Cotton v. Hooper
Petitioner: Gregory Wayne Cotton
Respondent: Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary
Case Number: 24-30149
Filed: March 13, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prisoner Petition)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2024 Filing 8 UPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent. [24-30149] (RA) [Entered: 04/03/2024 11:22 AM]
March 15, 2024 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 04/01/2024 for Appellant Gregory Wayne Cotton [24-30149] (RA) [Entered: 03/15/2024 02:39 PM]
March 13, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Gregory Wayne Cotton [24-30149] (RA) [Entered: 03/13/2024 09:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Cotton v. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Wayne Cotton
Represented By: Gregory Wayne Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?