Weeks v. Collier
Plaintiff / Appellant: James Richard Weeks
Defendant / Appellee: Bryan Collier, Executive Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Brad Livingston, Executive Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Lannette Linthlcum, Texas Department of Criminal Justice Health Services Division Director, Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division and Denise DeShields, Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center/Correctional Managed Health Care Executive Medical Director
Case Number: 22-10126
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 15, 2023 Weeks v. Collier

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 03/09/2022 denying IFP for Appellant Mr. James Richard Weeks because appeal is not taken in good faith - fee assessed - BAUGH case. Fee or motion for IFP in 5CCA due on 04/08/2022 for Appellant James Richard Weeks [22-10126] (LLL) [Entered: 03/09/2022 04:20 PM]
February 28, 2022 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising a transcript is unnecessary [22-10126] (MRW) [Entered: 03/04/2022 07:35 AM]
February 16, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Review after Fee Issue is Resolved (PLRA case). [9777491-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. [22-10126] (LLL) [Entered: 02/16/2022 08:44 AM]
February 8, 2022 PARTY LIMIT CASE. (FOR A FULL LIST OF PARTIES FOR THIS APPEAL, PLEASE REFER TO THE DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET SHEET.) [22-10126] (RAJ) [Entered: 02/08/2022 04:23 PM]
February 8, 2022 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. James Richard Weeks [22-10126] (RAJ) [Entered: 02/08/2022 04:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Weeks v. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James Richard Weeks
Represented By: James Richard Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bryan Collier, Executive Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brad Livingston, Executive Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lannette Linthlcum, Texas Department of Criminal Justice Health Services Division Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Denise DeShields, Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center/Correctional Managed Health Care Executive Medical Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?