Greene v. Demoss
Defendant / Appellant: John Clary, John Peters, Floyd McElroy, Dakota Demoss and Kory York
Plaintiff / Appellee: Tayla Greene, Individually and as Administrator of the Ronald Greene Estate
Case Number: 21-30044
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. Dakota Demoss and Mr. Kory York. Extension Granted to and including 04/21/2021. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/21/2021 for Appellants Dakota Demoss and Kory York. [21-30044] (SEP) [Entered: 03/12/2021 04:01 PM]
March 12, 2021 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Kory York for filing Unopposed Motion for 30 Day Level-One Extension of Time to File Appellant Brief On Behalf of Master Trooper Kory York and Trooper Dakota DeMoss until 04/21/2021 [21-30044] (Jay P. Adams ) [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:16 PM]
March 10, 2021 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Mr. John Clary, Mr. Floyd McElroy and Mr. John Peters for filing Appellants' Brief until 04/21/2021 [21-30044] (Brian David Smith ) [Entered: 03/10/2021 01:21 PM]
March 10, 2021 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. John Clary, Mr. Floyd McElroy and Mr. John Peters. Extension Granted to and including 04/21/2021. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/21/2021 for Appellants John Clary, Floyd McElroy and John Peters. [21-30044] (SEP) [Entered: 03/10/2021 03:30 PM]
February 17, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30044] (John Joseph Coyle III) [Entered: 02/17/2021 04:04 PM]
February 17, 2021 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance form from attorney Ben Mayeaux because he represents defendant Kevin Reeves who is not a party to this appeal. [21-30044] (SEP) [Entered: 02/19/2021 09:25 AM]
February 17, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) John Joseph Coyle III for party(s) Appellee Tayla Greene, in case 21-30044. [21-30044] (SEP) [Entered: 02/18/2021 03:55 PM]
February 17, 2021 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance form from attorney Elizabeth Bloch because she represents defendant Kevin Reeves who is not a party to this appeal. [21-30044] (SEP) [Entered: 02/19/2021 09:28 AM]
February 11, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-30044] (Jay P. Adams ) [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:26 PM]
February 11, 2021 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. Kory Yorkfor the Court to process. Date of service: 02/11/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Adams, Castaing, Racer, Smith; Attorney for Appellee: Haley. [21-30044] (Jay P. Adams ) [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:32 PM]
February 11, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Kory York advising transcript unnecessary - no hearings. [21-30044] (SEP) [Entered: 02/12/2021 09:11 AM]
February 11, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jay P. Adams for Appellant Kory York in 21-30044. [21-30044] (SEP) [Entered: 02/12/2021 01:38 PM]
February 9, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-30044] (RLL) [Entered: 02/09/2021 11:38 AM]
February 9, 2021 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/22/2021 for Appellants John Clary, Dakota Demoss, Floyd McElroy, John Peters and Kory York. [21-30044] (RLL) [Entered: 02/09/2021 11:39 AM]
February 8, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Brian David Smith for Appellant Floyd McElroy in 21-30044, Attorney Brian David Smith for Appellant John Clary in 21-30044, Attorney Brian David Smith for Appellant John Peters in 21-30044. [21-30044] (SEP) [Entered: 02/09/2021 02:27 PM]
February 8, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary - no hearings. [21-30044] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. John Clary, Mr. Floyd McElroy and Mr. John Peters advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 02/08/2021 via clerk - Attorney for Appellants: Adams, Castaing, Racer, Smith; Attorney for Appellee: Haley; email - Attorney for Appellants: Adams, Castaing, Racer, Smith; Attorney for Appellee: Haley [21-30044] (Brian David Smith ) [Entered: 02/08/2021 04:46 PM]
February 8, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Brian David Smith, Esq. for Mr. John Clary, Mr. Floyd McElroy and Mr. John Peters for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30044] (Brian David Smith ) [Entered: 02/08/2021 04:37 PM]
February 4, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9497106-2] [21-30044] (MAS) [Entered: 02/04/2021 10:46 AM]
February 4, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9497113-2] [21-30044] (MAS) [Entered: 02/04/2021 10:49 AM]
February 4, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:20-CV-578. Electronic ROA due on 02/19/2021. [21-30044] (MAS) [Entered: 02/04/2021 10:55 AM]
February 4, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9497668-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-30044] (MAS) [Entered: 02/04/2021 03:42 PM]
February 2, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary - No Hearings. [21-30044] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Dakota Demoss advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 02/02/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Adams, Racer, Smith; Attorney for Appellee: Haley [21-30044] (Charles Bryan Racer ) [Entered: 02/02/2021 11:41 AM]
February 2, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Charles Bryan Racer for Mr. Dakota Demoss for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30044] (Charles Bryan Racer ) [Entered: 02/02/2021 11:37 AM]
February 2, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-30044] (Andre' Charles Castaing ) [Entered: 02/02/2021 01:58 PM]
February 2, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Andre' Charles Castaing for party(s) Appellant Dakota Demoss, in case 21-30044. [21-30044] (SEP) [Entered: 02/03/2021 03:45 PM]
February 2, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:20-CV-578. Electronic ROA due on 02/17/2021. [21-30044] (SEP) [Entered: 02/02/2021 02:20 PM]
February 2, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Charles Bryan Racer for Appellant Dakota Demoss in 21-30044. [21-30044] (SEP) [Entered: 02/03/2021 03:43 PM]
January 29, 2021 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9493475-2] Parties added: Appellant Kory York. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Kory York. [9493475-1] [21-30044] (MAS) [Entered: 01/29/2021 03:20 PM]
January 27, 2021 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9491273-2] Parties added: Appellants John Peters, John Clary and Floyd McElroy. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Floyd McElroy, Mr. John Clary and Mr. John Peters. [9491273-1] [21-30044] (MAS) [Entered: 01/27/2021 03:29 PM]
January 27, 2021 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Dakota Demoss [21-30044] (MAS) [Entered: 01/27/2021 02:48 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Greene v. Demoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: John Clary
Represented By: Brian David Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: John Peters
Represented By: Brian David Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Floyd McElroy
Represented By: Brian David Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Dakota Demoss
Represented By: Charles Bryan Racer
Represented By: Andre' Charles Castaing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Kory York
Represented By: Jay P. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tayla Greene, Individually and as Administrator of the Ronald Greene Estate
Represented By: Ronald S. Haley Esq. Jr.
Represented By: John Joseph Coyle Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?