Laurence Bartell, et al v. LTF Club Operations Company
Plaintiff: JERRY STAUFFER
Plaintiff / Appellee: LAURENCE BARTELL
Defendant / Appellant: LTF CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY, INC., dba Life Time Fitness, Inc.
Case Number: 18-3469
Filed: May 18, 2018
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 45 REGARDING MEDIATION: PAUL CALICO will now be the Mediator for this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 03/02/2020 03:03 PM]
February 25, 2020 Filing 44 STATUS REPORT filed. Next status report DUE TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE 08/17/2020. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 02/25/2020 02:18 PM]
February 19, 2020 Filing 43 STATUS REPORT filed. Next status report DUE TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE within thirty-five (35) days of the District Court's final decision on the fairness of the settlement. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 02/19/2020 04:21 PM]
February 6, 2020 Filing 42 FILED: Notice of Firm Name Change and Email Contact Change by Mr. Aaron Daniel Van Oort for LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. Certificate of Service: 02/06/2020. [18-3469] (ADV) [Entered: 02/06/2020 05:42 PM]
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER filed : The joint motion to remand is GRANTED. The appeal is remanded to the District Court for further proceedings. The parties shall notify this Court within 28 days following the District Courts decision and the effect of such decision on disposition of the appeal. (CB) [Entered: 02/06/2020 07:50 AM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT filed. Next status report DUE TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE 02/19/2020. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 02/05/2020 02:27 PM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION filed by Mr. Thomas N. McCormick for Laurence Bartell to remand. Certificate of Service: 02/05/2020. [18-3469] (TNM) [Entered: 02/05/2020 02:21 PM]
January 28, 2020 Filing 38 STATUS REPORT filed. Next status report DUE TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE 02/05/2020. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 01/28/2020 04:53 PM]
January 23, 2020 Filing 37 STATUS REPORT filed. Next status report DUE TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE 01/31/2020. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 01/23/2020 04:19 PM]
January 16, 2020 Filing 36 STATUS REPORT received from Counsel to the Mediation Office regarding the progress of the settlement. Next status report DUE TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE 01/23/2020. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 01/16/2020 08:41 AM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 35 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal with the permission of the Panel. (CAW) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:31 AM]
July 29, 2019 Filing 33 FILED: Letter to Clerk Regarding Settlement Reached by Mr. Rodger L. Eckelberry for LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. Certificate of Service: 07/29/2019. [18-3469] (RLE) [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:32 PM]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING Appellant's motion to add a third judge and for reargument of the appeal [ # 30 ]. Entered by order of the court. (LAJ) [Entered: 06/03/2019 01:41 PM]
May 20, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion for miscellaneous relief, [ # 30 ]; previously filed by Mr. Aaron Daniel Van Oort for LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. Response from Attorney Mr. Thomas N. McCormick for Appellee Laurence Bartell Certificate of Service:05/20/2019. [18-3469] (TNM) [Entered: 05/20/2019 12:05 PM]
May 17, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION filed by Mr. Aaron Daniel Van Oort for LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. for Adding a Third Judge and Ordering Re-Argument Certificate of Service: 05/17/2019. [18-3469] (ADV) [Entered: 05/17/2019 04:59 PM]
March 13, 2019 Filing 29 CAUSE ARGUED by Mr. Aaron Daniel Van Oort for Appellant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. and Mr. Thomas N. McCormick for Appellee Laurence Bartell before Keith, Circuit Judge; Stranch, Circuit Judge and Donald, Circuit Judge. (KSC) [Entered: 03/13/2019 10:53 AM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 28 Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas N. McCormick for Appellee Laurence Bartell. Certificate of Service: 02/01/2019. [18-3469] (TNM) [Entered: 02/01/2019 03:32 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 27 Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Aaron Daniel Van Oort for Appellant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. Certificate of Service: 01/25/2019. [18-3469] (ADV) [Entered: 01/25/2019 11:11 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 26 ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED for 9:00 a.m. (Eastern Time) on Wednesday, March 13, 2019. (JRH) [Entered: 01/25/2019 08:16 AM]
December 11, 2018 Filing 25 The case manager for this case is now: Cheryl Borkowski (PJE) [Entered: 12/11/2018 01:51 PM]
