Grace v. Hooper
Petitioner: Jessie J. Grace, III
Respondent: Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary
Case Number: 24-30218
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prisoner Petition)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Filing 78 SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:02-CV-3818. Electronic ROA due on 06/17/2024. [24-30218] (MAS) [Entered: 05/31/2024 04:18 PM]
May 31, 2024 Filing 77 COURT ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Appellant's unopposed motion to supplement the record on appeal with exhibits A, B, and C is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Appellant's unopposed motion to place exhibits B and C under seal is GRANTED. Filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary [ # 72 ]; [ # 72 ] [24-30218] (MAS) [Entered: 05/31/2024 04:15 PM]
May 30, 2024 Filing 72 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary to supplement the record on appeal with Exhibits A,B and C [72], to place Exhibits B and C under seal [72]. Date of service: 05/30/2024 [24-30218] (MAS) [Entered: 05/30/2024 04:28 PM]
May 30, 2024 Filing 71 MOTION AND/OR DOCUMENT UNDER TEMPORARY SEAL pending a ruling by the court filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State PenitentiaryThis document is unopposed. Date of service: 05/30/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Aberle; Attorney for Appellants: Aguinaga, Gray [24-30218] (Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga ) [Entered: 05/30/2024 02:10 PM]
May 30, 2024 Filing 67 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [67] to the Motion to extend the stay of proceedings in this court filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary in 24-30218 [ # 66 ] Date of Service: 05/30/2024. [24-30218] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Jessie J. Grace, III [67] to the filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary [ # 66 ] Date of Service: 05/30/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Aberle; Attorney for Appellants: Aguinaga, Gray. [24-30218] (Christopher Albert Aberle ) [Entered: 05/30/2024 10:44 AM]
May 29, 2024 Filing 66 OPPOSED MOTION to extend Administrative Stay [66]. Date of service: 05/29/2024 [24-30218] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary to extend the stay of proceedings in this court [66]. Date of service: 05/29/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Aberle; Attorney for Appellants: Aguinaga, Gray [24-30218] (Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga ) [Entered: 05/29/2024 03:56 PM]
May 28, 2024 Filing 65 COURT ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary [ # 57 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 06/04/2024 for Appellant Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary [24-30218] (MAS) [Entered: 05/28/2024 03:43 PM]
May 24, 2024 Filing 57 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary to extend time to file brief as appellant until 06/04/2024 [57]. Date of service: 05/24/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Aberle; Attorney for Appellants: Aguinaga, Gray [24-30218] (Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga ) [Entered: 05/24/2024 03:56 PM]
May 22, 2024 Filing 56 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary. Extension Denied. Reason: Motion Required. Additionally, each party must ask for their own extensions. [24-30218] (SEP) [Entered: 05/24/2024 03:22 PM]
May 22, 2024 Filing 55 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary for filing Appellant's Opening Brief until 06/04/2024 [24-30218] (Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga ) [Entered: 05/22/2024 04:02 PM]
May 15, 2024 Filing 53 BRIEFING RESUMED in expedited case. A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/28/2024 for Appellant Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary. Appellee's Brief due on 06/27/2024 for Appellee Jessie J. Grace III. Reply Brief due on 07/18/2024 for Appellant Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary. Paper copies will be requested once each brief is accepted. [24-30218] (WMJ) [Entered: 05/15/2024 12:33 PM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 50 LETTER filed by Appellee Mr. Jessie J. Grace, III referencing to expedite appeal [ # 47 ]. Date of Service: 05/07/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Aberle; Attorney for Appellants: Aguinaga, Gray [24-30218] (Christopher Albert Aberle ) [Entered: 05/07/2024 05:58 PM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 49 BRIEFING SUSPENDED - expedited, awaiting new briefing schedule. A/Pet's Brief deadline canceled [24-30218] (WMJ) [Entered: 05/07/2024 02:34 PM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 47 COURT ORDER granting Motion for administrative stay filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary [ # 34 ]; carrying with the case Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary [ # 34 ]; expediting the appeal. This temporary administrative stay will expire on its own accord 21 days from the date of this order without prejudice to any further action by the merits panel. An expedited briefing schedule will issue under separate cover. [47] [24-30218] (WMJ) [Entered: 05/07/2024 