: 02/23/2021 12:46 PM]
February 18, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Adams EMS, Incorporated. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Mayra Malone, Proceeding Type and Date: Hearing 11/06/2018 ; Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Johnny Sanchez, Proceeding Type and Date: Status Conference 10/07/2020 ; Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Fred E. Warner, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 07/05/2018. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 03/01/2021 for Mayra Malone, Court Reporter, Johnny Sanchez, Court Reporter and Fred Warner, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9505304-2 ], [ # 9505297-2 ], [ # 9505295-2 ] [21-20064] (SDH) [Entered: 02/18/2021 09:11 AM]
February 17, 2021 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Adams EMS, Incorporatedfor the Court to process. Date of service: 02/17/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Edwards, Salzman, Vela; Attorney for Appellant: Kennedy. [21-20064] (Mark S. Kennedy ) [Entered: 02/17/2021 01:01 PM]
February 17, 2021 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Adams EMS, Incorporatedfor the Court to process. Date of service: 02/17/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Edwards, Salzman, Vela; Attorney for Appellant: Kennedy. [21-20064] (Mark S. Kennedy ) [Entered: 02/17/2021 01:00 PM]
February 17, 2021 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Adams EMS, Incorporatedfor the Court to process. Date of service: 02/17/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Edwards, Salzman, Vela; Attorney for Appellant: Kennedy. [21-20064] (Mark S. Kennedy ) [Entered: 02/17/2021 12:59 PM]
February 17, 2021 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Adams EMS, Incorporatedfor the Court to process. Date of service: 02/17/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Edwards, Salzman, Vela; Attorney for Appellant: Kennedy. [21-20064] (Mark S. Kennedy ) [Entered: 02/17/2021 12:57 PM]
February 10, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Joshua Marc Salzman for party(s) Appellee Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, in case 21-20064 [21-20064] (SDH) [Entered: 02/10/2021 01:07 PM]
February 10, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9501507-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-20064] (SDH) [Entered: 02/10/2021 11:40 AM]
February 9, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20064] (Joshua Marc Salzman ) [Entered: 02/09/2021 09:11 PM]
February 9, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kyle T. Edwards for party(s) Appellee Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, in case 21-20064 [21-20064] (SDH) [Entered: 02/09/2021 03:27 PM]
February 9, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20064] (Kyle T. Edwards ) [Entered: 02/09/2021 11:16 AM]
February 3, 2021 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Adams EMS, Incorporated [21-20064] (RLL) [Entered: 02/03/2021 11:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Adams EMS v. Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Jose Vela Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Xavier Becerra, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Jose Vela Jr.
Represented By: Kyle T. Edwards
Represented By: Joshua Marc Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Adams EMS, Incorporated
Represented By: Mark S. Kennedy Esq.
Represented By: Calvin Trey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?