Herbert v. CitiMortgage
Defendant / Appellee: CitiMortgage, Incorporated, formerly known as CitiFinancial Mortgage Company, Incorporated, Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10, U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee for Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10, Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated and Citibank, N.A.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Nicholas E. Herbert and Mary D. McCaleb Herbert
Case Number: 21-60079
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. Mary D. McCaleb Herbert and Mr. Nicholas E. Herbert. Extension Granted to and including 04/26/2021. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/26/2021, for Appellants Mary D. McCaleb Herbert and Nicholas E. Herbert. [21-60079] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/22/2021 12:24 PM]
March 22, 2021 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Mr. Mary D. McCaleb Herbert and Mr. Nicholas E. Herbert for filing Appellant's Brief and Record Excerpts until 04/26/2021 [21-60079] (Joel Lavelle Blackledge ) [Entered: 03/22/2021 12:00 PM]
February 26, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joel Lavelle Blackledge for Appellants Mary D. McCaleb Herbert and Nicholas E. Herbert in 21-60079. [21-60079] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/26/2021 01:53 PM]
February 26, 2021 UPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent due to address change for attorney Mr. Joel Lavelle Blackledge. A/Pet's Brief Due deadline updated to 04/07/2021, for Appellants Mary D. McCaleb Herbert and Nicholas E. Herbert. [21-60079] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/26/2021 01:05 PM]
February 25, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-60079] (Joel Lavelle Blackledge ) [Entered: 02/25/2021 04:29 PM]
February 25, 2021 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Appearance Form received 02/25/2021, from attorney Mr. Joel Lavelle Blackledge, on behalf of Appellants Mr. Mary D. McCaleb Herbert and Mr. Nicholas E. Herbert, because the wrong docket event of "Signed Notice of Appeal Filed" was used to file the appearance form. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. [21-60079] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/25/2021 04:15 PM]
February 19, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert Thomas Schwartz for Appellees Citibank, N.A. and CitiMortgage, Incorporated in 21-60079. [21-60079] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/19/2021 04:30 PM]
February 18, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Robert Thomas Schwartz for Citibank, N.A. and CitiMortgage, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-60079] (Robert Thomas Schwartz ) [Entered: 02/18/2021 04:18 PM]
February 18, 2021 Attorney Mr. Robert Thomas Schwartz for Appellees Citibank, N.A. and CitiMortgage, Incorporated is advised to resubmit appearance form to include office address. [21-60079] (LBM) [Entered: 02/18/2021 03:21 PM]
February 18, 2021 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/30/2021 for Appellants Mary D. McCaleb Herbert and Nicholas E. Herbert. [21-60079] (CMB) [Entered: 02/18/2021 01:08 PM]
February 18, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-60079] (CMB) [Entered: 02/18/2021 01:06 PM]
February 17, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-60079] (Robert Thomas Schwartz ) [Entered: 02/17/2021 05:50 PM]
February 17, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jacob Arthur Bradley for Appellees Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated; Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10; and U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee for Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10, in case 21-60079. [21-60079] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/17/2021 03:17 PM]
February 17, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-60079] (Jacob Arthur Bradley ) [Entered: 02/17/2021 08:50 AM]
February 17, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Christian Janet Strickland for party(s) Appellee Citibank, N.A. Appellee CitiMortgage, Incorporated, in case 21-60079 [21-60079] (CB) [Entered: 02/15/2021 02:20 PM]
February 12, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-60079] (Christian Janet Strickland ) [Entered: 02/12/2021 04:43 PM]
February 12, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Sheldon Givens Alston for Appellees U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee for Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10; Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10; and Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated in 21-60079. [21-60079] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/12/2021 02:37 PM]
February 12, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Sheldon Givens Alston, Esq. for Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated, Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10 and U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee for Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10 for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-60079] (Sheldon Givens Alston ) [Entered: 02/12/2021 09:35 AM]
February 11, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 1:19-CV-646. Electronic ROA due on 02/26/2021. [21-60079] (MAS) [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:19 PM]
February 11, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9502929-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-60079] (MAS) [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:14 PM]
February 4, 2021 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Mary D. McCaleb Herbert and Mr. Nicholas E. Herbert [21-60079] (MAS) [Entered: 02/04/2021 01:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Herbert v. CitiMortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CitiMortgage, Incorporated, formerly known as CitiFinancial Mortgage Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Robert Thomas Schwartz
Represented By: Christian Janet Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10
Represented By: Sheldon Givens Alston Esq.
Represented By: Jacob Arthur Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee for Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10
Represented By: Sheldon Givens Alston Esq.
Represented By: Jacob Arthur Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated
Represented By: Sheldon Givens Alston Esq.
Represented By: Jacob Arthur Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert Thomas Schwartz
Represented By: Christian Janet Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nicholas E. Herbert
Represented By: Joel Lavelle Blackledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mary D. McCaleb Herbert
Represented By: Joel Lavelle Blackledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?