November 2, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Aaron Daniel Van Oort for Appellant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. Certificate of Service:11/02/2018. [18-3469] (ADV) [Entered: 11/02/2018 04:36 PM]
October 11, 2018 Filing 23 RULING LETTER SENT GRANTING motion to extend time to file the reply brief [ # 22 ], filed by Mr. Aaron Daniel Van Oort. The reply brief is now due due 11/02/2018. No further extensions will be granted for this optional brief. (AEG) [Entered: 10/11/2018 12:03 PM]
October 11, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION filed by Mr. Aaron Daniel Van Oort for LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 10/11/2018. [18-3469] (ADV) [Entered: 10/11/2018 10:21 AM]
October 1, 2018 Filing 21 Errata to Table of Contents of Plaintiffs-Appellees Merit Brief (Doc. 20 at 4-5) filed 09/28/2018 by Mr. Thomas N. McCormick for Laurence Bartell. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2018. [18-3469] (TNM) [Entered: 10/01/2018 05:27 PM]
September 28, 2018 Filing 20 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Thomas N. McCormick for Laurence Bartell Certificate of Service:09/28/2018. Argument Request: not requested. [18-3469] (TNM) [Entered: 09/28/2018 05:29 PM]
August 10, 2018 Filing 19 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Aaron Daniel Van Oort for LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. Certificate of Service:08/10/2018. Argument Request: requested. [18-3469] (ADV) [Entered: 08/10/2018 05:26 PM]
June 21, 2018 Filing 18 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 06/21/2018 04:43 PM]
June 21, 2018 Filing 17 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 08/10/2018. appellee brief now due 09/28/2018. (LMR) [Entered: 06/21/2018 04:30 PM]
June 8, 2018 Filing 16 Update fee status change to paid. USCA Appeal Fees $505.00, receipt no. 200COL052554 for Appeal in case no. 18-3469. (er) (AEG) [Entered: 06/08/2018 11:03 AM]
June 5, 2018 Filing 15 The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 06/14/2018 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Bob Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 06/05/2018 02:21 PM]
June 1, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Aaron Daniel Van Oort for Appellant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. Certificate of Service: 06/01/2018. [18-3469] (ADV) [Entered: 06/01/2018 05:54 PM]
June 1, 2018 Filing 13 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Aaron Daniel Van Oort for Appellant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. Certificate of Service:06/01/2018. [18-3469] (ADV) [Entered: 06/01/2018 05:53 PM]
June 1, 2018 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. by Aaron D. Van Oort. Certificate of Service: 06/01/2018. [18-3469] (ADV) [Entered: 06/01/2018 05:47 PM]
June 1, 2018 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. by Peter C. Magnuson. Certificate of Service: 06/01/2018. [18-3469] (PM) [Entered: 06/01/2018 05:43 PM]
May 29, 2018 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Laurence Bartell by Kenneth J. Rubin. Certificate of Service: 05/29/2018. [18-3469] (KJR) [Entered: 05/29/2018 03:50 PM]
May 29, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas N. McCormick for Appellees Laurence Bartell and Jerry Stauffer Certificate of Service: 05/29/2018. [18-3469] (TNM) [Entered: 05/29/2018 10:44 AM]
May 29, 2018 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Laurence Bartell by Thomas N. McCormick. Certificate of Service: 05/29/2018. [18-3469] (TNM) [Entered: 05/29/2018 10:36 AM]
May 21, 2018 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. by Rodger L. Eckelberry. Certificate of Service: 05/21/2018. [18-3469] (RLE) [Entered: 05/21/2018 04:29 PM]
May 21, 2018 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. by Ann Yackshaw. Certificate of Service: 05/21/2018. [18-3469] (AY) [Entered: 05/21/2018 02:33 PM]
May 21, 2018 Filing 5 A Telephone Mediation Conference has been scheduled for 06/12/2018 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Bob Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 05/21/2018 02:05 PM]
May 21, 2018 Filing 4 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 05/21/2018 02:03 PM]
May 18, 2018 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/27/2018; appellee brief due 07/27/2018. (AEG) [Entered: 05/18/2018 12:21 PM]
May 18, 2018 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Amy Gigliotti (AEG) [Entered: 05/18/2018 12:20 PM]
May 18, 2018 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. Transcript needed: n. (AEG) [Entered: 05/18/2018 12:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Laurence Bartell, et al v. LTF Club Operations Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LAURENCE BARTELL
Represented By: Kenneth J. Rubin
Represented By: Thomas N. McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LTF CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY, INC., dba Life Time Fitness, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Daniel Van Oort
Represented By: Peter Magnuson
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY STAUFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?