Angelina Emergency Med v. Blue Cross
Plaintiff: Angelina Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Atascosa Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Athens Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Bluff Creek Emergency Medicine Associates, PA and Brewster Emergency Medicine Associates PA
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, USAble Mutual Insurance Company, doing business as Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health, doing business as Anthem Blue Cross, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Services, doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Colorado, Highmark BCBSD Incorporated, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Incorporated, Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia Incorporated, Wellmark, Incorporated, doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Iowa, doing business as Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Incorporated, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, RightCHOICE Managed Care incorporated, Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, HMO Missouri Incorporated, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, A Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Incorporated, Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota, Empire HealthChoice Assurance Incorporated, Empire HealthChoice HMO Incorporated, HealthNow New York Incorporated, Community Insurance Company, doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Ohio, Highmark Incorporated, Wellmark of South Dakota Incorporated, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Incorporated and Premera Blue Cross
Case Number: 24-10306
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement (E.R.I.S.A.)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Filing 35 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Amy Kathleen Anderson for party(s) Appellee Highmark Incorporated Appellee Premera Blue Cross Appellee Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi Appellee Wellmark, Incorporated Appellee Highmark BCBSD Incorporated Appellee Wellmark of South Dakota Incorporated Appellee USAble Mutual Insurance Company, in case 24-10306 [24-10306] (RA) [Entered: 06/06/2024 02:02 PM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 33 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael Christopher Drew for party(s) Appellee Highmark Incorporated Appellee Premera Blue Cross Appellee Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi Appellee Wellmark, Incorporated Appellee Highmark BCBSD Incorporated Appellee Wellmark of South Dakota Incorporated Appellee USAble Mutual Insurance Company, in case 24-10306 [24-10306] (RA) [Entered: 06/06/2024 10:02 AM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 32 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Covert James Geary for Appellee Premera Blue Cross in 24-10306, Attorney Covert James Geary for Appellee Wellmark of South Dakota Incorporated in 24-10306, Attorney Covert James Geary for Appellee Highmark Incorporated in 24-10306, Attorney Covert James Geary for Appellee Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi in 24-10306, Attorney Covert James Geary for Appellee Wellmark, Incorporated in 24-10306, Attorney Covert James Geary for Appellee Highmark BCBSD Incorporated in 24-10306, Attorney Covert James Geary for Appellee USAble Mutual Insurance Company in 24-10306 [24-10306] (RA) [Entered: 06/06/2024 09:47 AM]
June 5, 2024 Filing 31 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-10306] (Amy Kathleen Anderson ) [Entered: 06/05/2024 05:09 PM]
June 5, 2024 Filing 30 Attorney Amy K. Anderson is advised to resubmit an appearance form to include current office address and telephone number. [24-10306] (LBM) [Entered: 06/05/2024 04:17 PM]
June 5, 2024 Filing 29 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Thomas Charles Hardy for Appellee Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota in 24-10306, Attorney Thomas Charles Hardy for Appellee Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Incorporated in 24-10306, Attorney Thomas Charles Hardy for Appellee Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City in 24-10306 [24-10306] (RA) [Entered: 06/05/2024 01:46 PM]
June 5, 2024 Filing 28 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-10306] (Amy Kathleen Anderson ) [Entered: 06/05/2024 11:44 AM]
June 5, 2024 Filing 27 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-10306] (Michael Christopher Drew ) [Entered: 06/05/2024 11:30 AM]
June 5, 2024 Filing 26 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Covert James Geary for Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, Highmark BCBSD Incorporated, Highmark Incorporated, Premera Blue Cross, USAble Mutual Insurance Company, Wellmark of South Dakota Incorporated and Wellmark, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-10306] (Covert James Geary ) [Entered: 06/05/2024 10:27 AM]
June 4, 2024 Filing 25 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Thomas Charles Hardy for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Incorporated and Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-10306] (Thomas Charles Hardy ) [Entered: 06/04/2024 12:24 PM]
