James Pietrangelo, II v. Sandusky Library, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellant: JAMES E. PIETRANGELO, II
Defendant - Appellee: SANDUSKY LIBRARY, TERRI ESTEL, CITY OF SANDUSKY, OHIO, RICK BRAUN, KRIS PARSONS and JIM DOE
Case Number: 10-3843
Filed: July 13, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2011 26 U.S. Supreme Court letter filed denying certiorari petition [4486546-2] filed by James E. Pietrangelo, II. Supreme Court Case No: 11-426, 12/12/2011.. (SWH)
October 7, 2011 50 U.S. Supreme Court notice filed regarding petition for writ of certiorari filed by Appellant James E. Pietrangelo, II. Supreme Court Case No:11-426, 10/04/2011. (SWH)
July 28, 2011 49 MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. (MMD)
July 6, 2011 47 Featured Case ORDER filed: AFFIRMED, pursuant to rule 34(j)(2)(c), decision not for publication pursuant to local rule 206. Ralph B. Guy , Jr.; Richard F. Suhrheinrich and Eric L. Clay, Circuit Judges. (PJE)
January 31, 2011 39 REPLY BRIEF filed by Party James E. Pietrangelo, II Copies:1. Certificate of Service:01/28/2011. (MMD)
January 17, 2011 38 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Ms. Margaret M. Koesel for Sandusky Library and Terri Estel. Certificate of Service:01/17/2011. Argument Request: requested. (MMK)
January 15, 2011 37 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. William P. Lang for City of Sandusky, Ohio, Rick Braun and Kris Parsons. Certificate of Service:01/15/2011. Argument Request: requested. (WPL)
December 15, 2010 36 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by James E. Pietrangelo, II Copies:1. Certificate of Service:12/14/2010. Argument Request: requested. (MMD)
November 4, 2010 34 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/14/2010;. appellee brief due 01/17/2011;. (MMD)
November 3, 2010 33 TRANSCRIPT ORDER completed by Court Reporter Ms. Angela Nixon for Document [25] transcript filed by Ms. Angela Nixon and Mr. William P. Lang for City of Sandusky, Ohio, Rick Braun and Kris Parsons in 10-3843. Number of Pages: 2 volumes. Date Hearing Held: 3/3/10 and 6/14/10 and filed in district court on 10/15/10 per district court docket. (KSF)
November 3, 2010 32 TRANSCRIPT ORDER completed by Court Reporter Ms. Angela Nixon for Document [21] transcript filed by Ms. Angela Nixon and Ms. Margaret M. Koesel for Sandusky Library and Terri Estel in 10-3843. Number of Pages: 3 volumes. Date Hearing Held: 1/27/10, 3/3/10 and 6/14/10 and filed in district court on 10/15/10 per district court docket. (KSF)
November 3, 2010 31 TRANSCRIPT ORDER completed by Court Reporter Ms. Angela Nixon for Document [14] transcript filed by Ms. Angela Nixon and James E. Pietrangelo, II in 10-3843. Number of Pages: 3 volumes. Date Hearing Held: 1/27/10, 3/3/10 and 6/14/10 and filed in district court on 10/15/10 per district court docket. (KSF)
October 28, 2010 27 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Terri Estel and Sandusky Library by. Certificate of Service: 10/28/2010. (NJQ)
October 14, 2010 25 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. William P. Lang for City of Sandusky, Ohio, Rick Braun and Kris Parsons; transcript ordered on 10/14/2010 from Court Reporter Ms. Angela Nixon. [25] Certificate of Service: 10/14/2010. (WPL)
August 26, 2010 21 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Ms. Margaret M. Koesel for Sandusky Library and Terri Estel; transcript ordered on 08/16/2010 from Court Reporter Ms. Angela Nixon. [21] Certificate of Service: 08/26/2010. (MMK)
August 16, 2010 20 FILED: Hearing transcript order form for Angela Nixon, Court Reporter by Ms. Margaret M. Koesel for Sandusky Library and Terri Estel. Certificate of Service: 08/16/2010. (wrong entry, counsel instructed to refile as a transcript order form with the proper relief)--[Edited 08/19/2010 by MMD] (MMK)
August 12, 2010 16 LETTER SENT to hold briefing in abeyance pending completion of transcript (MMD)
August 12, 2010 15 TRANSCRIPT ORDER financial arrangements confirmed by Ms. Angela Nixon for Document [14] transcript filed by Ms. Angela Nixon and James E. Pietrangelo, II in 10-3843. Date Made:07/26/2010; Est. pp.: 150 per notice from district court docket. (KSF)
August 12, 2010 14 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by James E. Pietrangelo, II; transcript ordered on 08/12/2010 from Court Reporter Ms. Angela Nixon. [14] Response due by 08/23/2010. (KSF)
July 28, 2010 12 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by James E. Pietrangelo, II for James E. Pietrangelo, II; transcript on file in district court (KSF)
July 23, 2010 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Margaret M. Koesel for Appellees Sandusky Library and Terri Estel Certificate of Service: 07/23/2010. (MMK)
July 23, 2010 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Sandusky Library by Margaret M. Koesel. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2010. (MMK)
July 20, 2010 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Rick Braun, City of Sandusky, Ohio and Kris Parsons by William P. Lang. Certificate of Service: 07/20/2010. (WPL)
July 13, 2010 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/23/2010;. appellee brief due 09/24/2010;. (MMD)
July 13, 2010 2 The case manager for this case is: Michelle Davis (MMD)
July 13, 2010 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant James E. Pietrangelo, II. Transcript needed: n. (MMD)

Search for this case: James Pietrangelo, II v. Sandusky Library, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: JAMES E. PIETRANGELO, II
Represented By: James E. Pietrangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: SANDUSKY LIBRARY
Represented By: Margaret M. Koesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: TERRI ESTEL
Represented By: Margaret M. Koesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: CITY OF SANDUSKY, OHIO
Represented By: William P. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: RICK BRAUN
Represented By: William P. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: KRIS PARSONS
Represented By: William P. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: JIM DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?