McGee v. Barton
Plaintiff: Dumauriea L. McGee
Defendant: Trent Barton, Assistant Warden, Marcus Jones, Major, Gabriel Hebert, Major, John Orr, Captain, John Doe (1), Nurse, Jane Doe (1), EMT, John Doe (2), EMT, Darrel Vannoy, Head Warden, Tim Hooper, Head Warden, Medical Director at Louisiana State Penitentiary, State of Louisiana through Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, LSP, Carlton Nettles, Assistant Warden, Jeremy McKey, Assistant Warden and John Doe (3), Lieutenant
Case Number: 24-30038
Filed: January 17, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 16, 2024 McGee v. Barton

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2024 Filing 19 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Phyllis Esther Glazer for party(s) Appellee Gabriel Hebert Appellee Marcus Jones Appellee John Orr Appellee Carlton Nettles Appellee Tim Hooper Appellee State of Louisiana through Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, LSP, in case 24-30038 [24-30038] (TNM) [Entered: 02/28/2024 08:28 AM]
February 27, 2024 Filing 18 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-30038] (Phyllis Esther Glazer ) [Entered: 02/27/2024 11:20 AM]
February 20, 2024 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [24-30038] (MRW) [Entered: 02/20/2024 11:58 AM]
February 20, 2024 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:22-CV-68. Electronic ROA due on 03/06/2024. [24-30038] (MRW) [Entered: 02/19/2024 11:18 AM]
February 16, 2024 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Appellant Mr. Dumauriea L. McGee in support of Motion to proceed IFP in accordance with PLRA [ # 10 ]. [11] [24-30038] (Incorporated in the Motion to Proceed IFP) (MRW) [Entered: 02/19/2024 11:17 AM]
February 16, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Dumauriea L. McGee to proceed in forma pauperis in accordance with the Prison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA) [10] Fee deadline canceled. [24-30038] (MRW) [Entered: 02/19/2024 11:13 AM]
February 8, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Dumauriea L. McGee to appoint counsel [9]. [24-30038] (MRW) [Entered: 02/08/2024 01:03 PM]
February 7, 2024 Filing 8 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 01/24/2024 denying IFP for Appellant Mr. Dumauriea L. McGee because appeal is not taken in good faith - fee assessed - BAUGH case. Fee or IFP motion to 5CCA due on 03/08/2024 for Appellant Dumauriea L. McGee [24-30038] (AGL) [Entered: 02/07/2024 08:36 AM]
January 18, 2024 Filing 7 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [7] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. [24-30038] (JJF) [Entered: 01/18/2024 03:18 PM]
January 17, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Dumauriea L. McGee [24-30038] (JJF) [Entered: 01/17/2024 11:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: McGee v. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dumauriea L. McGee
Represented By: Dumauriea L. McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Barton, Assistant Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Jones, Major
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Calecas
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Hebert, Major
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Calecas
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Orr, Captain
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Calecas
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (1), Nurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe (1), EMT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (2), EMT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy, Head Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Hooper, Head Warden
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Calecas
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Director at Louisiana State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana through Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, LSP
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Calecas
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlton Nettles, Assistant Warden
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Calecas
Represented By: Phyllis Esther Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy McKey, Assistant Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (3), Lieutenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?