Rose v. Grappler Pressure Pumping
Plaintiff: Jacob Rose, Individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated, Derrick Boyd, Roberto Castaneda, Germayne Edmond, Steven Edmond, Jr., Keland Gipson, Reginald Hogg, Jimmy Kuhn, Sione Latu, Justin Lewis, Hector Salazar, Vehikite Taulaki, Hafoka Olie, Godfrey Williams and Teddy Woods
Defendant: Grappler Pressure Pumping, L.L.C.
Case Number: 24-50251
Filed: April 4, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Filing 27 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. Derrick Boyd, Mr. Roberto Castaneda, Mr. Germayne Edmond, Mr. Steven Edmond, Jr., Mr. Keland Gipson, Mr. Reginald Hogg, Mr. Jimmy Kuhn, Mr. Sione Latu, Mr. Justin Lewis, Mr. Hafoka Olie, Mr. Jacob Rose, Mr. Hector Salazar, Vehikite Taulaki, Mr. Godfrey Williams and Mr. Teddy Woods. Extension Granted to and including 07/10/2024. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 07/10/2024 for Appellants Derrick Boyd, Roberto Castaneda, Germayne Edmond, Steven Edmond Jr., Keland Gipson, Reginald Hogg, Jimmy Kuhn, Sione Latu, Justin Lewis, Hafoka Olie, Jacob Rose, Hector Salazar, Vehikite Taulaki, Godfrey Williams and Teddy Woods [24-50251] (GMC) [Entered: 05/31/2024 08:42 AM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 26 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/10/2024 for Appellants Derrick Boyd, Roberto Castaneda, Germayne Edmond, Steven Edmond Jr., Keland Gipson, Reginald Hogg, Jimmy Kuhn, Sione Latu, Justin Lewis, Hafoka Olie, Jacob Rose, Hector Salazar, Vehikite Taulaki, Godfrey Williams and Teddy Woods. [24-50251] (DDL) [Entered: 05/01/2024 10:35 AM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [24-50251] (DDL) [Entered: 05/01/2024 10:35 AM]
April 25, 2024 Filing 23 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney H. Brandon Jones for Appellee Grappler Pressure Pumping, L.L.C. in 24-50251 [24-50251] (RA) [Entered: 04/25/2024 04:04 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 21 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) John Thomas Wilson IV for party(s) Appellee Grappler Pressure Pumping, L.L.C., in case 24-50251 [24-50251] (AMD) [Entered: 04/24/2024 04:05 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 20 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Matthew David Stayton for party(s) Appellee Grappler Pressure Pumping, L.L.C., in case 24-50251 [24-50251] (AMD) [Entered: 04/24/2024 04:03 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 19 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Bryan Christopher Assink for party(s) Appellee Grappler Pressure Pumping, L.L.C., in case 24-50251 [24-50251] (AMD) [Entered: 04/24/2024 04:02 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 18 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-50251] (Hunter Brandon Jones ) [Entered: 04/24/2024 12:43 PM]
April 23, 2024 Filing 17 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-50251] (Bryan Christopher Assink ) [Entered: 04/23/2024 04:53 PM]
April 23, 2024 Filing 16 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-50251] (Matthew David Stayton ) [Entered: 04/23/2024 04:46 PM]
April 23, 2024 Filing 15 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-50251] (John Thomas Wilson IV) [Entered: 04/23/2024 04:41 PM]
April 19, 2024 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 7:23-CV-126. Electronic ROA due on 05/06/2024. [24-50251] (RA) [Entered: 04/19/2024 08:25 AM]
April 19, 2024 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary [24-50251] (RA) [Entered: 04/19/2024 08:24 AM]
April 18, 2024 Filing 12 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. Jacob Rosefor the Court to process. Date of service: 04/18/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Hesse, Moore; Attorney for Appellee: Jones; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Jones. [24-50251] (Curt Christopher Hesse ) [Entered: 04/18/2024 02:23 PM]
April 16, 2024 Filing 10 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Teddy Woods in 24-50251, Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Godfrey Williams in 24-50251, Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Hafoka Olie in 24-50251, Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Vehikite Taulaki in 24-50251, Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Hector Salazar in 24-50251, Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Justin Lewis in 24-50251, Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Sione Latu in 24-50251, Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Jimmy Kuhn in 24-50251, Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Reginald Hogg in 24-50251, Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Keland Gipson in 24-50251, Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Steven Edmond Jr. in 24-50251, Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Germayne Edmond in 24-50251, Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Roberto Castaneda in 24-50251, Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Derrick Boyd in 24-50251, Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Jacob Rose in 24-50251 [24-50251] (RA) [Entered: 04/16/2024 04:54 PM]
April 16, 2024 Filing 9 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Melissa Ann Moore for party(s) Appellant Steven Edmond Jr. Appellant Germayne Edmond Appellant Teddy Woods Appellant Jimmy Kuhn Appellant Roberto Castaneda Appellant Keland Gipson Appellant Hafoka Olie Appellant Vehikite Taulaki Appellant Sione Latu Appellant Jacob Rose Appellant Derrick Boyd Appellant Hector Salazar Appellant Reginald Hogg Appellant Justin Lewis Appellant Godfrey Williams, in case 24-50251 [24-50251] (RA) [Entered: 04/16/2024 04:53 PM]
April 16, 2024 Filing 8 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-50251] (Melissa Ann Moore ) [Entered: 04/16/2024 09:21 AM]
April 16, 2024 Filing 7 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Curt Christopher Hesse for Mr. Derrick Boyd, Mr. Roberto Castaneda, Mr. Germayne Edmond, Mr. Steven Edmond, Jr., Mr. Keland Gipson, Mr. Reginald Hogg, Mr. Jimmy Kuhn, Mr. Sione Latu, Mr. Justin Lewis, Mr. Hafoka Olie, Mr. Jacob Rose, Mr. Hector Salazar, Vehikite Taulaki, Mr. Godfrey Williams and Mr. Teddy Woods for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-50251] (Curt Christopher Hesse ) [Entered: 04/16/2024 09:03 AM]
April 9, 2024 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [24-50251] (RA) [Entered: 04/09/2024 08:56 AM]
April 4, 2024 Filing 1 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Derrick Boyd, Mr. Roberto Castaneda, Mr. Germayne Edmond, Mr. Steven Edmond, Jr., Mr. Keland Gipson, Mr. Reginald Hogg, Mr. Jimmy Kuhn, Mr. Sione Latu, Mr. Justin Lewis, Mr. Hafoka Olie, Mr. Jacob Rose, Mr. Hector Salazar, Vehikite Taulaki, Mr. Godfrey Williams and Mr. Teddy Woods [24-50251] (RA) [Entered: 04/04/2024 03:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rose v. Grappler Pressure Pumping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Rose, Individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Boyd
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Castaneda
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Germayne Edmond
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Edmond, Jr.
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keland Gipson
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Hogg
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Kuhn
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sione Latu
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Lewis
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Salazar
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vehikite Taulaki
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hafoka Olie
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Godfrey Williams
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teddy Woods
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grappler Pressure Pumping, L.L.C.
Represented By: H. Brandon Jones
Represented By: Bryan Christopher Assink
Represented By: Matthew David Stayton
Represented By: John Thomas Wilson IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?