Spencer v. Shell Exploration
Plaintiff: Tim Spencer
Defendant: Shell Exploration & Production Company
Case Number: 24-20173
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2024 Filing 25 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Weston Mumme for party(s) Appellee Shell Exploration & Production Company, in case 24-20173 [24-20173] (CCR) [Entered: 06/21/2024 02:02 PM]
June 21, 2024 Filing 24 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Anthony Joseph Campiti for Appellee Shell Exploration & Production Company in 24-20173 [24-20173] (CCR) [Entered: 06/21/2024 01:54 PM]
June 21, 2024 Filing 23 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-20173] (Weston Mumme ) [Entered: 06/21/2024 09:23 AM]
June 21, 2024 Filing 22 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Anthony Joseph Campiti for Shell Exploration & Production Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-20173] (Anthony Joseph Campiti ) [Entered: 06/21/2024 09:01 AM]
June 20, 2024 Filing 21 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/30/2024 for Appellant Tim Spencer. [24-20173] (RA) [Entered: 06/19/2024 04:00 PM]
June 20, 2024 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [24-20173] (RA) [Entered: 06/19/2024 04:00 PM]
June 11, 2024 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:22-CV-4166. Electronic ROA due on 06/26/2024. [24-20173] (CCR) [Entered: 06/11/2024 01:36 PM]
June 11, 2024 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Tim Spencer advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [24-20173] (CCR) [Entered: 06/11/2024 01:35 PM]
June 11, 2024 Filing 17 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to reopen case filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Spencer [ # 12 ] [24-20173] (CCR) [Entered: 06/11/2024 01:33 PM]
June 7, 2024 Filing 13 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kevin S. Vogeltanz for Appellant Tim Spencer in 24-20173 [24-20173] (CCR) [Entered: 06/07/2024 04:53 PM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Spencer to reopen case [12]. Date of service: 06/06/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Campiti; Attorney for Appellant: Vogeltanz [24-20173] (Kevin S. Vogeltanz ) [Entered: 06/06/2024 05:10 PM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 11 CASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for Tim Spencer in 24-20173. [24-20173] (CCR) [Entered: 06/06/2024 04:55 PM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 9 Attorney Kevin Vogeltanz added as counsel of record for Appellant Tim Spencer in 24-20173. [24-20173] (DLJ) [Entered: 06/06/2024 04:11 PM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 8 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-20173] (Kevin S. Vogeltanz ) [Entered: 06/06/2024 04:05 PM]
May 21, 2024 Filing 6 CLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter[6] [24-20173] (CCR) [Entered: 05/21/2024 11:05 AM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 05/15/2024 for Appellant Tim Spencer [24-20173] (CCR) [Entered: 04/30/2024 04:51 PM]
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Spencer. [24-20173] (DLJ) [Entered: 04/26/2024 09:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Spencer v. Shell Exploration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Spencer
Represented By: Tim Spencer
Represented By: Kevin S. Vogeltanz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Exploration & Production Company
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Campiti
Represented By: Weston Mumme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?