Jackson v. Ventavia Research Group
Plaintiff: Brook Jackson
Defendant: Ventavia Research Group, L.L.C.
Intervenor: United States of America
Case Number: 24-40564
Filed: September 3, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. 3729(a))
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2024 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 1:21-CV-8. Electronic ROA due on 10/08/2024. [24-40564] (RLL) [Entered: 09/23/2024 12:22 PM]
September 23, 2024 Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. [24-40564] (RLL) [Entered: 09/23/2024 12:21 PM]
September 20, 2024 Filing 35 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Ms. Brook Jacksonfor the Court to process. Date of service: 09/20/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barnes, Friedman, Mendenhall; Attorney for Appellees: Brainin, Gillingham, Guthrie, Lockhart, Scarborough, Smith. [24-40564] (Jeremy L. Friedman ) [Entered: 09/20/2024 02:38 PM]
September 20, 2024 Filing 33 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert Edward Barnes for Appellant Brook Jackson in 24-40564 [24-40564] (TST) [Entered: 09/20/2024 08:20 AM]
September 19, 2024 Filing 32 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-40564] (Robert Edward Barnes ) [Entered: 09/19/2024 05:07 PM]
September 19, 2024 Filing 30 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jeremy L. Friedman for Appellant Brook Jackson in 24-40564 [24-40564] (TST) [Entered: 09/19/2024 03:36 PM]
September 19, 2024 Filing 29 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jeremy L. Friedman for Ms. Brook Jackson for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-40564] (Jeremy L. Friedman ) [Entered: 09/19/2024 01:10 PM]
September 18, 2024 Filing 27 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Warner Mendenhall for Appellant Brook Jackson in 24-40564 [24-40564] (TST) [Entered: 09/18/2024 02:04 PM]
September 18, 2024 Filing 26 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Warner Mendenhall for Ms. Brook Jackson for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-40564] (Warner Mendenhall ) [Entered: 09/18/2024 01:21 PM]
September 13, 2024 Filing 24 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance forms filed by Carlton E. Wessel, Andrew J. Hoffman, II, Meagan Self for Pfizer, Inc., Elai Katz for ICON, plc because because parties for which appearance is requested to be entered are not parties to the appeal. [24-40564] (RLL) [Entered: 09/16/2024 04:51 PM]
September 13, 2024 Filing 23 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Stacy Lee Brainin for Appellee Ventavia Research Group, L.L.C. in 24-40564. [24-40564] (RLL) [Entered: 09/13/2024 03:34 PM]
September 13, 2024 Filing 22 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Stacy Lee Brainin, Esq. for Ventavia Research Group, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-40564] (Stacy Lee Brainin ) [Entered: 09/13/2024 02:22 PM]
September 13, 2024 Filing 20 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Andrew W. Guthrie for Appellee Ventavia Research Group, L.L.C. in 24-40564. [24-40564] (RLL) [Entered: 09/13/2024 12:54 PM]
September 13, 2024 Filing 16 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Andrew W. Guthrie for Ventavia Research Group, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-40564] (Andrew W. Guthrie ) [Entered: 09/13/2024 11:00 AM]
September 12, 2024 Filing 14 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Charles Wylie Scarborough for party(s) Appellee USA, in case 24-40564 [24-40564] (TST) [Entered: 09/12/2024 05:11 PM]
September 12, 2024 Filing 13 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-40564] (Charles Wylie Scarborough ) [Entered: 09/12/2024 04:24 PM]
September 12, 2024 Filing 12 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney James Garland Gillingham for Appellee USA in 24-40564, [24-40564] (ABT) [Entered: 09/12/2024 12:40 PM]
September 12, 2024 Filing 11 Attorney Betty Shu Young for USA is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form (ECF #9) does not match the registered attorney. [24-40564] (ABT) [Entered: 09/12/2024 12:38 PM]
September 12, 2024 Filing 10 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. James Garland Gillingham for USA for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-40564] (James Garland Gillingham ) [Entered: 09/12/2024 11:19 AM]
September 12, 2024 Filing 9 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-40564] (Betty Shu Young ) [Entered: 09/12/2024 11:14 AM]
September 11, 2024 Filing 7 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Sarah Nicole Smith for party(s) Appellee USA, in case 24-40564 [24-40564] (TST) [Entered: 09/11/2024 11:52 AM]
September 10, 2024 Filing 6 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-40564] (Sarah Nicole Smith ) [Entered: 09/10/2024 01:58 PM]
September 5, 2024 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 09/20/2024 for Appellant Brook Jackson [24-40564] (TST) [Entered: 09/05/2024 04:48 PM]
September 3, 2024 Filing 1 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Brook Jackson. [24-40564] (DLJ) [Entered: 09/03/2024 01:42 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jackson v. Ventavia Research Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventavia Research Group, L.L.C.
Represented By: Stacy Lee Brainin Esq.
Represented By: Andrew W. Guthrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brook Jackson
Represented By: Warner Mendenhall
Represented By: Jeremy L. Friedman
Represented By: Robert Edward Barnes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Smith
Represented By: Charles Wylie Scarborough
Represented By: Michael Wayne Lockhart Esq.
Represented By: James Garland Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?