Van Nortrick v. Hooper
Petitioner: Roy Van Nortrick
Respondent: Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary
Case Number: 24-30274
Filed: April 24, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prisoner Petition)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No State Court Papers included? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [24-30274] (MRW) [Entered: 06/06/2024 03:13 PM]
May 21, 2024 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 5:21-CV-3848. Electronic ROA due on 06/05/2024. [24-30274] (MRW) [Entered: 05/21/2024 04:38 PM]
May 21, 2024 Filing 7 LETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Motion due on 07/01/2024 for Appellant Roy Van Nortrick. Brief in Support due on 07/01/2024 for Appellant Roy Van Nortrick [24-30274] (MRW) [Entered: 05/21/2024 03:51 PM]
May 21, 2024 Filing 6 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 05/20/2024 granting IFP for Appellant Mr. Roy Van Nortrick.Fee deadline satisfied [24-30274] (MRW) [Entered: 05/21/2024 03:50 PM]
April 29, 2024 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 05/14/2024 for Appellant Roy Van Nortrick [24-30274] (RA) [Entered: 04/29/2024 04:19 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Roy Van Nortrick [24-30274] (MRW) [Entered: 04/24/2024 04:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Van Nortrick v. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roy Van Nortrick
Represented By: Roy Van Nortrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tim Hooper, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary
Represented By: Rebecca Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?