May 28, 2024 Filing 24 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/08/2024 for Appellants Angelina Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Atascosa Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Athens Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Bluff Creek Emergency Medicine Associates, PA and Brewster Emergency Medicine Associates PA. [24-10306] (DDL) [Entered: 05/28/2024 01:13 PM]
May 28, 2024 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [24-10306] (DDL) [Entered: 05/28/2024 01:11 PM]
May 16, 2024 Filing 20 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jennifer S. Lewin for party(s) Appellant Angelina Emergency Medicine Associates PA Appellant Athens Emergency Medicine Associates PA Appellant Brewster Emergency Medicine Associates PA Appellant Atascosa Emergency Medicine Associates PA Appellant Bluff Creek Emergency Medicine Associates, PA, in case 24-10306 [24-10306] (AMD) [Entered: 05/16/2024 10:21 AM]
May 16, 2024 Filing 19 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney James Walton Boswell III for Appellant Brewster Emergency Medicine Associates PA in 24-10306, Attorney James Walton Boswell III for Appellant Bluff Creek Emergency Medicine Associates, PA in 24-10306, Attorney James Walton Boswell III for Appellant Athens Emergency Medicine Associates PA in 24-10306, Attorney James Walton Boswell III for Appellant Atascosa Emergency Medicine Associates PA in 24-10306, Attorney James Walton Boswell III for Appellant Angelina Emergency Medicine Associates PA in 24-10306 [24-10306] (AMD) [Entered: 05/16/2024 10:15 AM]
May 14, 2024 Filing 18 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. James Walton Boswell, III for Angelina Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Atascosa Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Athens Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Bluff Creek Emergency Medicine Associates, PA and Brewster Emergency Medicine Associates PA for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-10306] (James Walton Boswell III) [Entered: 05/14/2024 03:15 PM]
May 14, 2024 Filing 17 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-10306] (Jennifer S. Lewin ) [Entered: 05/14/2024 02:56 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:18-CV-425. Electronic ROA due on 05/15/2024. [24-10306] (PAC) [Entered: 04/30/2024 08:38 AM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Angelina Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Atascosa Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Athens Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Bluff Creek Emergency Medicine Associates, PA and Brewster Emergency Medicine Associates PA advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [24-10306] (PAC) [Entered: 04/30/2024 08:37 AM]
April 29, 2024 Filing 14 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Angelina Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Atascosa Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Athens Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Bluff Creek Emergency Medicine Associates, PA and Brewster Emergency Medicine Associates PAfor the Court to process. Date of service: 04/29/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Boswell, Galloway, Voigts; Attorney for Appellees: Boyce, Brauer, Cross, Geary, Hardy, Herman, Hill; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Murphy; Attorney for Appellee: Pegg. [24-10306] (Anne M. Voigts ) [Entered: 04/29/2024 03:00 PM]
April 26, 2024 Filing 12 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Anne M. Voigts for party(s) Appellant Angelina Emergency Medicine Associates PA Appellant Athens Emergency Medicine Associates PA Appellant Brewster Emergency Medicine Associates PA Appellant Atascosa Emergency Medicine Associates PA Appellant Bluff Creek Emergency Medicine Associates, PA, in case 24-10306 [24-10306] (TNM) [Entered: 04/26/2024 01:46 PM]
April 25, 2024 Filing 11 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-10306] (Anne M. Voigts ) [Entered: 04/25/2024 05:37 PM]
April 16, 2024 Filing 9 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jonathan M. Herman for Appellee HealthNow New York Incorporated in 24-10306, Attorney Jonathan M. Herman for Appellee Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama in 24-10306 [24-10306] (RSM) [Entered: 04/16/2024 03:14 PM]
April 15, 2024 Filing 8 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-10306] (Jonathan M. Herman ) [Entered: 04/15/2024 01:59 PM]
April 12, 2024 Filing 7 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [7] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/29/2024 for Appellants Angelina Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Atascosa Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Athens Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Bluff Creek Emergency Medicine Associates, PA and Brewster Emergency Medicine Associates PA [24-10306] (RSM) [Entered: 04/12/2024 08:34 AM]
April 8, 2024 Filing 3 PARTY LIMIT CASE. (FOR A FULL LIST OF PARTIES FOR THIS APPEAL, PLEASE REFER TO THE DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET SHEET.) [24-10306] (MFY) [Entered: 04/08/2024 09:12 AM]
April 8, 2024 Filing 1 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Angelina Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Atascosa Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Athens Emergency Medicine Associates PA, Bluff Creek Emergency Medicine Associates, PA and Brewster Emergency Medicine Associates PA [24-10306] (MFY) [Entered: 04/08/2024 09:10 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Angelina Emergency Med v. Blue Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Emergency Medicine Associates PA
