Anthony Viola v. William Bair, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK, MATHIAS OTTO, Doctor, CHRISTOF VON DRYANDER, RICHARD D. OWENS, LESLIE R. CALDWELL, DOUGLAS K. JOHNSON, VP, Ace Securities Corporation, KATHRYN K. CLOVER, WILLIAM J. BAIR, Deputy Associate Attorney General, DANIEL KASARIS, Senior Assistant Ohio Attorney General, PREET BHARARA, MARK S. BENNETT, Assistant U.S. Attorney and ERIC H. HOLDER, JR., Attorney General
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANTHONY L. VIOLA
Case Number: 18-3289
Filed: April 2, 2018
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER filed GRANTING motion to dismiss case - voluntarily [ # 15 ] filed by Mr. Anthony L. Viola. (BLC) [Entered: 06/27/2019 12:04 PM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Anthony L. Viola to dismiss voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). (BLC) [Entered: 06/21/2019 03:03 PM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee. Due within 14 days. (BLC) [Entered: 06/06/2019 08:17 AM]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER filed: We DENY the motion for reconsideration. Ralph B. Guy, Jr., Circuit Judge; Julia Smith Gibbons, Circuit Judge and John B. Nalbandian, Circuit Judge. (ASM) [Entered: 06/05/2019 04:18 PM]
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 Update fee status change to due. (BLC) [Entered: 05/16/2019 10:28 AM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 Update fee status change to due. (BLC) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:48 PM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Anthony L. Viola to reconsider order dated 02/01/2019. Certificate of service: 02/07/2019. (BLC) [Entered: 02/19/2019 02:56 PM]
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed: Because the complaint filed by Viola appears to lack an arguable basis in law, his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED. Unless Viola pays the 505.00 filing fee to the district court within thirty days of the entry of this order, this appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution. [ # 5 ] Entered by order of the court. (BLC) [Entered: 02/01/2019 09:17 AM]
May 3, 2018 Filing 8 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Anthony L. Viola. Certificate of Service:04/26/2018. Argument Request: not received. [briefing has not yet begun] (BLC) [Entered: 05/10/2018 03:19 PM]
May 3, 2018 Filing 7 Prisoner trust account statement filed. (BLC) [Entered: 05/10/2018 03:17 PM]
May 3, 2018 Filing 6 Financial Affidavit filed by Party Mr. Anthony L. Viola. (BLC) [Entered: 05/10/2018 03:16 PM]
May 3, 2018 Filing 5 Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Anthony L. Viola to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 04/26/2018. (BLC) [Entered: 05/10/2018 03:10 PM]
April 2, 2018 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Daniel Kasaris by Charles E. Hannan. Certificate of Service: 04/02/2018. [18-3289] (CEH) [Entered: 04/02/2018 04:00 PM]
April 2, 2018 Filing 3 Update fee status change to due. (BLC) [Entered: 04/02/2018 03:39 PM]
April 2, 2018 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Bryant Crutcher: 513-564-7013. (BLC) [Entered: 04/02/2018 03:36 PM]
April 2, 2018 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Mr. Anthony L. Viola. Transcript needed: n. (BLC) [Entered: 04/02/2018 03:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Anthony Viola v. William Bair, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Terry Michael Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATHIAS OTTO, Doctor
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Terry Michael Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOF VON DRYANDER
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Terry Michael Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD D. OWENS
Represented By: Richard D. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LESLIE R. CALDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOUGLAS K. JOHNSON, VP, Ace Securities Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATHRYN K. CLOVER
Represented By: Kathryn K. Clover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM J. BAIR, Deputy Associate Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL KASARIS, Senior Assistant Ohio Attorney General
Represented By: Charles E. Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PREET BHARARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK S. BENNETT, Assistant U.S. Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIC H. HOLDER, JR., Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY L. VIOLA
Represented By: Anthony L. Viola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?