Torrey v. Infectious Diseases Socty
Plaintiff / Appellant: Lisa Torrey, Kathryn Kocurek, Individually and on behalf of the Estate of J. David Kocurek, Ph.D., Amy Hanneken, Jane Powell, Carol Fisch, John Valerio, Individually and as Next Friend of Christopher Valerio, Randy Sykes, Brienna Reed, Rosetta Fuller, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Jessica McKinnie, Kristine Woodard, Gayle Clarke, Allison Lynn Caruana, Chloe Lohmeyer, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Individually and as Next Friend of Monet Pitre, Mike Peacher, Individually and as Next Friend of Ashleigh Peacher and Alarie Bowerman, Individually and as Next Friend of Elisa Bowerman, Emory Bowerman and Anais Bowerman
Defendant / Appellee: Infectious Diseases Society of America
Case Number: 22-40728
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: RICO
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2022 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/09/2023 for Appellants Alarie Bowerman, Allison Lynn Caruana, Gayle Clarke, Carol Fisch, Rosetta Fuller, Amy Hanneken, Kathryn Kocurek, Chloe Lohmeyer, Jessica McKinnie, Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mike Peacher, Jane Powell, Brienna Reed, Tawnya Dawn Smith, Randy Sykes, Lisa Torrey, John Valerio and Kristine Woodard. [22-40728] (DDL) [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:41 PM]
November 28, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-40728] (DDL) [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:41 PM]
November 21, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Alvin Bertram Dunn for Appellee Infectious Diseases Society of America in 22-40728 [22-40728] (PAC) [Entered: 11/21/2022 11:51 AM]
November 18, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Alvin Bertram Dunn for Infectious Diseases Society of America for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-40728] (Alvin Bertram Dunn ) [Entered: 11/18/2022 02:58 PM]
November 16, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 5:17-CV-190. Electronic ROA due on 12/01/2022. [22-40728] (ABT) [Entered: 11/16/2022 04:19 PM]
November 16, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Alarie Bowerman in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Mike Peacher in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Tawnya Dawn Smith in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Chloe Lohmeyer in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Allison Lynn Caruana in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Gayle Clarke in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Kristine Woodard in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Jessica McKinnie in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Adriana Monteiro Moreira in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Rosetta Fuller in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Brienna Reed in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Randy Sykes in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant John Valerio in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Carol Fisch in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Jane Powell in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Amy Hanneken in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Kathryn Kocurek in 22-40728, Attorney Daniel Raymond Dutko for Appellant Lisa Torrey in 22-40728 [22-40728] (ABT) [Entered: 11/16/2022 04:18 PM]
November 16, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Daniel Raymond Dutko for Ms. Alarie Bowerman, Ms. Allison Lynn Caruana, Mr. Gayle Clarke, Ms. Carol Fisch, Ms. Rosetta Fuller, Ms. Amy Hanneken, Ms. Kathryn Kocurek, Ms. Chloe Lohmeyer, Ms. Jessica McKinnie, Ms. Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mr. Mike Peacher, Ms. Jane Powell, Ms. Brienna Reed, Ms. Tawnya Dawn Smith, Mr. Randy Sykes, Ms. Lisa Torrey, Mr. John Valerio and Ms. Kristine Woodard for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-40728] (Daniel Raymond Dutko ) [Entered: 11/16/2022 03:00 PM]
November 16, 2022 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. Alarie Bowerman, Ms. Allison Lynn Caruana, Mr. Gayle Clarke, Ms. Carol Fisch, Ms. Rosetta Fuller, Ms. Amy Hanneken, Ms. Kathryn Kocurek, Ms. Chloe Lohmeyer, Ms. Jessica McKinnie, Ms. Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mr. Mike Peacher, Ms. Jane Powell, Ms. Brienna Reed, Ms. Tawnya Dawn Smith, Mr. Randy Sykes, Ms. Lisa Torrey, Mr. John Valerio and Ms. Kristine Woodard advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [22-40728] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. Alarie Bowerman, Ms. Allison Lynn Caruana, Mr. Gayle Clarke, Ms. Carol Fisch, Ms. Rosetta Fuller, Ms. Amy Hanneken, Ms. Kathryn Kocurek, Ms. Chloe Lohmeyer, Ms. Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mr. Mike Peacher, Ms. Jane Powell, Ms. Brienna Reed, Ms. Tawnya Dawn Smith, Mr. Randy Sykes, Ms. Lisa Torrey, Mr. John Valerio and Ms. Kristine Woodard advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 11/16/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Dunn; Attorney for Appellant: Dutko [22-40728] (Daniel Raymond Dutko ) [Entered: 11/16/2022 03:04 PM]
November 7, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9978277-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-40728] (CCR) [Entered: 11/07/2022 03:26 PM]
November 4, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Alarie Bowerman, Ms. Allison Lynn Caruana, Mr. Gayle Clarke, Ms. Carol Fisch, Ms. Rosetta Fuller, Ms. Amy Hanneken, Ms. Kathryn Kocurek, Ms. Chloe Lohmeyer, Ms. Jessica McKinnie, Ms. Adriana Monteiro Moreira, Mr. Mike Peacher, Ms. Jane Powell, Ms. Brienna Reed, Ms. Tawnya Dawn Smith, Mr. Randy Sykes, Ms. Lisa Torrey, Mr. John Valerio and Ms. Kristine Woodard [22-40728] (CCR) [Entered: 11/04/2022 09:08 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Torrey v. Infectious Diseases Socty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lisa Torrey
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kathryn Kocurek, Individually and on behalf of the Estate of J. David Kocurek, Ph.D.
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Amy Hanneken
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jane Powell
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Carol Fisch
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Valerio, Individually and as Next Friend of Christopher Valerio
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Randy Sykes
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brienna Reed
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rosetta Fuller
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Adriana Monteiro Moreira
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jessica McKinnie
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kristine Woodard
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gayle Clarke
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Allison Lynn Caruana
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chloe Lohmeyer
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tawnya Dawn Smith, Individually and as Next Friend of Monet Pitre
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mike Peacher, Individually and as Next Friend of Ashleigh Peacher
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alarie Bowerman, Individually and as Next Friend of Elisa Bowerman, Emory Bowerman and Anais Bowerman
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Infectious Diseases Society of America
Represented By: Alvin Bertram Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?