Gomez v. Garza
Plaintiff: Adam M. Gomez, Jr.
Defendant: Eric Garza, Cameron County Sheriff, Robert Gracia, Cameron County Chief Deputy Sheriff, Cameron County and Catholic Diocese of Brownsville
Case Number: 24-40271
Filed: April 24, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2024 Filing 20 COURT ORDER granting jurisdictional recommendation to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [12]. Mandate issue date is 07/05/2024. [24-40271] (DLJ) [Entered: 06/12/2024 04:17 PM]
June 11, 2024 Filing 11 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: AA Recommendation to submit to court for jurisdictional review. Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [24-40271] (MVM) [Entered: 06/11/2024 02:14 PM]
May 8, 2024 Filing 5 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [5] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Adam M. Gomez, Jr.. [5] [24-40271] (ABT) [Entered: 05/08/2024 03:27 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 1 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Adam M. Gomez, Jr. [24-40271] (AMD) [Entered: 04/24/2024 02:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gomez v. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam M. Gomez, Jr.
Represented By: Phil A. Bellamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Garza, Cameron County Sheriff
Represented By: Daniel Nemecio Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gracia, Cameron County Chief Deputy Sheriff
Represented By: Daniel Nemecio Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron County
Represented By: Daniel Nemecio Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Diocese of Brownsville
Represented By: Minerva Inez Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?