QBE Syndicate 1036 v. Compass Minerals
Plaintiff / Appellant: QBE Syndicate 1036
Defendant / Appellee: Compass Minerals Louisiana, Incorporated
Case Number: 23-30076
Filed: February 2, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 12, 2023 Summary QBE Syndicate 1036 v. Compass Minerals

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Filing 33 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) John Dennis Person for party(s) Appellee Compass Minerals Louisiana, Incorporated, in case 23-30076 [23-30076] (AGL) [Entered: 03/16/2023 02:27 PM]
March 16, 2023 Filing 32 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-30076] (John Dennis Person ) [Entered: 03/16/2023 09:27 AM]
March 16, 2023 Filing 31 SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 6:20-CV-554. Supplemental Electronic ROA due on 03/31/2023. [23-30076] (AGL) [Entered: 03/16/2023 09:13 AM]
March 16, 2023 Filing 30 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [30] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [23-30076] (AGL) [Entered: 03/16/2023 09:08 AM]
March 10, 2023 Filing 26 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [26] NOA filed by Appellant QBE Syndicate 1036. [26] [23-30076] (AGL) [Entered: 03/10/2023 11:41 AM]
February 27, 2023 Filing 24 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Dominic J. Gianna for party(s) Appellee Compass Minerals Louisiana, Incorporated, in case 23-30076 [23-30076] (MAS) [Entered: 02/27/2023 04:49 PM]
February 23, 2023 Filing 23 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [23-30076] (Dominic J. Gianna ) [Entered: 02/23/2023 03:22 PM]
February 23, 2023 Filing 21 BRIEFING RESUMED with special issues to be briefed. A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/04/2023 for Appellant QBE Syndicate 1036. [23-30076] (MAS) [Entered: 02/23/2023 01:25 PM]
February 23, 2023 Filing 18 BRIEFING SUSPENDED - special issue to briefing is required. A/Pet's Brief deadline canceled [23-30076] (MAS) [Entered: 02/23/2023 01:20 PM]
February 16, 2023 Filing 17 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/28/2023 for Appellant QBE Syndicate 1036. [23-30076] (DDL) [Entered: 02/16/2023 04:24 PM]
February 16, 2023 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [23-30076] (DDL) [Entered: 02/16/2023 04:23 PM]
February 15, 2023 Filing 14 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Ashley Ward Hinton for party(s) Appellant QBE Syndicate 1036, in case 23-30076 [23-30076] (MAS) [Entered: 02/15/2023 01:56 PM]
February 13, 2023 Filing 13 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-30076] (Ashley Ward Hinton ) [Entered: 02/13/2023 12:21 PM]
February 10, 2023 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary No hearings [23-30076] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant QBE Syndicate 1036 advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 02/10/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Calhoun, Grabill; Attorney for Appellee: Rainer [23-30076] (Jeremy Thomas Grabill ) [Entered: 02/10/2023 10:04 AM]
February 9, 2023 Filing 10 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Lindsay J. Calhoun for party(s) Appellant QBE Syndicate 1036, in case 23-30076 [23-30076] (MAS) [Entered: 02/09/2023 04:56 PM]
February 9, 2023 Filing 9 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jeremy Thomas Grabill for Appellant QBE Syndicate 1036 in 23-30076 [23-30076] (MAS) [Entered: 02/09/2023 01:58 PM]
February 8, 2023 Filing 8 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [23-30076] (Lindsay J. Calhoun ) [Entered: 02/08/2023 02:57 PM]
February 8, 2023 Filing 7 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jeremy Thomas Grabill for QBE Syndicate 1036 for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [23-30076] (Jeremy Thomas Grabill ) [Entered: 02/08/2023 02:07 PM]
February 6, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 6:20-CV-554. Electronic ROA due on 02/22/2023. [23-30076] (AGL) [Entered: 02/06/2023 11:11 AM]
February 6, 2023 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [23-30076] (AGL) [Entered: 02/06/2023 11:08 AM]
February 2, 2023 Filing 1 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant QBE Syndicate 1036 [23-30076] (AGL) [Entered: 02/02/2023 10:39 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: QBE Syndicate 1036 v. Compass Minerals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: QBE Syndicate 1036
Represented By: Jeremy Thomas Grabill
Represented By: Lindsay J. Calhoun
Represented By: Ashley Ward Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Compass Minerals Louisiana, Incorporated
Represented By: Anna Aileen Rainer
Represented By: Dominic J. Gianna Esq.
Represented By: John Dennis Person Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?