McCray v. State of Texas
Plaintiff / Appellant: Donald Ray McCray
Defendant / Appellee: State of Texas, Texas Department of Criminal Justice Institutional Division, Texas Potter County and Texas 7th Court of Appeals Clerk Vivian Long
Case Number: 23-10308
Filed: March 29, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2023 Filing 7 CLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to pay fee [7] [23-10308] (MVM) [Entered: 05/11/2023 10:31 AM]
April 26, 2023 Filing 6 IN ACCORDANCE WITH 5TH CIRCUIT RULE 42.3.1, the appeal is subject to dismissal in 15 days for failure to comply with the initial written deadline. Fee deadline updated to 05/05/2023 for Appellant Donald Ray McCray [23-10308] (MVM) [Entered: 04/26/2023 09:48 AM]
April 5, 2023 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Review after Fee Issue is Resolved (PLRA case). [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Fee due on 04/20/2023 for Appellant Donald Ray McCray. [23-10308] (SEP) [Entered: 04/05/2023 12:56 PM]
March 29, 2023 Filing 1 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Donald Ray McCray [23-10308] (CAS) [Entered: 03/29/2023 10:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: McCray v. State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Donald Ray McCray
Represented By: Donald Ray McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Texas Department of Criminal Justice Institutional Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Texas Potter County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Texas 7th Court of Appeals Clerk Vivian Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?