Walid Jammal, et al v. American Family Ins Co, et al
Defendant / Appellant: LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN, 401K PLAN ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE, RETIREMENT PLAN FOR EMPLOYEES OF AMERICAN FAMILY INSURANCE GROUP, AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN FAMILY TERMINATION BENEFITS PLAN, GROUP LIFE PLAN, AMERICAN STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN, GROUP DENTAL PLAN, AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, COMMITTEE OF EMPLOYEES AND DISTRICT MANAGER RETIREMENT PLAN, AMERICAN FAMILY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN FAMILY 401K PLAN, GROUP HEALTH PLAN and AMERICAN FAMILY INSURANCE GROUP MASTER RETIREMENT TRUST
Amicus Curiae: PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, AARP FOUNDATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MUTUAL INSURERS, AARP, PUBLIC JUSTICE, U.S. CHAMBER OF COMMERCE, AMERICAN COUNCIL OF LIFE INSURERS and AMERICAN INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff / Appellee: NATHAN GARRETT, WALID JAMMAL, KATHLEEN TUERSLEY and CINDA J. DURACHINSKY
Case Number: 17-4125
Filed: October 26, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 71 U.S. Supreme Court letter filed. The petition for rehearing is denied. Supreme Court Case No: 19-248, 12/09/2019.. (MRE) [Entered: 01/28/2020 11:07 AM]
December 10, 2019 Filing 70 U.S. Supreme Court letter filed denying a petition for a writ of certiorari [ # 69 ] filed by Walid Jammal. Supreme Court Case No: 19-248, 12/09/2019.. (MRE) [Entered: 12/10/2019 11:05 AM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 69 U.S. Supreme Court notice filed regarding a petition for a writ of certiorari filed by Appellee Walid Jammal. Supreme Court Case No:19-248, 08/22/2019. (CL) [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:07 PM]
April 2, 2019 Filing 68 MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. (KSF) [Entered: 04/02/2019 09:41 AM]
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER filed denying petition for en banc rehearing [ # 58 ] filed by Mr. Charles J Crueger. Danny J. Boggs, Eric L. Clay, and John M. Rogers, Circuit Judges. (BLH) [Entered: 03/25/2019 10:08 AM]
March 6, 2019 Filing 66 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Mr. Daniel Benjamin Kohrman for AARP and AARP Foundation in support of appellees' petition for rehearing en banc. Certificate of Service:03/05/2019. (BLH) [Entered: 03/06/2019 04:24 PM]
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER filed: Upon consideration of the motion of AARP and AARP Foundation for leave to file a brief as amici curiae in support of appellees' petition for rehearing en banc, It is ORDERED that the motion be and it hereby is GRANTED [ # 60 ]. Danny J. Boggs, Eric L. Clay, and John M. Rogers, Circuit Judges. (BLH) [Entered: 03/06/2019 04:17 PM]
March 6, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION to file AMICUS BRIEF filed by DANIEL B. KOHRMAN for AARP AND AARP FOUNDATION. Certificate of Service: 03/06/2019. [17-4125] (DBK) [Entered: 03/06/2019 04:01 PM]
March 6, 2019 Filing 63 NOTIFICATION filed by Ms. Lauren Suzanne Kuley for 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group regarding NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF LEAD COUNSEL. Certificate of Service: 03/06/2019. [17-4125] (LSK) [Entered: 03/06/2019 10:17 AM]
March 5, 2019 Filing 62 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Daniel Benjamin Kohrman for AARP and AARP Foundation. (BLH) [Entered: 03/05/2019 02:57 PM]
March 5, 2019 Filing 61 TENDERED brief in support of appellees' petition for rehearing en banc. Received from Attorney Mr. Daniel Benjamin Kohrman for AARP and AARP Foundation. (BLH) [Entered: 03/05/2019 02:55 PM]
March 5, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION filed by Mr. Daniel Benjamin Kohrman for AARP and AARP Foundation for leave to file a brief as amici curiae in support of appellees' petition for rehearing en banc. Certificate of Service: 03/05/2019. (BLH) [Entered: 03/05/2019 02:53 PM]
March 5, 2019 Filing 59 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Nathan Garrett, Cinda J. Durachinsky, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley by Kenneth W. Starr. Certificate of Service: 03/05/2019. [17-4125] (KWS) [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:47 AM]
February 26, 2019 Filing 58 PETITION for en banc rehearing filed by Mr. Charles J Crueger for Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley. Certificate of Service: 02/26/2019. [17-4125] (CJC) [Entered: 02/26/2019 05:34 PM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 57 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to 02/26/2019 to file a petition for rehearing en banc [ # 56 ] filed by Ms. Kara A. Elgersma. (BLH) [Entered: 02/04/2019 04:42 PM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION filed by Ms. Kara A. Elgersma for Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley to extend time to file petition for rehearing until 02/26/2019, to extend time to file petition for rehearing en banc until 02/26/2019. Certificate of Service: 02/01/2019. [17-4125] (KAE) [Entered: 02/01/2019 04:42 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 55 OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : REVERSED and REMANDED. Decision for publication. Danny J. Boggs (AUTHORING), Eric L. Clay (DISSENTING), and John M. Rogers, Circuit Judges. **SECOND NDA -- A typo on page 15 has been corrected.--[Edited 01/29/2019 by CL] (CL) [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:49 AM]
