Horak v. U.S. Citizenship and Img Svc
Plaintiff / Appellant: Isimeme Anita Horak
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 23-10437
Filed: April 27, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Ntrlztn Aplctn, Ptn - Hrg of Denial
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2023 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Isimeme Anita Horak. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Pamela Jo Wilson, Proceeding Type and Date: Hearing 04/10/2023 - 04/11/2023. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 06/20/2023 for Pamela Wilson, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 18 ] [23-10437] (MBC) [Entered: 06/07/2023 10:26 AM]
June 7, 2023 Filing 18 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Ms. Isimeme Anita Horakfor the Court to process. Date of service: 06/07/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Asekun; Attorney for Appellee: Padis. [23-10437] (Olusegun Asekun ) [Entered: 06/07/2023 10:05 AM]
May 12, 2023 Filing 17 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney George M. Padis for Appellee U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services in 23-10437 [23-10437] (PAC) [Entered: 05/12/2023 08:49 AM]
May 11, 2023 Filing 16 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. George M. Padis for U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [23-10437] (George M. Padis ) [Entered: 05/11/2023 03:46 PM]
May 10, 2023 Filing 14 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Olusegun Asekun for Appellant Isimeme Anita Horak in 23-10437 [23-10437] (MRW) [Entered: 05/10/2023 03:18 PM]
May 9, 2023 Filing 12 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Olusegun Asekun, Ph. D. for Ms. Isimeme Anita Horak for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [23-10437] (Olusegun Asekun ) [Entered: 05/09/2023 05:51 PM]
May 9, 2023 Filing 11 Attorney Mr. Olusegun Asekun, Ph. D. for Appellant Ms. Isimeme Anita Horak is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: No signature on signature line on appearance form. [23-10437] (LBM) [Entered: 05/09/2023 03:24 PM]
May 8, 2023 Filing 10 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Olusegun Asekun for Ms. Isimeme Anita Horak for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [23-10437] (Olusegun Asekun ) [Entered: 05/08/2023 05:47 PM]
May 8, 2023 Filing 9 Attorney Mr. Olusegun Asekun for Appellant Ms. Isimeme Anita Horak is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: No signature on appearance form; Also the cell phone number on the appearance form differs from what is listed in PACER. [23-10437] (LBM) [Entered: 05/08/2023 01:08 PM]
May 6, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Ms. Isimeme Anita Horakfor the Court to process. Date of service: 05/06/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Asekun; Attorney for Appellee: Padis. [23-10437] (Olusegun Asekun ) [Entered: 05/06/2023 06:20 PM]
May 5, 2023 Filing 6 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [6] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [23-10437] (MBC) [Entered: 05/05/2023 03:31 PM]
May 5, 2023 Filing 5 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Olusegun Asekun for Ms. Isimeme Anita Horak for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [23-10437] (Olusegun Asekun ) [Entered: 05/05/2023 02:24 PM]
April 27, 2023 Filing 1 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Isimeme Anita Horak [23-10437] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/27/2023 02:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Horak v. U.S. Citizenship and Img Svc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Isimeme Anita Horak
Represented By: Olusegun Asekun
Represented By: Olusegun Asekun Ph. D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: George M. Padis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?