Ray v. Boone
Plaintiff: Masika Brown Ray
Defendant: Anthony Boone, Chief, Maxey Cerliano, Sheriff, City of Longview, Texas, Kyle Tucker, Officer, Leslie Sheridan, Officer, Luke Altman, Sergeant, Julia Rhyner, CPS caseworker, Jennifer Stout, CPS caseworker, Mallory Waugh-Brown, CPS supervisor, Texas Department of Family and Protective Services, State of Texas, Flowers Davis, P.L.L.C., Darren Coleman and Gregg County, Texas
Case Number: 24-40169
Filed: March 18, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Filing 25 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellee's brief filed by Appellees Gregg County, Texas and Ms. Maxey Cerliano [ # 24 ] Appellee's Brief due on 06/05/2024 for Appellees Maxey Cerliano and Gregg County, Texas [24-40169] (ABT) [Entered: 04/25/2024 02:32 PM]
April 25, 2024 Filing 24 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Ms. Maxey Cerliano and Gregg County, Texas to extend time to file brief of appellee until 06/06/2024 [24]. Date of service: 04/25/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Coleman, Davis, O'Donoghue; US mail - Appellant Ray [24-40169] (Robert Scott Davis ) [Entered: 04/25/2024 08:51 AM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 23 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellee's brief filed by Appellees City of Longview, Texas, Mr. Anthony Boone, Mr. Kyle Tucker, Ms. Leslie Sheridan and Mr. Luke Altman [ # 22 ] Appellee's Brief due on 06/05/2024 for Appellees Luke Altman, Anthony Boone, City of Longview, Texas, Leslie Sheridan and Kyle Tucker [24-40169] (ABT) [Entered: 04/24/2024 04:13 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 22 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Mr. Luke Altman, Mr. Anthony Boone, City of Longview, Texas, Ms. Leslie Sheridan and Mr. Kyle Tucker to extend time to file brief of appellee until 06/06/2024 [22]. Date of service: 04/24/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Coleman, Davis, O'Donoghue; Appellant Ray [24-40169] (Darren Keith Coleman ) [Entered: 04/24/2024 01:57 PM]
April 4, 2024 Filing 21 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Masika Brown Ray. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 05/06/2024 for Appellees Luke Altman, Anthony Boone, Maxey Cerliano, City of Longview, Texas, Gregg County, Texas, Julia Rhyner, Leslie Sheridan, State of Texas, Jennifer Stout, Texas Department of Family and Protective Services, Kyle Tucker and Mallory Waugh-Brown [24-40169] (AMD) [Entered: 04/04/2024 11:47 AM]
April 1, 2024 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [24-40169] (DDL) [Entered: 04/01/2024 10:29 AM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 18 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Robin Hill O'Donoghue for party(s) Appellee Maxey Cerliano Appellee Gregg County, Texas, in case 24-40169 [24-40169] (ABT) [Entered: 03/28/2024 03:46 PM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 17 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert Scott Davis for Appellee Gregg County, Texas in 24-40169, Attorney Robert Scott Davis for Appellee Maxey Cerliano in 24-40169 [24-40169] (AMD) [Entered: 03/28/2024 10:58 AM]
March 28, 2024 Filing 16 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Darren Keith Coleman for Appellee Luke Altman in 24-40169, Attorney Darren Keith Coleman for Appellee Leslie Sheridan in 24-40169, Attorney Darren Keith Coleman for Appellee Kyle Tucker in 24-40169, Attorney Darren Keith Coleman for Appellee City of Longview, Texas in 24-40169, Attorney Darren Keith Coleman for Appellee Anthony Boone in 24-40169 [24-40169] (AMD) [Entered: 03/28/2024 10:00 AM]
March 27, 2024 Filing 15 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief due on 05/06/2024 for Appellant Masika Brown Ray. [24-40169] (JJF) [Entered: 03/27/2024 04:25 PM]
March 27, 2024 Filing 14 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Robert Scott Davis, Esq. for Ms. Maxey Cerliano and Gregg County, Texas for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-40169] (Robert Scott Davis ) [Entered: 03/27/2024 08:23 AM]
March 27, 2024 Filing 13 Attorney Mr. Robert Scott Davis, Esq. for Appellees Gregg County, Texas and Ms. Maxey Cerliano is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [24-40169] (BF) [Entered: 03/27/2024 08:14 AM]
March 26, 2024 Filing 12 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-40169] (Robin Hill O'Donoghue ) [Entered: 03/26/2024 01:03 PM]
March 26, 2024 Filing 11 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-40169] (Robin Hill O'Donoghue ) [Entered: 03/26/2024 12:59 PM]
March 25, 2024 Filing 10 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Darren Keith Coleman, Esq. for Mr. Luke Altman, Mr. Anthony Boone, City of Longview, Texas, Ms. Leslie Sheridan and Mr. Kyle Tucker for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-40169] (Darren Keith Coleman ) [Entered: 03/25/2024 05:34 PM]
March 21, 2024 Filing 9 CASE CAPTION updated. Involvement terminated for Appellees Flowers Davis, P.L.L.C. and Darren Coleman in 24-40169. Reason: DC added the parties on the docket sheet. DC confirmed that they are not parties in the case. [24-40169] (JJF) [Entered: 03/21/2024 03:48 PM]
March 20, 2024 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:23-CV-46. Electronic ROA due on 04/04/2024. [24-40169] (JJF) [Entered: 03/20/2024 04:14 PM]
March 20, 2024 Filing 6 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [6] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [24-40169] (JJF) [Entered: 03/20/2024 04:01 PM]
March 18, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Masika Brown Ray [24-40169] (JJF) [Entered: 03/18/2024 11:18 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ray v. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masika Brown Ray
Represented By: Masika Brown Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Boone, Chief
Represented By: Darren Keith Coleman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxey Cerliano, Sheriff
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis Esq.
Represented By: Robin Hill O'Donoghue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Longview, Texas
Represented By: Darren Keith Coleman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Tucker, Officer
Represented By: Darren Keith Coleman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Sheridan, Officer
Represented By: Darren Keith Coleman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Altman, Sergeant
Represented By: Darren Keith Coleman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Rhyner, CPS caseworker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Stout, CPS caseworker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallory Waugh-Brown, CPS supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department of Family and Protective Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Davis, P.L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg County, Texas
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis Esq.
Represented By: Robin Hill O'Donoghue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?