July 31, 2018 Filing 54 CAUSE ARGUED by Mr. Pierre H. Bergeron for Appellants American Family Insurance Company, et al and Mr. Charles J. Crueger for Appellees Walid Jammal, et al before Boggs, Circuit Judge; Clay, Circuit Judge and Rogers, Circuit Judge. (KSC) [Entered: 07/31/2018 03:37 PM]
June 5, 2018 Filing 53 Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Charles J. Crueger for Appellees Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley. Certificate of Service: 06/05/2018. [17-4125] (CJC) [Entered: 06/05/2018 12:06 PM]
June 1, 2018 Filing 52 Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Pierre H. Bergeron for Appellants 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group. Certificate of Service: 06/01/2018. [17-4125] (PHB) [Entered: 06/01/2018 09:19 AM]
May 31, 2018 Filing 51 ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED for 9:00 a.m. (Eastern Time) on Tuesday, July 31, 2018. (JRH) [Entered: 05/31/2018 08:59 AM]
April 13, 2018 Filing 50 REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Pierre H. Bergeron for Appellants 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group. Certificate of Service:04/13/2017. [17-4125] (PHB) [Entered: 04/13/2018 01:23 PM]
March 20, 2018 Filing 49 [DISREGARD] [Counsel will be changing contact information in PACER] AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Amici Curiae AARP and AARP Foundation by Mary Ellen Signorille. Certificate of Service: 03/20/2018. [17-4125] --[Edited 03/21/2018 by Case Manager Bryant Crutcher] (MES) [Entered: 03/20/2018 11:36 AM]
March 20, 2018 Filing 48 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 45 ], filed by Ms. Mary Ellen Signorille for AARP and AARP Foundation is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist [counsel's phone number]. (BLC) [Entered: 03/20/2018 11:07 AM]
March 16, 2018 Filing 47 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Public Justice in support of Plaintiffs-Appellees , with parties' consent.. Certificate of Service:03/16/2018. [17-4125] (SRL) [Entered: 03/16/2018 08:15 PM]
March 16, 2018 Filing 46 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Mary Ellen Signorille, AARP and AARP Foundation , with parties' consent.. Certificate of Service:03/16/2018. [17-4125] (MES) [Entered: 03/16/2018 03:19 PM]
March 16, 2018 Filing 45 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for AARP and AARP Foundation by Mary Ellen Signorille. Certificate of Service: 03/16/2018. [17-4125] (MES) [Entered: 03/16/2018 03:12 PM]
March 15, 2018 Filing 44 RULING LETTER SENT GRANTING motion to extend time to file brief [ # 43 ] filed by Mr. Pierre H. Bergeron. The reply brief is now due April 13, 2018. (BLC) [Entered: 03/15/2018 10:53 AM]
March 15, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION filed by Mr. Pierre H. Bergeron for 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 03/15/2018. [17-4125] (PHB) [Entered: 03/15/2018 08:14 AM]
March 13, 2018 Filing 42 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Public Justice by Seth R. Lesser. Certificate of Service: 03/13/2018. [17-4125] (SRL) [Entered: 03/13/2018 01:50 PM]
March 9, 2018 Filing 41 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Ms. Erin K. Dickinson for Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley. Certificate of Service:03/09/2018. Argument Request: requested. [17-4125] (EKD) [Entered: 03/09/2018 04:12 PM]
January 30, 2018 Filing 40 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 39 ] filed by Ms. Kara A. Elgersma., resetting briefing schedule: Appellee brief now due 03/09/2018. (BLC) [Entered: 01/30/2018 10:28 AM]
January 29, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION filed by Ms. Kara A. Elgersma for Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 01/29/2018. [17-4125] (KAE) [Entered: 01/29/2018 03:30 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 38 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Mr. Paulo B. McKeeby for American Council of Life Insurers Counsel for American Council of Life Insurers , with parties' consent.. Certificate of Service:01/24/2018. [17-4125] (PBM) [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:05 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 37 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Mr. Shay Dvoretzky for Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America , with parties' consent.. Certificate of Service:01/24/2018. [17-4125] (SD) [Entered: 01/24/2018 04:29 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 36 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for American Council of Life Insurers by Ronald E. Manthey. Certificate of Service: 01/24/2018. [17-4125] (REM) [Entered: 01/24/2018 12:34 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 35 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for American Council of Life Insurers by Paulo B. McKeeby. Certificate of Service: 01/24/2018. [17-4125] (PBM) [Entered: 01/24/2018 12:31 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 34 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America by Shay Dvoretzky. Certificate of Service: 01/24/2018. [17-4125] (SD) [Entered: 01/24/2018 11:14 AM]
January 23, 2018 Filing 33 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Amici Curiae American Insurance Association, National Association of Mutual Insurers and Property Casualty Insurers Association of America by C. Darcy Jalandoni. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2018. [17-4125] (CCJ) [Entered: 01/23/2018 10:07 AM]
