Chambless Enterprises, L.L.C. v. Rochelle Walensky
Defendant / Appellee: Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Nina Witkofsky, Robert M. Wilkinson, Acting U.S. Attorney General, Robert Redfield, Center for Disease Control and Prevention, Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Xavier Becerra, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General, Sherri Berger and Rochelle Walensky
Plaintiff / Appellant: Apartment Association of Louisiana, Incorporated and Chambless Enterprises, L.L.C.
Case Number: 21-30037
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Apartment Association of Louisiana, Incorporated and Chambless Enterprises, L.L.C.. Date of service: 03/22/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Klein, Springer, Vigen; Attorney for Appellants: Rather, Simpson, Wake [21-30037] (Luke A. Wake ) [Entered: 03/22/2021 06:56 PM]
March 22, 2021 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Chambless Enterprises, L.L.C. and Apartment Association of Louisiana, Incorporated. Date of service: 03/22/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Klein, Springer, Vigen; Attorney for Appellants: Rather, Simpson, Wake [21-30037] (Luke A. Wake ) [Entered: 03/22/2021 06:54 PM]
March 22, 2021 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising parties of updated caption [21-30037] (CB) [Entered: 03/22/2021 11:24 AM]
March 12, 2021 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: Updated case caption issued to all parties for use on future filings in this case. [21-30037] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/12/2021 08:27 AM]
February 9, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Luke A. Wake for Appellants Apartment Association of Louisiana, Incorporated and Chambless Enterprises, L.L.C. in 21-30037. [21-30037] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/09/2021 04:20 PM]
February 9, 2021 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/22/2021 for Appellants Apartment Association of Louisiana, Incorporated and Chambless Enterprises, L.L.C.. [21-30037] (SDH) [Entered: 02/09/2021 02:02 PM]
February 9, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-30037] (SDH) [Entered: 02/09/2021 01:59 PM]
February 8, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30037] (Luke A. Wake ) [Entered: 02/08/2021 01:48 PM]
February 5, 2021 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED. [21-30037] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED by Appellants Apartment Association of Louisiana, Incorporated and Chambless Enterprises, L.L.C.. Date of Service: 02/05/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Klein, Springer, Vigen; Attorney for Appellants: Rather, Simpson, Wake [21-30037] (Steven M. Simpson ) [Entered: 02/05/2021 04:49 PM]
February 5, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [21-30037] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Apartment Association of Louisiana, Incorporated and Chambless Enterprises, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 02/05/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Klein, Springer, Vigen; Attorney for Appellants: Rather, Simpson, Wake [21-30037] (Steven M. Simpson ) [Entered: 02/05/2021 01:47 PM]
February 5, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Steven M. Simpson for Appellant Apartment Association of Louisiana, Incorporated in 21-30037, Attorney Steven M. Simpson for Appellant Chambless Enterprises, L.L.C. in 21-30037 [21-30037] (AGL) [Entered: 02/05/2021 11:26 AM]
February 4, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Steven M. Simpson for Apartment Association of Louisiana, Incorporated and Chambless Enterprises, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-30037] (Steven M. Simpson ) [Entered: 02/04/2021 02:52 PM]
February 3, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Alisa Beth Klein for party(s) Appellee HHS Appellee Center for Disease Control and Prevention Appellee Sherri Berger Appellee Robert M. Wilkinson, Acting U.S. Attorney General Appellee Rochelle Walensky Appellee Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, in case 21-30037 [21-30037] (AGL) [Entered: 02/03/2021 09:06 AM]
February 2, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Brian James Springer for party(s) Appellee HHS Appellee Center for Disease Control and Prevention Appellee Sherri Berger Appellee Robert M. Wilkinson, Acting U.S. Attorney General Appellee Rochelle Walensky Appellee Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, in case 21-30037 [21-30037] (CB) [Entered: 02/02/2021 11:39 AM]
February 2, 2021 CASE CAPTION updated. Appellees Robert Redfield and Nina Witkofsky in 21-30037 substituted by Appellees Rochelle Walensky and Sherri Berger in 21-30037 [21-30037] (CB) [Entered: 02/02/2021 11:32 AM]
February 1, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30037] (Alisa Beth Klein ) [Entered: 02/01/2021 10:57 AM]
February 1, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-30037] (Brian James Springer ) [Entered: 02/01/2021 10:25 AM]
January 28, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:20-CV-1455. Electronic ROA due on 02/12/2021. [21-30037] (AGL) [Entered: 01/28/2021 12:49 PM]
January 28, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9491991-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-30037] (AGL) [Entered: 01/28/2021 12:40 PM]
January 22, 2021 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Apartment Association of Louisiana, Incorporated and Chambless Enterprises, L.L.C. [21-30037] (AGL) [Entered: 01/22/2021 12:59 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Chambless Enterprises, L.L.C. v. Rochelle Walensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Brian James Springer
Represented By: Alisa Beth Klein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nina Witkofsky
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert M. Wilkinson, Acting U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Redfield
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Center for Disease Control and Prevention
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Brian James Springer
Represented By: Alisa Beth Klein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Xavier Becerra, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Brian James Springer
Represented By: Alisa Beth Klein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Brian James Springer
Represented By: Alisa Beth Klein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sherri Berger
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Brian James Springer
Represented By: Alisa Beth Klein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rochelle Walensky
Represented By: Leslie Cooper Vigen
Represented By: Brian James Springer
Represented By: Alisa Beth Klein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Apartment Association of Louisiana, Incorporated
Represented By: James Clark Rather Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Luke Wake
Represented By: Steven M. Simpson
Represented By: Luke A. Wake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chambless Enterprises, L.L.C.
Represented By: James Clark Rather Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Luke Wake
Represented By: Steven M. Simpson
Represented By: Luke A. Wake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?