John Hill v. Jon Waters, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MATT ADAMS, APPLE ITUNES, OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY MARCHING BAND, JON WATERS, FACEBOOK, JERRY L. CANTERBURY, MATT REED and DOT THE I CREATIVE
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOHN HILL
Case Number: 18-3208
Filed: March 5, 2018
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 32 MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. (PJE) [Entered: 04/10/2019 06:54 AM]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER filed DENYING petition for panel rehearing [ # 30 ] filed by John Hill. Karen Nelson Moore, Circuit Judge; Ronald Lee Gilman, Circuit Judge and Bernice Bouie Donald, Circuit Judge. (PJE) [Entered: 04/02/2019 09:42 AM]
March 18, 2019 Filing 30 PETITION for rehearing before original panel filed by John Hill. Certificate of Service: 03/13/2019. (PJE) [Entered: 03/20/2019 11:37 AM]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER filed : The district court's judgment is AFFIRMED, pursuant to FRAP 34(a)(2)(C), decision not for publication. Karen Nelson Moore, Circuit Judge; Ronald Lee Gilman, Circuit Judge and Bernice Bouie Donald, Circuit Judge. (CB) [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:36 PM]
December 10, 2018 Filing 28 The case manager for this case is now: Patricia J. Elder (PJE) [Entered: 12/10/2018 12:23 PM]
November 30, 2018 Filing 27 REPLY BRIEF filed by Party John Hill Certificate of Service:11/30/2018. (AEG) [Entered: 12/05/2018 12:25 PM]
November 13, 2018 Filing 26 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Ms. Christina J. Moser for Apple Itunes Certificate of Service:11/13/2018. Argument Request: not requested. [18-3208] (CJM) [Entered: 11/13/2018 05:11 PM]
November 13, 2018 Filing 25 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. John Chaney for Matt Adams and Dot The I Creative Certificate of Service:11/13/2018. Argument Request: not requested. [18-3208] (JC) [Entered: 11/13/2018 04:08 PM]
November 13, 2018 Filing 24 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Kevin T. Shook for Jerry L. Canterbury, Ohio State University Marching Band, Matt Reed and Jon Waters Certificate of Service:11/13/2018. Argument Request: not requested. [18-3208] (KTS) [Entered: 11/13/2018 03:29 PM]
November 13, 2018 Filing 23 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Jay A. Yurkiw for Facebook Certificate of Service:11/13/2018. Argument Request: not requested. [18-3208] (JAY) [Entered: 11/13/2018 12:39 PM]
October 10, 2018 Filing 22 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by John Hill. (AEG) [Entered: 10/15/2018 01:08 PM]
August 29, 2018 Filing 20 Update fee status change to paid. USCA Appeal Fees received re (12 in 2:17-mc-00003-MHW-CMV, 63 in 2:17-cv-00532-MHW-CMV): $505. Receipt number: 200COL053606. (ew) (AEG) [Entered: 08/29/2018 11:34 AM]
August 29, 2018 Filing 21 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 10/11/2018; appellee brief due 11/13/2018. (AEG) [Entered: 08/29/2018 11:35 AM]
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER filed: Hills motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Unless Hill pays the $505 filing fee to the district court within thirty days of the entry of this order, this appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution. Hills motion to strike is also DENIED. Entered by order of the court. (AEG) [Entered: 07/31/2018 08:13 AM]
April 26, 2018 Filing 18 Appellant MOTION to Strike Appellee's Opposition to Motion for Pauper Status, filed by John Hill. (AEG) [Entered: 04/27/2018 10:50 AM]
April 17, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to proceed ifp, [ # 15 ]; previously filed by John Hill. Response from Attorney Mr. Kevin T. Shook for Appellees Jerry L. Canterbury, Ohio State University Marching Band, Matt Reed and Jon Waters Certificate of Service:04/17/2018. [18-3208] (KTS) [Entered: 04/17/2018 10:47 AM]
April 6, 2018 Filing 16 Financial Affidavit filed by Party John Hill (AEG) [Entered: 04/09/2018 11:24 AM]
April 6, 2018 Filing 15 Appellant MOTION filed by John Hill to proceed in forma pauperis. (AEG) [Entered: 04/09/2018 11:22 AM]
March 22, 2018 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Facebook by Jay Yurkiw. Certificate of Service: 03/22/2018. [18-3208] (JAY) [Entered: 03/22/2018 02:38 PM]
March 22, 2018 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jay A. Yurkiw for Appellee Facebook Certificate of Service: 03/22/2018. [18-3208] (JAY) [Entered: 03/22/2018 01:03 PM]
March 22, 2018 Filing 12 *LOCKED*FILED: Appearance of Counsel by Mr. Jay A. Yurkiw for Facebook. Certificate of Service: 03/22/2018. [18-3208] ***COUNSEL: Incorrect event selected. Please re-file under "case opening forms, appearance form" --[Edited 03/22/2018 by AEG] (JAY) [Entered: 03/22/2018 01:00 PM]
March 20, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John Chaney for Appellee Matt Adams. Certificate of Service: 03/20/2018. [18-3208] --[Edited 03/20/2018 by AEG] (JC) [Entered: 03/20/2018 03:21 PM]
March 20, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John Chaney for Appellee Dot The I Creative Certificate of Service: 03/20/2018. [18-3208] --[Edited 03/20/2018 by AEG] (JC) [Entered: 03/20/2018 03:21 PM]
March 20, 2018 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Matt Adams and Dot The I Creative by John L. Chaney. Certificate of Service: 03/20/2018. [18-3208] (JC) [Entered: 03/20/2018 02:49 PM]
March 16, 2018 Filing 8 CORRESPONDENCE: letter by John Hill. (AEG) [Entered: 03/19/2018 12:41 PM]
March 16, 2018 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Ohio State University Marching Band, Matt Reed, Jon Waters and Jerry L. Canterbury by Kevin T. Shook. Certificate of Service: 03/16/2018. [18-3208] (KTS) [Entered: 03/16/2018 03:16 PM]
March 14, 2018 Filing 6 RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee. Fee or IFP are due no later than April 16, 2018. (AEG) [Entered: 03/14/2018 01:58 PM]
March 14, 2018 Filing 5 Copy of District Court Order filed (R #64) denying in forma pauperis. (AEG) [Entered: 03/14/2018 01:57 PM]
March 13, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Christina J. Moser for Appellee Apple Itunes Certificate of Service: 03/13/2018. [18-3208] (CJM) [Entered: 03/13/2018 02:37 PM]
March 13, 2018 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Apple Itunes by Christina J. Moser. Certificate of Service: 03/13/2018. [18-3208] (CJM) [Entered: 03/13/2018 02:33 PM]
March 5, 2018 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Amy Gigliotti (AEG) [Entered: 03/05/2018 09:29 AM]
March 5, 2018 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant John Hill. Transcript needed: n. (AEG) [Entered: 03/05/2018 09:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: John Hill v. Jon Waters, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATT ADAMS
Represented By: John Chaney
Represented By: Ray P. Drexel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: APPLE ITUNES
Represented By: Christina J. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY MARCHING BAND
Represented By: Kevin T. Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JON WATERS
Represented By: Kevin T. Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FACEBOOK
Represented By: Jay A. Yurkiw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERRY L. CANTERBURY
Represented By: Kevin T. Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATT REED
Represented By: Kevin T. Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOT THE I CREATIVE
Represented By: John Chaney
Represented By: Ray P. Drexel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN HILL
Represented By: John Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?