Cleveland Indians Baseball Com v. New Hampshire Insurance Compan, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellant: CLEVELAND INDIANS BASEBALL COMPANY, L.P.
Defendant - Appellee: NEW HAMPSHIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Third Party - Appellee: CSI INSURANCE GROUP
Case Number: 12-1589
Filed: May 11, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
August 23, 2013 Summary Cleveland Indians Baseball Co. v. NH Ins. Co.

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2012 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jeffrey Charles Gerish for Appellee New Hampshire Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 05/16/2012. (JCG)
May 16, 2012 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee New Hampshire Insurance Company by Jeffrey C. Gerish. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2012. (JCG)
May 15, 2012 5 Mediation telephone conference has been scheduled for 06/20/2012 at 2:00 pm ET with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [12-1588, 12-1589] (CAW)
May 15, 2012 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (CAW)
May 14, 2012 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee CSI Insurance Group by Trent B. Collier. Certificate of Service: 05/14/2012. (TBC)
May 11, 2012 The case manager for this case is: Jill Colyer (JC)
May 11, 2012 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Cleveland Indians Baseball Company, L.P.. Transcript needed: y. (JC)

Search for this case: Cleveland Indians Baseball Com v. New Hampshire Insurance Compan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: CLEVELAND INDIANS BASEBALL COMPANY, L.P.
Represented By: Michelle A. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: NEW HAMPSHIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Gerish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party - appellee: CSI INSURANCE GROUP
Represented By: David C. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?