Guardino v. Hart
Plaintiff / Appellant: Kristin Guardino
Defendant / Appellee: Jim Hart, Sean H. McCarthy, John Eddie Williams, Jr., Williams Kherkher Hart & Boundas L.L.P., WKHB L.L.C., Williams Kherkher L.L.C., Williams BHE L.L.C., Williams HBE L.L.C. and Williams Hart Boundas Easterby L.L.P.
Case Number: 22-20278
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: RICO
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2022 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. [22-20278] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Ms. Kristin Guardino. Date of service: 08/02/2022 via email - Appellant Guardino; Attorney for Appellee: Shepherd [22-20278] (Kristin Guardino ) [Entered: 08/02/2022 05:39 PM]
August 2, 2022 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 09/01/2022 for Appellees Jim Hart, Sean H. McCarthy, WKHB L.L.C., John Eddie Williams Jr., Williams BHE L.L.C., Williams HBE L.L.C., Williams Hart Boundas Easterby L.L.P., Williams Kherkher Hart & Boundas L.L.P. and Williams Kherkher L.L.C. [22-20278] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Kristin Guardino. Date of service: 08/02/2022 via email - Appellant Guardino; Attorney for Appellee: Shepherd [22-20278] (Kristin Guardino ) [Entered: 08/02/2022 05:35 PM]
July 20, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. George William Shepherd, III for Mr. Jim Hart, Sean H. McCarthy, Williams BHE L.L.C., Williams Hart Boundas Easterby L.L.P., Williams HBE L.L.C., Williams Kherkher Hart & Boundas L.L.P., Williams Kherkher L.L.C., John Eddie Williams, Jr. and WKHB L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-20278] (George William Shepherd III) [Entered: 07/20/2022 01:37 PM]
July 20, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney George William Shepherd III for Appellee Williams Hart Boundas Easterby L.L.P. in 22-20278, Attorney George William Shepherd III for Appellee Williams HBE L.L.C. in 22-20278, Attorney George William Shepherd III for Appellee Williams BHE L.L.C. in 22-20278, Attorney George William Shepherd III for Appellee Williams Kherkher L.L.C. in 22-20278, Attorney George William Shepherd III for Appellee WKHB L.L.C. in 22-20278, Attorney George William Shepherd III for Appellee Williams Kherkher Hart & Boundas L.L.P. in 22-20278, Attorney George William Shepherd III for Appellee John Eddie Williams Jr. in 22-20278, Attorney George William Shepherd III for Appellee Sean H. McCarthy in 22-20278, Attorney George William Shepherd III for Appellee Jim Hart in 22-20278 [22-20278] (ABT) [Entered: 07/20/2022 02:46 PM]
June 24, 2022 CLERK ORDER granting Motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Ms. Kristin Guardino [ # 9877043-2 ] [22-20278] (CCR) [Entered: 06/24/2022 10:40 AM]
June 23, 2022 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/02/2022 for Appellant Kristin Guardino. [22-20278] (DDL) [Entered: 06/23/2022 03:45 PM]
June 23, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-20278] (DDL) [Entered: 06/23/2022 03:44 PM]
June 23, 2022 MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Kristin Guardino for leave to file electronically as a pro se party [9877043-2]. Date of service: 06/21/2022 [22-20278] (CCR) [Entered: 06/23/2022 01:30 PM]
June 23, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:21-CV-3721. Electronic ROA due on 07/08/2022. [22-20278] (RLL) [Entered: 06/23/2022 09:03 AM]
June 22, 2022 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Kristin Guardino advising transcript unnecessary - no hearings to be transcribed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. [22-20278] (RLL) [Entered: 06/23/2022 09:02 AM]
June 14, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9869404-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 06/29/2022 for Appellant Kristin Guardino [22-20278] (SDH) [Entered: 06/14/2022 08:13 AM]
June 10, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Kristin Guardino [22-20278] (ABT) [Entered: 06/10/2022 12:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Guardino v. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kristin Guardino
Represented By: Kristin Guardino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jim Hart
Represented By: George William Shepherd III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sean H. McCarthy
Represented By: George William Shepherd III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Eddie Williams, Jr.
Represented By: George William Shepherd III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Williams Kherkher Hart & Boundas L.L.P.
Represented By: George William Shepherd III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WKHB L.L.C.
Represented By: George William Shepherd III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Williams Kherkher L.L.C.
Represented By: George William Shepherd III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Williams BHE L.L.C.
Represented By: George William Shepherd III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Williams HBE L.L.C.
Represented By: George William Shepherd III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Williams Hart Boundas Easterby L.L.P.
Represented By: George William Shepherd III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?