Flitsch v. Guardino
Plaintiff / Appellee: James Flitsch and Carolyn S. Clark
Defendant / Appellant: Kristin Guardino, J.D. and Leonard Guardino
Case Number: 22-20247
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: RICO
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 08/15/2022 for Appellees Carolyn S. Clark and James Flitsch [22-20247] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Kristin Guardino. Date of service: 07/15/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Earl; hand delivery - Appellants Guardino, Guardino [22-20247] (Kristin Guardino ) [Entered: 07/15/2022 04:54 PM]
July 15, 2022 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 [22-20247] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Ms. Kristin Guardino. Date of service: 07/15/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Earl; hand delivery - Appellants Guardino, Guardino [22-20247] (Kristin Guardino ) [Entered: 07/15/2022 04:57 PM]
June 29, 2022 COURT ORDER denying Motion for injunction pending appeal filed by Appellants Ms. Kristin Guardino and Mr. Leonard Guardino [ # 9880497-3 ]; denying Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Ms. Kristin Guardino and Mr. Leonard Guardino [ # 9880497-2 ] [22-20247] (SDH) [Entered: 06/29/2022 10:21 AM]
June 28, 2022 OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Ms. Kristin Guardino and Mr. Leonard Guardino for injunction pending appeal [9880497-3] Ruling is requested by: 07/04/2022, for stay pending appeal [9880497-2] Ruling is requested by: 07/04/2022. Date of service: 06/28/2022 [22-20247] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Kristin Guardino for injunction pending appeal [9880497-2] Ruling is requested by: 07/05/2022. Date of service: 06/28/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Earl; Appellant Guardino; hand delivery - Appellant Guardino [22-20247] (Kristin Guardino ) [Entered: 06/28/2022 01:56 PM]
June 22, 2022 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the motion for leave to file electronically received from Appellants Ms. Kristin Guardino and Mr. Leonard Guardino because filing is unnecessary as leave was previously granted in this case; per telephone call from appellant, document was filed in wrong case; appellant to refile in correct case 22-20278 [22-20247] (RLL) [Entered: 06/23/2022 08:52 AM]
June 6, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-20247] (CMB) [Entered: 06/06/2022 11:00 AM]
June 6, 2022 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/18/2022 for Appellants Kristin Guardino and Leonard Guardino. [22-20247] (CMB) [Entered: 06/06/2022 11:01 AM]
June 3, 2022 OPPOSED MOTION for reconsideration of the 06/02/2022 court order denying Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Ms. Kristin Guardino and Mr. Leonard Guardino in 22-20247 [ # 9860148-2 ] [9861843-2]. Date of service: 06/03/2022 [22-20247] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Kristin Guardino for expedited ruling on [9861843-2]. Date of service: 06/03/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Earl; Appellants Guardino, Guardino [22-20247] (Kristin Guardino ) [Entered: 06/03/2022 11:03 AM]
June 3, 2022 COURT ORDER denying Motion for reconsideration filed by Appellant Ms. Kristin Guardino [ # 9861843-2 ] [22-20247] (SDH) [Entered: 06/03/2022 01:07 PM]
June 3, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Steven C. Earl for Appellee Carolyn S. Clark in 22-20247, Attorney Steven C. Earl for Appellee James Flitsch in 22-20247 [22-20247] (ABT) [Entered: 06/03/2022 10:48 AM]
June 3, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Steven C. Earl, Esq. for Ms. Carolyn S. Clark and Mr. James Flitsch for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-20247] (Steven C. Earl ) [Entered: 06/03/2022 09:34 AM]
June 2, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:21-CV-3628. Electronic ROA due on 06/17/2022. [22-20247] (SDH) [Entered: 06/02/2022 08:24 AM]
June 2, 2022 CLERK ORDER granting Motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellants Ms. Kristin Guardino and Mr. Leonard Guardino [ # 9860285-2 ] [22-20247] (ABT) [Entered: 06/02/2022 10:31 AM]
June 2, 2022 COURT ORDER denying Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Ms. Kristin Guardino and Mr. Leonard Guardino [ # 9860148-2 ] [22-20247] (SDH) [Entered: 06/02/2022 08:20 AM]
June 2, 2022 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the reply to Appellees' response received from Appellants Ms. Kristin Guardino and Mr. Leonard Guardino because no response has been filed by the appellees and the motion for stay has already been denied. [22-20247] (SDH) [Entered: 06/02/2022 03:55 PM]
June 1, 2022 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Ms. Kristin Guardino and Mr. Leonard Guardino for leave to file electronically as a pro se party [9860285-2]. Date of service: 05/31/2022 [22-20247] (SDH) [Entered: 06/02/2022 07:56 AM]
June 1, 2022 MOTION filed by Appellants Ms. Kristin Guardino and Mr. Leonard Guardino for stay pending appeal [9860148-2] Ruling is requested by: 06/03/2022. Date of service: 05/31/2022 [22-20247] (SDH) [Entered: 06/01/2022 04:14 PM]
June 1, 2022 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. Kristin Guardino and Mr. Leonard Guardino advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [22-20247] (SDH) [Entered: 06/02/2022 08:07 AM]
June 1, 2022 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance forms and statement of representation received from Appellants Ms. Kristin Guardino and Mr. Leonard Guardino because these documents are unnecessary for pro se parties. [22-20247] (SDH) [Entered: 06/02/2022 08:14 AM]
May 24, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9854316-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 06/08/2022 for Appellants Kristin Guardino and Leonard Guardino [22-20247] (ABT) [Entered: 05/24/2022 12:25 PM]
May 20, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Kristin Guardino and Mr. Leonard Guardino [22-20247] (RLL) [Entered: 05/20/2022 10:20 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Flitsch v. Guardino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Flitsch
Represented By: Steven C. Earl Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carolyn S. Clark
Represented By: Steven C. Earl Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Kristin Guardino, J.D.
Represented By: Kristin Guardino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Leonard Guardino
Represented By: Leonard Guardino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?