Manzo-Hernandez v. Juarez
Petitioner / Appellant: Mercy Rocio Duchi-Vargas, Victor Manuel Nuez-Hernandez, Victor Zepata-Jasso, Gloria Carolina Manzo-Hernandez, Moises Rocio Duchi-Vargas, Jatzeel Antonio Cuevas-Cortes and Moises Amadeo Mancia-Mendoza
Respondent / Appellee: Warden Omar Juarez and Assistant Warden Juan Saucedo
Case Number: 21-40034
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney David A. Donatti for Appellant Victor Manuel Nuez-Hernandez in 21-40034, Attorney David A. Donatti for Appellant Jatzeel Antonio Cuevas-Cortes in 21-40034, Attorney David A. Donatti for Appellant Mercy Rocio Duchi-Vargas in 21-40034, Attorney David A. Donatti for Appellant Moises Amadeo Mancia-Mendoza in 21-40034, Attorney David A. Donatti for Appellant Victor Zepata-Jasso in 21-40034, Attorney David A. Donatti for Appellant Gloria Carolina Manzo-Hernandez in 21-40034 [21-40034] (SDH) [Entered: 03/05/2021 02:00 PM]
March 5, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Annalisa Luella Cravens for Appellee Juan Saucedo in 21-40034 [21-40034] (SDH) [Entered: 03/05/2021 01:08 PM]
March 4, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Annalisa Luella Cravens for Mr. Juan Saucedo for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40034] (Annalisa Luella Cravens ) [Entered: 03/04/2021 06:06 PM]
March 4, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. David A. Donatti for Mr. Jatzeel Antonio Cuevas-Cortes, Mr. Mercy Rocio Duchi-Vargas, Mr. Moises Amadeo Mancia-Mendoza, Ms. Gloria Carolina Manzo-Hernandez, Mr. Victor Manuel Nuez-Hernandez and Mr. Victor Zepata-Jasso for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40034] (David A. Donatti ) [Entered: 03/04/2021 04:52 PM]
February 17, 2021 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/29/2021 for Appellants Jatzeel Antonio Cuevas-Cortes, Mercy Rocio Duchi-Vargas, Moises Amadeo Mancia-Mendoza, Gloria Carolina Manzo-Hernandez, Victor Manuel Nuez-Hernandez and Victor Zepata-Jasso. [21-40034] (CMB) [Entered: 02/17/2021 10:47 AM]
February 17, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-40034] (CMB) [Entered: 02/17/2021 10:46 AM]
February 9, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 5:20-CV-95. Electronic ROA due on 02/24/2021. [21-40034] (SDH) [Entered: 02/09/2021 12:00 PM]
February 9, 2021 TRANSCRIPTs FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order ddl satisfied [21-40034] (SDH) [Entered: 02/09/2021 12:00 PM]
January 19, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9484837-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 02/03/2021 for Appellants Jatzeel Antonio Cuevas-Cortes, Mercy Rocio Duchi-Vargas, Moises Rocio Duchi-Vargas, Gloria Carolina Manzo-Hernandez, Victor Manuel Nuez-Hernandez and Victor Zepata-Jasso [21-40034] (RLL) [Entered: 01/19/2021 02:19 PM]
January 12, 2021 PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Jatzeel Antonio Cuevas-Cortes, Mr. Mercy Rocio Duchi-Vargas, Mr. Moises Rocio Duchi-Vargas, Ms. Gloria Carolina Manzo-Hernandez, Mr. Victor Manuel Nuez-Hernandez and Mr. Victor Zepata-Jasso [21-40034] (CCR) [Entered: 01/12/2021 03:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Manzo-Hernandez v. Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Mercy Rocio Duchi-Vargas
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Victor Manuel Nuez-Hernandez
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Victor Zepata-Jasso
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Gloria Carolina Manzo-Hernandez
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Moises Rocio Duchi-Vargas
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Jatzeel Antonio Cuevas-Cortes
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Moises Amadeo Mancia-Mendoza
Represented By: David A. Donatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Warden Omar Juarez
Represented By: Jimmy Anthony Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Assistant Warden Juan Saucedo
Represented By: Annalisa Luella Cravens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?