January 22, 2018 Filing 32 CORRECTED AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Amici Curiae American Insurance Association, National Association of Mutual Insurers and Property Casualty Insurers Association of America by J. Philip Calabrese. Certificate of Service: 01/22/2018. [17-4125] (JPC) [Entered: 01/22/2018 05:02 PM]
January 22, 2018 Filing 31 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [5906419], filed by Mr. J. Philip Calabrese for American Insurance Association, Property Casualty Insurers Association of America and National Association of Mutual Insurers is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. (BLC) [Entered: 01/22/2018 02:45 PM]
January 22, 2018 Filing 30 [DISREGARD. See RE# 32] AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Property Casualty Insurers Association of America; the National Association of Mutual Insurers; the American Insurance Association by J. Philip Calabrese. Certificate of Service: 01/22/2018. [17-4125] --[Edited 01/23/2018 by Case Manager Bryant Crutcher] (JPC) [Entered: 01/22/2018 02:24 PM]
January 18, 2018 Filing 29 AMICUS BRIEF filed by J. Philip Calabrese, on behalf of the Property Casualty Insurance Association of America, the National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies, and the American Insurance Association , with parties' consent.. Certificate of Service:01/18/2018. [17-4125] (JPC) [Entered: 01/18/2018 01:28 PM]
January 17, 2018 Filing 28 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Pierre H. Bergeron for 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group. Certificate of Service:01/17/2018. Argument Request: requested. [17-4125] (PHB) [Entered: 01/17/2018 02:20 PM]
December 28, 2017 Filing 27 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley by Drew Legando. Certificate of Service: 12/28/2017. [17-4125] (JL) [Entered: 12/28/2017 01:49 PM]
December 28, 2017 Filing 26 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley by Jack Landskroner. Certificate of Service: 12/28/2017. [17-4125] (JL) [Entered: 12/28/2017 01:47 PM]
December 14, 2017 Filing 25 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 12/14/2017 11:31 AM]
December 13, 2017 Filing 24 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 01/17/2018. appellee brief now due 02/16/2018. (LMR) [Entered: 12/13/2017 01:51 PM]
November 27, 2017 Filing 23 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley by Kara A. Elgersma. Certificate of Service: 11/27/2017. [17-4125] (KAE) [Entered: 11/27/2017 04:46 PM]
November 27, 2017 Filing 22 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley by Edward A. Wallace. Certificate of Service: 11/27/2017. [17-4125] (EAW) [Entered: 11/27/2017 04:15 PM]
November 9, 2017 Filing 21 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 12/27/2017. appellee brief now due 01/26/2018. (MLB) [Entered: 11/09/2017 11:18 AM]
November 9, 2017 Filing 20 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/19/2017;. appellee brief due 01/18/2018; (BLC) [Entered: 11/09/2017 08:14 AM]
November 8, 2017 Filing 19 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants American Family Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group, American Family 401k Plan, Group Life Plan, Group Dental Plan, Long Term Disability Plan, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, 401k Plan Administrative Committee, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan and Group Health Plan by Scott Coyle. Certificate of Service: 11/08/2017. [17-4125] (SWC) [Entered: 11/08/2017 04:56 PM]
November 8, 2017 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Pierre H. Bergeron for 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group. Certificate of Service: 11/08/2017. [17-4125] (PHB) [Entered: 11/08/2017 04:51 PM]
November 8, 2017 Filing 17 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Pierre H. Bergeron for Appellants 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group. Certificate of Service:11/08/2017. [17-4125] (PHB) [Entered: 11/08/2017 04:51 PM]
November 8, 2017 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Pierre H. Bergeron for Appellants 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group Certificate of Service: 11/08/2017. [17-4125] (PHB) [Entered: 11/08/2017 04:49 PM]
November 8, 2017 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group by Colter Paulson. Certificate of Service: 11/08/2017. [17-4125] (CLP) [Entered: 11/08/2017 03:53 PM]
November 8, 2017 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group by Lauren S. Kuley. Certificate of Service: 11/08/2017. [17-4125] (LSK) [Entered: 11/08/2017 03:46 PM]
November 8, 2017 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants 401k Plan Administrative Committee, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group by Pierre H. Bergeron. Certificate of Service: 11/08/2017. [17-4125] (PHB) [Entered: 11/08/2017 03:43 PM]
November 8, 2017 Filing 12 Update fee status change to paid. Receipt number 14660099678. (BLC) [Entered: 11/08/2017 09:30 AM]
October 27, 2017 Filing 11 A Telephone Mediation Conference has been scheduled for 12/13/2017 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 10/27/2017 12:25 PM]
October 27, 2017 Filing 10 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 10/27/2017 12:23 PM]
October 27, 2017 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley by Gregory F. Coleman. Certificate of Service: 10/27/2017. [17-4125] (GFC) [Entered: 10/27/2017 09:50 AM]
