Graham v. Leisure Pools USA Trading
Plaintiff: Timothy Graham
Defendant: Leisure Pools USA Trading, Incorporated, doing business as Explore Industries Services USA 1
Case Number: 24-50347
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Filing 13 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Leisure Pools USA Trading, Incorporated. Extension Granted to and including 08/06/2024. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 08/06/2024 for Appellant Leisure Pools USA Trading, Incorporated [24-50347] (SB) [Entered: 06/19/2024 09:11 AM]
May 30, 2024 Filing 12 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/09/2024 for Appellant Leisure Pools USA Trading, Incorporated. [24-50347] (DDL) [Entered: 05/30/2024 01:50 PM]
May 30, 2024 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [24-50347] (DDL) [Entered: 05/30/2024 01:49 PM]
May 14, 2024 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [24-50347] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Leisure Pools USA Trading, Incorporated advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 05/14/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Busey; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Kaplan [24-50347] (Zachary B. Busey ) [Entered: 05/14/2024 02:33 PM]
May 9, 2024 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 1:23-CV-734. Electronic ROA due on 05/24/2024. [24-50347] (JJF) [Entered: 05/09/2024 01:34 PM]
May 9, 2024 Filing 7 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [7] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [24-50347] (JJF) [Entered: 05/09/2024 01:20 PM]
May 6, 2024 Filing 5 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Zachary B. Busey for Appellant Leisure Pools USA Trading, Incorporated in 24-50347 [24-50347] (ABT) [Entered: 05/06/2024 03:07 PM]
May 6, 2024 Filing 4 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-50347] (Zachary B. Busey ) [Entered: 05/06/2024 02:55 PM]
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Leisure Pools USA Trading, Incorporated [24-50347] (JJF) [Entered: 05/06/2024 11:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Graham v. Leisure Pools USA Trading
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Graham
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leisure Pools USA Trading, Incorporated, doing business as Explore Industries Services USA 1
Represented By: Zachary B. Busey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?