02:19 PM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 46 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [46] to the Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary in 24-30218 [ # 34 ], Motion to stay order filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary in 24-30218 [ # 34 ] [24-30218] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Jessie J. Grace, III [46] to the [ # 39 ] Date of Service: 05/07/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Aberle; Attorney for Appellants: Aguinaga, Gray. [24-30218] (Christopher Albert Aberle ) [Entered: 05/07/2024 02:09 PM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 39 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising parties to alert the court of any urgent pleadings filed after hours [24-30218] (WMJ) [Entered: 05/07/2024 09:14 AM]
May 6, 2024 Filing 34 OPPOSED MOTION for stay pending appeal [34] Ruling is requested by: 05/07/2024, to stay order of the Eastern District of Louisiana dated 04/02/2024 [34]. [24-30218] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary for stay pending appeal [34] Ruling is requested by: 05/07/2024. Date of service: 05/06/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Aberle; Attorney for Appellants: Aguinaga, Gray [24-30218] (Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga ) [Entered: 05/06/2024 11:26 PM]
April 18, 2024 Filing 31 COURT ORDER denying without prejudice Motion to expedite appeal filed by Appellee Mr. Jessie J. Grace, III [ # 11 ] [24-30218] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/18/2024 11:20 AM]
April 18, 2024 Filing 28 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/28/2024 for Appellant Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary. [24-30218] (DDL) [Entered: 04/18/2024 10:02 AM]
April 18, 2024 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes State Court Papers included? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [24-30218] (DDL) [Entered: 04/18/2024 09:58 AM]
April 12, 2024 Filing 23 REPLY filed by Appellee Mr. Jessie J. Grace, III [23] to the filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary [ # 22 ]. Date of Service: 04/12/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Aberle; Attorney for Appellants: Aguinaga, Gray. [24-30218] (Christopher Albert Aberle ) [Entered: 04/12/2024 06:14 PM]
April 12, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary [22] to the filed by Appellee Mr. Jessie J. Grace, III [ # 11 ] Date of Service: 04/12/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Aberle; Attorney for Appellants: Aguinaga, Gray. [24-30218] (Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga ) [Entered: 04/12/2024 04:27 PM]
April 12, 2024 Filing 21 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: Advising counsel to notify the Clerk's Office of any after-hours filings that may require prompt court action. [24-30218] (SEP) [Entered: 04/12/2024 03:40 PM]
April 12, 2024 Filing 18 COURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED requesting a response to the Motion to expedite appeal filed by Appellee Mr. Jessie J. Grace, III in 24-30218 [ # 11 ]. Response/Opposition due on 04/19/2024. [24-30218] (SEP) [Entered: 04/12/2024 03:33 PM]
April 12, 2024 Filing 16 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga for party(s) Appellant Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary, in case 24-30218 [24-30218] (CCR) [Entered: 04/12/2024 03:19 PM]
April 11, 2024 Filing 12 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-30218] (Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga ) [Entered: 04/11/2024 04:10 PM]
April 10, 2024 Filing 11 OPPOSED MOTION to expedite the appeal [11]. [24-30218] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Appellee Mr. Jessie J. Grace, III to expedite the appeal [11]. Date of service: 04/10/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Aberle; Attorney for Appellant: Gray [24-30218] (Christopher Albert Aberle ) [Entered: 04/10/2024 04:43 PM]
April 9, 2024 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:02-CV-3818. Electronic ROA due on 04/24/2024. [24-30218] (RA) [Entered: 04/09/2024 04:25 PM]
April 9, 2024 Filing 9 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [24-30218] (RA) [Entered: 04/09/2024 04:22 PM]
April 9, 2024 Filing 8 FEE PAID by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary. [24-30218] (RA) [Entered: 04/09/2024 04:21 PM]
April 5, 2024 Filing 6 CJA APPOINTMENT for Attorney Mr. Christopher Albert Aberle for Mr. Jessie J. Grace, III. Counsel must use the eVoucher system to file the voucher at disposition of the case. Please see the attached document for further guidance. ORIGINATING COURT DISTRICT: ELA ORIGINATING CASE NUMBER: 2:02-CV-3818 DATE OF APPOINTMENT: 04/05/2024 [24-30218] (MRW) [Entered: 04/05/2024 03:58 PM]
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary [24-30218] (MRW) [Entered: 04/05/2024 03:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Grace v. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessie J. Grace, III
Represented By: Christopher Albert Aberle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary
Represented By: John Taylor Gray
Represented By: Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?