October 26, 2017 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group by Gilbert Brosky. Certificate of Service: 10/26/2017. [17-4125] (GB) [Entered: 10/26/2017 05:11 PM]
October 26, 2017 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley by Charles J. Crueger. [17-4125] (CJC) [Entered: 10/26/2017 05:07 PM]
October 26, 2017 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley by Erin K. Dickinson. [17-4125] (EKD) [Entered: 10/26/2017 05:05 PM]
October 26, 2017 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group by Gregory V. Mersol. Certificate of Service: 10/26/2017. [17-4125] (GVM) [Entered: 10/26/2017 04:44 PM]
October 26, 2017 Filing 4 Update fee status change to due. (BLC) [Entered: 10/26/2017 11:28 AM]
October 26, 2017 Filing 3 ATTACHED: Copy of petition for permission to appeal in Case No. 17-307 and copy of 10/26/17 6th Circuit order granting petition for permission to appeal in Case No. 17-307. (BLC) [Entered: 10/26/2017 11:26 AM]
October 26, 2017 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Bryant Crutcher: 513-564-7013. (BLC) [Entered: 10/26/2017 11:22 AM]
October 26, 2017 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group. Transcript needed: y. (BLC) [Entered: 10/26/2017 11:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Walid Jammal, et al v. American Family Ins Co, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Colter Lawrence Paulson
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: 401K PLAN ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Colter Lawrence Paulson
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RETIREMENT PLAN FOR EMPLOYEES OF AMERICAN FAMILY INSURANCE GROUP
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Colter Lawrence Paulson
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Colter Lawrence Paulson
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMERICAN FAMILY TERMINATION BENEFITS PLAN
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Colter Lawrence Paulson
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GROUP LIFE PLAN
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Colter Lawrence Paulson
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMERICAN STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Colter Lawrence Paulson
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GROUP DENTAL PLAN
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Colter Lawrence Paulson
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Colter Lawrence Paulson
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: COMMITTEE OF EMPLOYEES AND DISTRICT MANAGER RETIREMENT PLAN
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Colter Lawrence Paulson
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMERICAN FAMILY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Colter Lawrence Paulson
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMERICAN FAMILY 401K PLAN
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Colter Lawrence Paulson
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GROUP HEALTH PLAN
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Colter Lawrence Paulson
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMERICAN FAMILY INSURANCE GROUP MASTER RETIREMENT TRUST
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Colter Lawrence Paulson
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: J. Philip Calabrese
Represented By: Catherine Darcy Copeland Jalandoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AARP FOUNDATION
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Kohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MUTUAL INSURERS
Represented By: J. Philip Calabrese
Represented By: Catherine Darcy Copeland Jalandoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AARP
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Kohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PUBLIC JUSTICE
Represented By: Seth Richard Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: U.S. CHAMBER OF COMMERCE
Represented By: Shay Dvoretzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COUNCIL OF LIFE INSURERS
Represented By: Ronald E. Manthey
Represented By: Paulo B. McKeeby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: J. Philip Calabrese
Represented By: Catherine Darcy Copeland Jalandoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NATHAN GARRETT
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Charles J. Crueger
Represented By: Kenneth W. Starr
Represented By: Erin K. Dickinson
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Drew T. Legando
Represented By: Jack Landskroner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WALID JAMMAL
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Charles J. Crueger
Represented By: Kenneth W. Starr
Represented By: Erin K. Dickinson
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Drew T. Legando
Represented By: Jack Landskroner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KATHLEEN TUERSLEY
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Charles J. Crueger
Represented By: Kenneth W. Starr
Represented By: Erin K. Dickinson
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Drew T. Legando
Represented By: Jack Landskroner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CINDA J. DURACHINSKY
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Charles J. Crueger
Represented By: Kenneth W. Starr
Represented By: Erin K. Dickinson
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Drew T. Legando
Represented By: Jack Landskroner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?