Represented By: James Walton Boswell
Represented By: Toby Galloway
Represented By: Leslie C. Murphy
Represented By: Anne M. Voigts
Represented By: James Walton Boswell III
Represented By: Jennifer S. Lewin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atascosa Emergency Medicine Associates PA
Represented By: James Walton Boswell
Represented By: Toby Galloway
Represented By: Leslie C. Murphy
Represented By: Anne M. Voigts
Represented By: James Walton Boswell III
Represented By: Jennifer S. Lewin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Athens Emergency Medicine Associates PA
Represented By: James Walton Boswell
Represented By: Toby Galloway
Represented By: Leslie C. Murphy
Represented By: Anne M. Voigts
Represented By: James Walton Boswell III
Represented By: Jennifer S. Lewin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bluff Creek Emergency Medicine Associates, PA
Represented By: James Walton Boswell
Represented By: Toby Galloway
Represented By: Leslie C. Murphy
Represented By: Anne M. Voigts
Represented By: James Walton Boswell III
Represented By: Jennifer S. Lewin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brewster Emergency Medicine Associates PA
Represented By: James Walton Boswell
Represented By: Toby Galloway
Represented By: Leslie C. Murphy
Represented By: Anne M. Voigts
Represented By: James Walton Boswell III
Represented By: Jennifer S. Lewin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama
Represented By: Jonathan M. Herman
Represented By: Charles Wilson Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAble Mutual Insurance Company, doing business as Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Represented By: Alexander Max Douglas Brauer
Represented By: Covert James Geary
Represented By: Michael Christopher Drew Esq.
Represented By: Amy Kathleen Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health, doing business as Anthem Blue Cross
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Allen Pegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Services, doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Colorado
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Allen Pegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highmark BCBSD Incorporated
Represented By: Covert James Geary
Represented By: Michael Christopher Drew Esq.
Represented By: Amy Kathleen Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Incorporated
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Allen Pegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia Incorporated
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Allen Pegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark, Incorporated, doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Iowa, doing business as Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Represented By: Covert James Geary
Represented By: Michael Christopher Drew Esq.
Represented By: Amy Kathleen Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Incorporated
Represented By: Jason Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City
Represented By: Thomas Charles Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RightCHOICE Managed Care incorporated
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Allen Pegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Allen Pegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMO Missouri Incorporated
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Allen Pegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, A Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Covert James Geary
Represented By: Michael Christopher Drew Esq.
Represented By: Amy Kathleen Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Incorporated
Represented By: Thomas Charles Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota
Represented By: Thomas Charles Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire HealthChoice Assurance Incorporated
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Allen Pegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire HealthChoice HMO Incorporated
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Allen Pegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthNow New York Incorporated
Represented By: Jonathan M. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Insurance Company, doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Ohio
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highmark Incorporated
Represented By: Covert James Geary
Represented By: Michael Christopher Drew Esq.
Represented By: Amy Kathleen Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark of South Dakota Incorporated
Represented By: Covert James Geary
Represented By: Michael Christopher Drew Esq.
Represented By: Amy Kathleen Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Incorporated
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Represented By: Allen Pegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premera Blue Cross
Represented By: Covert James Geary
Represented By: Michael Christopher Drew Esq.
Represented By: Amy Kathleen Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?