Halprin v. FDIC
Defendant / Appellee: Dan Brown, Individually and in his former capacity with LandAmerica Lawyers Title, Eric Sherer, in his official capacity as Trustee, American Title Group, Incorporated, formerly known as LandAmerica Lawyers Title of San Antonio and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for First National Bank (the "FDIC"), also known as First National Bank
Plaintiff / Appellant: Paul Weber, Gregory Halprin, Andrew Nguyen, Les Klingerman and George Heywood
Case Number: 21-50200
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants/Cross-Appellees Mr. Gregory Halprin, Mr. George Heywood, Mr. Les Klingerman, Mr. Andrew Nguyen and Mr. Paul Weber. Extension Granted to and including 06/16/2021. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 06/16/2021 for Appellants/Cross-Appellees Gregory Halprin, George Heywood, Les Klingerman, Andrew Nguyen and Paul Weber [21-50200] (SB) [Entered: 05/10/2021 02:51 PM]
April 23, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Raul Carlo Garcia for party(s) Appellant/Cross-Appellee George Heywood Appellant/Cross-Appellee Gregory Halprin, in case 21-50200 [21-50200] (RSM) [Entered: 04/23/2021 07:23 AM]
April 21, 2021 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Donald Grissom is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:does not represent all plaintiffs. [21-50200] (RSM) [Entered: 04/21/2021 02:14 PM]
April 21, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Anthony A. Avey for party(s) Appellant/Cross-Appellee George Heywood Appellant/Cross-Appellee Gregory Halprin, in case 21-50200 [21-50200] (RSM) [Entered: 04/21/2021 01:58 PM]
April 20, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-50200] (Anthony A. Avey ) [Entered: 04/20/2021 01:54 PM]
April 13, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-50200] (Raul Carlo Garcia ) [Entered: 04/13/2021 10:08 AM]
April 7, 2021 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/17/2021 for Appellants/Cross-Appellees Gregory Halprin, George Heywood, Les Klingerman, Andrew Nguyen and Paul Weber. [21-50200] (MRW) [Entered: 04/07/2021 02:28 PM]
April 7, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-50200] (MRW) [Entered: 04/07/2021 02:27 PM]
April 7, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Scott Alan Wheatley for party(s) Appellee/Cross-Appellant American Title Group, Incorporated, in case 21-50200 [21-50200] (RSM) [Entered: 04/07/2021 01:51 PM]
April 7, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellee/Cross-Appellant American Title Group, Incorporated advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [21-50200] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellee/Cross-Appellant American Title Group, Incorporated advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 04/07/2021 via US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Brown, Sherer; email - Attorney for Appellee/Cross-Appellant: Crouch; Attorney for Appellants/Cross-Appellees: Grissom, Hellmich; Attorney for Appellees: Jabbour, Mouse [21-50200] (Amanda Crouch ) [Entered: 04/07/2021 08:45 AM]
April 6, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-50200] (Scott Alan Wheatley ) [Entered: 04/06/2021 06:03 PM]
April 6, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9543606-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-50200] (RSM) [Entered: 04/06/2021 12:47 PM]
March 31, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Nicholas Jabbour for party(s) Appellee FDIC, in case 21-50200 [21-50200] (MFY) [Entered: 03/31/2021 03:43 PM]
March 30, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-50200] (Nicholas Jabbour ) [Entered: 03/30/2021 02:00 PM]
March 29, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [21-50200] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Mr. Les Klingerman advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 03/19/2021 via US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Brown, Sherer; email - Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: Crouch; Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Grissom, Hellmich; Attorney for Appellee: Mouse [21-50200] (Donald Hayes Grissom ) [Entered: 03/29/2021 03:10 PM]
March 29, 2021 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance form received from attorney P. Michael Jung because the parties listed on the appearance form are not parties in the appeal [21-50200] (RSM) [Entered: 03/29/2021 02:47 PM]
March 29, 2021 CASE CAPTION updated. Cross appeal filed. [9537662-2] Parties updated: Appellants Cross-Appellees Gregory Halprin, Les Klingerman, Paul Weber, George Heywood and Andrew Nguyen, Appellee Cross-Appellant American Title Group, Incorporated in 21-50200. NOA filed by Appellee American Title Group, Incorporated. [9537662-1] [21-50200] (MVM) [Entered: 03/29/2021 02:36 PM]
March 26, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Donald Hayes Grissom for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Andrew Nguyen in 21-50200 [21-50200] (RSM) [Entered: 04/21/2021 02:12 PM]
March 26, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Christopher Hellmich for party(s) Appellant George Heywood Appellant Andrew Nguyen Appellant Paul Weber Appellant Les Klingerman Appellant Gregory Halprin, in case 21-50200 [21-50200] (RSM) [Entered: 03/26/2021 08:37 AM]
March 24, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Donald Hayes Grissom for Mr. Gregory Halprin, Mr. George Heywood, Mr. Les Klingerman, Mr. Andrew Nguyen and Mr. Paul Weber for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-50200] (Donald Hayes Grissom ) [Entered: 03/24/2021 03:31 PM]
March 24, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-50200] (Christopher Hellmich ) [Entered: 03/24/2021 03:06 PM]
March 23, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 5:13-CV-1042. Electronic ROA due on 04/07/2021. [21-50200] (RSM) [Entered: 03/23/2021 08:29 AM]
March 23, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9532217-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-50200] (RSM) [Entered: 03/23/2021 08:25 AM]
March 16, 2021 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9526691-2] NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Gregory Halprin, Mr. George Heywood, Mr. Les Klingerman, Mr. Andrew Nguyen and Mr. Paul Weber. [9526691-1] [21-50200] (LLL) [Entered: 03/16/2021 09:46 AM]
March 15, 2021 PARTY LIMIT CASE. (FOR A FULL LIST OF PARTIES FOR THIS APPEAL, PLEASE REFER TO THE DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET SHEET.) [21-50200] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/15/2021 01:32 PM]
March 15, 2021 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Gregory Halprin, Mr. George Heywood, Mr. Les Klingerman, Mr. Andrew Nguyen and Mr. Paul Weber [21-50200] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/15/2021 01:30 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Halprin v. FDIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dan Brown, Individually and in his former capacity with LandAmerica Lawyers Title
Represented By: Daniel Lucius Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eric Sherer, in his official capacity as Trustee
Represented By: Eric David Sherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: American Title Group, Incorporated, formerly known as LandAmerica Lawyers Title of San Antonio
Represented By: Amanda Crouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for First National Bank (the "FDIC"), also known as First National Bank
Represented By: Boyd A. Mouse
Represented By: Nicholas Jabbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Paul Weber
Represented By: Donald Hayes Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gregory Halprin
Represented By: Donald Hayes Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Andrew Nguyen
Represented By: Donald Hayes Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Les Klingerman
Represented By: Donald Hayes Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: George Heywood
Represented By: Donald Hayes Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?