Martin v. Busby
Plaintiff / Appellant: Daniel Neal Martin
Defendant / Appellee: Sheriff Larry Busby, Charlie Stroleny, Chief Deputy, Deputy Nowlan, Deputy Peerman and Deputy Salinas
Case Number: 23-40017
Filed: January 12, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No [23-40017] (DDL) [Entered: 03/03/2023 07:41 AM]
February 14, 2023 Filing 11 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief due on 03/27/2023 for Appellant Daniel Neal Martin. [22-40725, 23-40017] (DLM) [Entered: 02/14/2023 10:02 AM]
February 14, 2023 Filing 10 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to consolidate cases filed by Appellant Mr. Daniel Neal Martin [ # 6 ] in 23-40017 [23-40017, 22-40725] (DLM) [Entered: 02/14/2023 09:52 AM]
February 9, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Daniel Neal Martin to consolidate cases 22-40725, 23-40017 for briefing purposes. Date of service: 01/25/2023 [23-40017] (DLM) [Entered: 02/13/2023 03:20 PM]
January 17, 2023 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 03/13/2023 for Appellant Daniel Neal Martin [23-40017] (CCR) [Entered: 01/17/2023 01:53 PM]
January 12, 2023 Filing 1 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Daniel Neal Martin [23-40017] (CCR) [Entered: 01/12/2023 12:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Martin v. Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Daniel Neal Martin
Represented By: Daniel Neal Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sheriff Larry Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Charlie Stroleny, Chief Deputy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deputy Nowlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deputy Peerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deputy Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?