Walmart Inc. v. DOJ
Defendant / Appellee: Acting Administrator Timothy J. Shea, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Administration, Attorney General William P. Barr, Acting Attorney General Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General, Acting Attorney General Monty Wilkinson, Acting Attorney General William P. Barr and Acting Administrator D. Christopher Evans
Plaintiff / Appellant: Walmart, Incorporated and Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 21-40157
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 CASE CAPTION updated. Appellee Monty Wilkinson in 21-40157 substituted by Appellee Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General in 21-40157 [21-40157] (DMS) [Entered: 05/06/2021 03:37 PM]
April 1, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Benjamin C. Mizer for party(s) Appellant Walmart Inc., in case 21-40157 [21-40157] (NFD) [Entered: 04/01/2021 11:20 AM]
March 30, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jacob Moshe Roth for party(s) Appellant Walmart Inc., in case 21-40157 [21-40157] (JMW) [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:11 PM]
March 30, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael A. Carvin for party(s) Appellant Walmart Inc., in case 21-40157 [21-40157] (JMW) [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:09 PM]
March 30, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Karen Hewitt for party(s) Appellant Walmart Inc., in case 21-40157 [21-40157] (JMW) [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:08 PM]
March 30, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jason Scott Varnado for party(s) Appellant Walmart Inc., in case 21-40157 [21-40157] (JMW) [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:06 PM]
March 30, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jeffrey Johnson for party(s) Appellant Walmart Inc., in case 21-40157 [21-40157] (JMW) [Entered: 03/30/2021 03:55 PM]
March 30, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40157] (Benjamin C. Mizer ) [Entered: 03/30/2021 11:39 AM]
March 30, 2021 Attorney Benjamin Mizer is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [21-40157] (LBM) [Entered: 03/30/2021 11:30 AM]
March 30, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40157] (Jacob Moshe Roth ) [Entered: 03/30/2021 09:31 AM]
March 29, 2021 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/10/2021 for Appellant Walmart Inc.. [21-40157] (SDH) [Entered: 03/29/2021 11:44 AM]
March 29, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-40157] (SDH) [Entered: 03/29/2021 11:44 AM]
March 29, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40157] (Jeffrey Johnson ) [Entered: 03/29/2021 11:25 AM]
March 29, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40157] (Jason Scott Varnado ) [Entered: 03/29/2021 11:06 AM]
March 29, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40157] (Karen Hewitt ) [Entered: 03/29/2021 11:04 AM]
March 29, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Michael A. Carvin for Walmart Inc. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-40157] (Michael A. Carvin ) [Entered: 03/29/2021 11:01 AM]
March 29, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40157] (Jason Scott Varnado ) [Entered: 03/29/2021 10:56 AM]
March 24, 2021 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Gayle Wear. [21-40157] (Gayle Wear ) [Entered: 03/24/2021 11:08 AM]
March 24, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Sarah Wendy Carroll for party(s) Appellee DOJ Appellee D. Christopher Evans Appellee Monty Wilkinson Appellee United States Drug Enforcement Administration, in case 21-40157 [21-40157] (JMW) [Entered: 03/24/2021 11:05 AM]
March 22, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40157] (Sarah Wendy Carroll ) [Entered: 03/22/2021 04:09 PM]
March 18, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Walmart Inc. advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [21-40157] (JMW) [Entered: 03/18/2021 03:15 PM]
March 18, 2021 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Walmart Inc.for the Court to process. Date of service: 03/17/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Carvin; Attorney for Appellee: Talmor. [21-40157] (Michael A. Carvin ) [Entered: 03/18/2021 11:57 AM]
March 18, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:20-CV-817. Electronic ROA due on 04/02/2021. [21-40157] (CAG) [Entered: 03/18/2021 11:44 AM]
March 18, 2021 CASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for Monty Wilkinson in 21-40157. [21-40157] (CAG) [Entered: 03/18/2021 11:43 AM]
March 18, 2021 CASE CAPTION updated. Update: as instructed by Appellant's counsel, Appellant Walmart, Incorporated, Appellees Timothy J. Shea and William P. Barr in 21-40157 substituted by Appellant Walmart Inc., Appellees D. Christopher Evans and Monty Wilkinson in 21-40157 [21-40157] (CAG) [Entered: 03/18/2021 11:37 AM]
March 17, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9528377-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-40157] (ABT) [Entered: 03/17/2021 03:23 PM]
March 10, 2021 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Walmart, Incorporated [21-40157] (CAG) [Entered: 03/10/2021 04:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Walmart Inc. v. DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Acting Administrator Timothy J. Shea
Represented By: Kate Talmor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Kate Talmor
Represented By: Sarah Wendy Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Drug Enforcement Administration
Represented By: Kate Talmor
Represented By: Sarah Wendy Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Attorney General William P. Barr
Represented By: Kate Talmor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Acting Attorney General Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Kate Talmor
Represented By: Sarah Wendy Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Acting Attorney General Monty Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Acting Attorney General William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Acting Administrator D. Christopher Evans
Represented By: Kate Talmor
Represented By: Sarah Wendy Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Walmart, Incorporated
Represented By: Michael A. Carvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Carvin
Represented By: Jacob Moshe Roth
Represented By: Jeffrey Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin C. Mizer
Represented By: Jason Scott Varnado
Represented By: Karen Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?