Cheejati v. Blinken
Plaintiff / Appellant: Ashok Kumar Cheejati, Karthik Rajashekaran, Nishant Mathur, Haragopal Chakravarthy and Seshu Gavara
Defendant / Appellee: Antony Blinken, Secretary, U.S. Department of State and Ur M. Jaddou, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 23-40398
Filed: July 7, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: - Other Immigration Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 9, 2024 Summary Cheejati v. Blinken

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2023 Filing 16 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 (PAPER COPIES NOT REQUESTED AT THIS TIME). [23-40398] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Mr. Haragopal Chakravarthy, Mr. Ashok Kumar Cheejati, Mr. Seshu Gavara, Mr. Nishant Mathur and Mr. Karthik Rajashekaran. Date of service: 08/30/2023 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Banias; Attorney for Appellees: Faso, Gillingham [23-40398] (Bradley Bruce Banias ) [Entered: 08/30/2023 07:53 AM]
August 16, 2023 Filing 15 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/25/2023 for Appellants Haragopal Chakravarthy, Ashok Kumar Cheejati, Seshu Gavara, Nishant Mathur and Karthik Rajashekaran. [23-40398] (DDL) [Entered: 08/16/2023 10:52 AM]
August 16, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [23-40398] (DDL) [Entered: 08/16/2023 10:52 AM]
August 8, 2023 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:23-CV-600. Electronic ROA due on 08/23/2023. [23-40398] (DLJ) [Entered: 08/08/2023 10:28 AM]
July 19, 2023 Filing 10 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Alessandra Faso for party(s) Appellee Ur M. Jaddou, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Appellee Antony Blinken, Secretary, U.S. Department of State, in case 23-40398 [23-40398] (ABT) [Entered: 07/19/2023 11:21 AM]
July 17, 2023 Filing 9 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [23-40398] (Alessandra Faso ) [Entered: 07/17/2023 02:00 PM]
July 17, 2023 Filing 7 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [7] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 08/01/2023 for Appellants Haragopal Chakravarthy, Ashok Kumar Cheejati, Seshu Gavara, Nishant Mathur and Karthik Rajashekaran [23-40398] (ABT) [Entered: 07/17/2023 10:43 AM]
July 10, 2023 Filing 8 PARTY LIMIT CASE. (FOR A FULL LIST OF PARTIES FOR THIS APPEAL, PLEASE REFER TO THE DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET SHEET.) [23-40398] (ABT) [Entered: 07/17/2023 10:47 AM]
July 10, 2023 Filing 4 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Bradley Bruce Banias for Appellant Seshu Gavara in 23-40398, Attorney Bradley Bruce Banias for Appellant Haragopal Chakravarthy in 23-40398, Attorney Bradley Bruce Banias for Appellant Nishant Mathur in 23-40398, Attorney Bradley Bruce Banias for Appellant Karthik Rajashekaran in 23-40398, Attorney Bradley Bruce Banias for Appellant Ashok Kumar Cheejati in 23-40398 [23-40398] (ABT) [Entered: 07/10/2023 03:09 PM]
July 9, 2023 Filing 2 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Bradley Bruce Banias, Esq. for Mr. Haragopal Chakravarthy, Mr. Ashok Kumar Cheejati, Mr. Seshu Gavara, Mr. Nishant Mathur and Mr. Karthik Rajashekaran for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [23-40398] (Bradley Bruce Banias ) [Entered: 07/09/2023 09:20 PM]
July 7, 2023 Filing 1 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Haragopal Chakravarthy, Mr. Ashok Kumar Cheejati, Mr. Seshu Gavara, Mr. Nishant Mathur and Mr. Karthik Rajashekaran [23-40398] (ABT) [Entered: 07/07/2023 04:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Cheejati v. Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ashok Kumar Cheejati
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Karthik Rajashekaran
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nishant Mathur
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Haragopal Chakravarthy
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Seshu Gavara
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Antony Blinken, Secretary, U.S. Department of State
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Represented By: Alessandra Faso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ur M. Jaddou, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Represented By: Alessandra Faso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?