Sanders v. Hooper
Petitioner: Norman A. Sanders
Respondent: Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary
Case Number: 24-30146
Filed: March 12, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prisoner Petition)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2024 Filing 12 LETTER filed by Appellant Mr. Norman A. Sanders advising that he filed his motion for ifp in the district court. [24-30146] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/18/2024 10:50 AM]
April 2, 2024 Filing 8 UPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent. [24-30146] (RA) [Entered: 04/02/2024 01:45 PM]
April 1, 2024 Filing 11 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the motion for extension of time to file brief received from Appellant Mr. Norman A. Sanders because its premature [24-30146] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/09/2024 11:43 AM]
March 14, 2024 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Awaiting COA. [24-30146] (RA) [Entered: 03/14/2024 01:36 PM]
March 12, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Norman A. Sanders [24-30146] (RA) [Entered: 03/12/2024 09:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Sanders v. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Norman A. Sanders
Represented By: Norman A. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary
Represented By: Ellen Daigle Doskey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?